Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 377 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11303 Week
» 104537 Month
» 564478 Year
» 5003915 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Watford
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Watford |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 2W | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W2W | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 1C | 01/01/1923 | 29/03/1965 | WJ | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1856 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
Remained open as a stabling point after closure to steam. |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the east side of Watford Junction Station. The yard
is visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station along Station Road. Turn right into
St. Albans Road, and cross the railway bridge. The shed entrance is a
gate on the right hand side. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1856 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 1C | 29/03/1965 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to WJ |
|
|
|