Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bournville
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bournville |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 3B | 1895 | 31/12/1910 | 3a | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M3B | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 21B | 01/01/1923 | 14/02/1960 |
|
Date Opened |
1895 |
Date Closed |
14/02/1960 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line south of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Leave the station by the southern exit into Mary Vale Road. A
cinder path leads to the shed from a gate on the opposite side of the
road. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 3B | 1895 | Depot opened | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 3a | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M3B | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 21B | 14/02/1960 | Depot closed |
|
|
|