Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3597 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13891 Week
» 149296 Month
» 609237 Year
» 5048674 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bradford Hammerton Street
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | BFD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 37C | 01/02/1950 | 30/06/1956 | 56G | 01/07/1956 | 30/11/1967 | 55F | 01/12/1967 | 05/05/1973 | HS | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
03/1883 |
Date Closed |
1994 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line between St. Dunstans
and Laisterdyke. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Bradford Exchange Station into Leeds Road, and
right again into Vicar Lane. Turn left into Bridge Street, and continue
into Wakefield Road. Fork left into Bowling Back Lane, and the shed
entrance is on the left hand side. Walking time 15 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to BFD | 03/1883 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 37C | 01/07/1956 | Change of code to 56G | 1958 | Closed to steam locomotives | 01/12/1967 | Change of code to 55F | 01/03/1975 | Change of code to HS | 1994 | Depot closed |
|
|
|