Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4034 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17440 Week
» 70456 Month
» 189983 Year
» 3216836 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Durran Hill (Carlisle) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 12C | 01/01/1923 | 16/02/1936 | 12a | 1943 | 31/01/1950 | 68a | 01/02/1950 | 31/01/1958 | 12a | 01/02/1958 | 02/11/1959 |
|
Date Opened |
02/08/1875 |
Date Closed |
02/11/1959 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
Durran Hill was originally closed by the LMS on 16th February 1936 but was reopened in 1943 as a wartime measure. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 12a | 02/08/1875 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 68a | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 12a | 02/11/1959 | Depot closed |
|
|
|