Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 610 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18413 Week
» 71429 Month
» 190956 Year
» 3217809 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Treherbert
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Treherbert |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | THT (128) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 88F | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1967 |
|
Date Closed |
01/03/1965 |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
CARDIFF VALLEYS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line east of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead outside the north side of the station, and turn
right into a rough road. The shed entrance is a gate on the right hand
side. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 128 | 1875 | Change of code to THT | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 88F | 01/03/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|