Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 125 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3638 Week
» 23931 Month
» 201835 Year
» 1867211 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ashford


Depot Details
Depot Name Ashford
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
AFD187531/01/1950
74A01/02/195030/09/1958
73F01/10/195828/01/1968
Date Opened 1931
Date Closed 28/01/1968
Big 4 Company SR
British Railways Region SR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Folkestone line south of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside the down (southbound) side of the station, or right outside the up (nortbound) side of the station. Turn left into the road that leads over the bridge at the north end of the station, and almost immediately turn left again into a private S.R. road that runs parallel to the railway. Continue along this road for about a mile passing the works entrance, and bear left all the time. At the end of this road turn left over a level crossing. A broad path leads to the shed from the left hand side of this road about 200 yards past the level crossing. Walking time 25 minutes.

A bus service labelled Hunter Avenue operates from the station to the shed entrance (near the terminus).
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to AFD
01/02/1950Change of code to 74A
01/10/1958Change of code to 73F
06/05/1973Change of code to AF