Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 45 Online
» 714 Today
» 2565 Yesterday
» 3279 Week
» 79381 Month
» 564600 Year
» 2965064 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bletchley
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bletchley |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 3 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W3 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 2B | 01/01/1923 | 30/06/1950 | 4A | 01/07/1950 | 29/02/1952 | 1E | 01/03/1952 | 05/05/1973 | BY | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the main line just north of the station.
The yard is visible from the main line.
The shed entrance is a gate in the station yard. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 2B | 01/07/1950 | Change of code to 4A | 01/03/1952 | Change of code to 1E | 05/07/1965 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to BY |
|
|
|