Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1349 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7133 Week
» 28522 Month
» 148049 Year
» 3174902 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Hull Springhead
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Hull Springhead |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | HLS | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 53C | 01/02/1950 | 07/1961 |
|
Date Opened |
20/07/1885 |
Date Closed |
07/1961 |
Pre Grouping Company |
HBR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line east of Springhead Halt.
The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside Hull Paragon Station into Paragon Square, and
continue into Ferensway. Bear left into Springbank (past Derringham Street - 20 minutes), and continue along Springbank West to the
end. Continue along a broad cinder path, and the shed entrance is
on the left-hand side. Walking time 60 minutes.
A bus route (No. 11) operates between the bus station and the
end of Springbank West.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to HLS | 20/07/1885 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 53C | 15/12/1958 | Closed to steam locomotives | 07/1961 | Depot closed |
|
|
|