Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 639 Today
» 5387 Yesterday
» 29216 Week
» 89510 Month
» 549451 Year
» 4988888 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bournemouth
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bournemouth |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | BM | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 71B | 01/02/1950 | 28/09/1963 | 70F | 01/09/1963 | 05/05/1973 | BM | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
06/03/1888 |
Date Closed |
09/07/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LSWR |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
British Railways Region |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line west of Bournemouth
Central Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Leave Bournemouth Central Station by the approach road, and
turn left into Holdenhurst Road. Turn first left into Wellington Road,
and left into Beech Road. The shed entrance is on the left hand side
just before the railway underbridge. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to BM | 06/03/1888 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 71B | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 70F | 09/07/1967 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to BM |
|
|
|