Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1090 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14496 Week
» 67512 Month
» 187039 Year
» 3213892 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 24 | 1880 | 31/12/1922 | W24 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 10E | 01/01/1923 | 30/09/1955 | 10D | 01/10/1955 | 31/03/1958 | 8G | 21/03/1958 | 19/06/1967 |
|
Date Opened |
1880 |
Date Closed |
19/06/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line between Sutton Oak and
Peasley Cross Stations. The yard is visible from the line.
From Peasley Cross Station.
Turn left outside the station into Sutton Road and right into Baxter’s
Lane. The shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 10
minutes.
From Sutton Oak Station.
Turn left outside the station into Lancots Lane, left into Sutton
Road, and left into Baxter’s Lane. The shed entrance is on the right
hand side. Walking time 10 minutes.
From St. Helens.
A trolley bus service operates from St. Helens labelled St. Helens
Junction, passing close to Shaw Street and Central Stations, to the south
end of Baxter’s Lane. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 10E | 1880 | Depot opened | 01/10/1955 | Change of code to 10D | 21/03/1958 | Change of code to 8G | 19/06/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|