Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 7757 Today
» 7473 Yesterday
» 31097 Week
» 124331 Month
» 584272 Year
» 5023709 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Borough Gardens
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Borough Gardens |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | BOR | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 54C | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1958 | 52J | 01/10/1958 | 14/06/1959 |
|
Date Closed |
14/06/1959 |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north-east side of the line about half a mile
south of Gateshead East Station. The yard is partially visible from
the line.
From Gateshead East Station.
Turn left outside Gateshead East Station into Wellington Street,
and bear left after a few yards into Half Moon Lane. Turn right at
the end into Gateshead High Street. Continue for about a quarter of
a mile, and turn left into Park Lane (just past the traffic lights). Continue over the railway, and bear right into Park Road. The shed
entrance is on the right-hand side. Walking time 25 minutes.
From Gateshead West Station.
Turn left outside Gateshead West Station into a narrow street, and
sharp right after a few yards into Wellington Street. Pass the entrance
to Gateshead East Station, and follow directions from there.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to BOR | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 54C | 01/10/1958 | Change of code to 52J |
|
|
|