Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 7680 Today
» 7473 Yesterday
» 31020 Week
» 124254 Month
» 584195 Year
» 5023632 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Starbeck
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Starbeck |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29H | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | SBK | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | M29H | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 50D | 01/02/1950 | 13/09/1959 |
|
Date Opened |
1857 |
Date Closed |
13/09/1959 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Knaresborough and Leeds lines south
of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.
Cross High Street at the south end of the station, and bear to the
east side of the line. Continue into Spa Lane running parallel to the
railway, and turn right almost immediately into a railway yard. A
boarded crossing leads across the York line to the shed. Walking time
5 minutes.
Note: Care should be taken when using this crossing over the
main line.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1857 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to SBK | 1875 | Change of code to 29H | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M29H | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 50D | 13/09/1959 | Depot closed |
|
|
|