Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4199 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17605 Week
» 70621 Month
» 190148 Year
» 3217001 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Stafford
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Stafford |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 14 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W14 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 5C | 01/01/1923 | 19/07/1965 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line just north of the station.
The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station along Railway Street. Turn left at
the end of Railway Street over Castle Street Bridge. The shed entrance
is on the left hand side just past the bridge. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 5C | 19/07/1965 | Closed to steam locomotives |
|
|
|