Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1584 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14990 Week
» 68006 Month
» 187533 Year
» 3214386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Walton on the Hill
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Walton on the Hill |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 23F | 1875 | 21/05/1950 | WAL | 01/02/1935 | 31/01/1950 | 27E | 22/05/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 8R | 01/09/1963 | 15/12/1963 |
|
Date Opened |
13/05/1881 |
Date Closed |
15/12/1963 |
Pre Grouping Company |
CLC |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line at the north end of Walton-
on-the-Hill Station. There is no passenger service on this line.
Turn right outside Walton junction L.M.S. Station, and continue
over the footbridge. Continue straight ahead along Walton Park, and
turn right into Rice Lane. Turn left along a short cinder path to
Walton-on-the-Hill Station (just before the junction of Queens Drive).
Entrance to the shed is effected from the north end of the station platform. Walking time 10 minutes. See also under Liverpool.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 13F | 1875 | Change of code to WAL | 01/05/1950 | Change of code to 27E | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 8R |
|
|
|