Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3936 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17342 Week
» 70358 Month
» 189885 Year
» 3216738 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Beattock
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Beattock |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 12F | 1875 | 31/12/1948 | 68D | 01/01/1949 | 30/06/1962 | 66F | 01/07/1962 | 30/04/1967 | BP | 06/05/1973 | 30/11/1976 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line at the north end of the
station. The yard is visible from the line.
Entrance to the shed is effected from the north end of the down platform. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 12F | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 68D | 01/07/1962 | Change of code to 66F | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to BP |
|
|
|