Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 619 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14025 Week
» 67041 Month
» 186568 Year
» 3213421 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Brunswick
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Brunswick |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | LIV | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 13E | 01/02/1950 | 21/05/1950 | 8E | 22/05/1950 | 31/03/1958 | 27F | 01/04/1958 | 31/08/1961 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line east of Liverpool Central
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Cross the high level bridge from Herculaneum Dock (Overhead)
Station to Grafton Street. Turn left, and a few yards further on, there
is a gate in the wall on the left-hand side. A flight of steps leads down
to the shed from this gate. Walking time 5 minutes.
See also under Liverpool.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to LIV | 01/05/1950 | Change of code to 8E | 01/04/1958 | Change of code to 27F |
|
|
|