Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 37 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2835 Week
» 14517 Month
» 167470 Year
» 1832846 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Staveley (G.C.)


Depot Details
Depot Name Staveley (G.C.)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
STV187531/01/1950
38D01/02/195030/06/1958
41H01/05/195820/05/1965
Date Opened 01/06/1892
Date Closed 14/06/1965
Pre Grouping Company MSLR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line south of Staveley Town Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Cross the main road outside Staveley Town Station, and proceed down the roadway of railway cottages on the east side of the line. Turn right into an opening where the roadway bends to the left. Ascend the railway embankment on the left hand side just before the railway overbridge. This embankment is the top of the shed yard.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to STV
01/06/1892Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 38D
01/05/1958Change of code to 41H
14/06/1965Depot closed