Depot: Buxton (LNWR)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5350 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8936 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9051 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9132 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 332 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 462 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5350 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1278 | Snapshot | W16 | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1420 | Snapshot | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2306 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2315 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2306 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2306 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2315 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2315 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2318 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2368 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2371 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2942 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2943 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3268 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3274 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3278 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3282 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3296 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 332 | Snapshot | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3387 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3842 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4019 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4080 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4360 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4548 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 462 | Snapshot | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 483 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2234 | 2-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6428 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6738 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7936 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7954 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8326 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8451 | Snapshot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8464 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8558 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8936 | Snapshot | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9009 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9051 | Snapshot | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9059 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9132 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9132 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9216 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9224 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9240 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9315 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9326 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9331 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9347 | Snapshot | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9386 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2372 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8731 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8734 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8740 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8741 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8742 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9009 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9212 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9224 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9315 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9386 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8745 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8746 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8749 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9216 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9240 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9331 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 4309 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 479 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/03/1948 | 9225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 9326 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 8466 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 9093 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 9376 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9450 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9093 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9305 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 9322 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 9059 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 08/05/1948 | 6738 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9322 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1948 | 3269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2372 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4019 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4365 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8127 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8166 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8268 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8322 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8421 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 40655 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 692 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 40438 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 483 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 49057 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 7757 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 9281 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 4360 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 8127 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 8166 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8166 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8519 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 46616 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7757 | Transfer out to: | 4E | Tredegar | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9281 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | m/e | 10/1948 | 7954 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 531 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 40693 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 49092 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 49348 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 531 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 531 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8466 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8558 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8741 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 49092 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 49092 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 49092 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 9450 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 9387 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 44548 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 49454 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 47936 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8514 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 8464 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 48465 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44080 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 43562 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43562 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43562 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3282 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8278 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 42318 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8278 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8278 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 40531 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1951 | 49347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 42315 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 40433 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40433 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40433 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 42350 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 49210 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 58083 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 58083 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 49454 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 58083 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 58042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 48731 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2234 | 2-4-0T | on | 14/03/1952 | 58092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 48514 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40536 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 46616 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 48342 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 43562 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 43271 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 48342 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 41905 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1954 | 43296 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43300 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40433 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40536 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44382 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 40655 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 40692 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48742 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48749 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 42344 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 12073 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 12073 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 41906 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 48165 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 12073 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 42673 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 12073 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 12073 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 42308 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 42673 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 12073 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 12073 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 12072 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48106 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48679 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 12073 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 13120 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12072 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 13123 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 48479 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 13120 | Transfer out to: | 13A | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 48106 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 13121 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 13123 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 12073 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 13121 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 13123 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 48734 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 12073 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42308 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42344 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42366 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42367 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 48734 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 48734 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 13120 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 13123 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 43836 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 13120 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48932 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49395 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49214 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49387 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/05/1957 | 49057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 48917 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42365 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42368 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1957 | 58083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 49315 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 58083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/11/1957 | 48917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 43329 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48709 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 43387 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41906 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 41906 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 48275 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 48745 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 48505 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 48709 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42886 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48165 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48275 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48465 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48479 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 48746 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42350 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 49400 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48166 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48326 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1958 | 43300 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 49423 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 49132 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 10/01/1959 | 43274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 43538 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 49281 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 49391 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 43562 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48268 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42886 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1959 | 49315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1959 | 43836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 49433 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 44375 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 49277 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44059 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 49395 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 49400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 41905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 41906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1959 | 43842 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1959 | 43538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 49406 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1959 | 43278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 48165 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 48558 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1960 | 43329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 44504 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 44125 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 49401 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 49453 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 48505 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44504 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44596 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49352 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 49262 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 49352 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 43185 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 43213 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 44125 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 44596 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 44375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 44490 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 48275 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 48389 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 44508 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 48062 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42942 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42943 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 48465 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 48428 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 44490 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1961 | 43562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 43822 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 49446 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1961 | 43268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 43760 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 19/08/1961 | 43185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 42314 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42379 | Transfer in from: | 12H | Tebay | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43257 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 43514 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 43257 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 48932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 49433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 49453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 49210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 49401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 49423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 49403 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 41286 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 49439 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 49277 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 49391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 48898 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 41286 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 43760 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 44016 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44083 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44016 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 42371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49350 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49425 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 43213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 44364 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 49403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42391 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 48898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1962 | 43822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1962 | 44553 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 42772 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 42926 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 42940 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44247 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44454 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44497 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 46465 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 46480 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 46430 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 44508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 44315 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44110 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 49425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48740 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 44524 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 44553 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 43514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44271 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44454 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 46430 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 49406 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 49446 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 49262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 49281 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 49350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 49439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 44524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 42391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 42772 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46401 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42926 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42940 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 42379 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 48519 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 48712 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48472 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 43947 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 44083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 44364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48261 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48165 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1964 | 44110 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 44165 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 44076 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 44315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 48421 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 48451 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 48558 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48773 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 68012 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 68079 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 43947 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 43947 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1964 | 44059 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1964 | 44165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 44025 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 48039 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48679 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48773 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 43947 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 44247 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 43967 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44599 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44025 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 44497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 44169 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 44353 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 44425 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 48039 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 48278 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48062 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48261 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48275 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48322 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 44353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 48464 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 44587 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 44310 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 44389 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 68006 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 68068 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 44063 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 44310 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 44389 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 68068 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 44587 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 44063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 44076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48166 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 48088 | Transfer in from: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 48495 | Transfer in from: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 48166 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 48389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 28/08/1965 | 43967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 44169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 44394 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48748 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 48532 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1965 | 44599 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 48171 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 46402 | Transfer in from: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 46484 | Transfer in from: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 48190 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 48327 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 44271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 44394 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48428 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48464 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 48369 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 48744 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 48748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1966 | 46401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1966 | 48108 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 48472 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 48753 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 48456 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 46485 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 48424 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48552 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46492 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 68079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 48088 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 48376 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 48442 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 46465 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 48753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 48552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46505 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46480 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 68006 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 68012 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1967 | 46402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1967 | 46484 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1967 | 46485 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1967 | 46492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1967 | 46505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 48376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/09/1967 | 48108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/09/1967 | 48456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 48171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 48495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 48471 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 48369 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 48336 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 48336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 48190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/02/1968 | 48424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 48442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48327 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48465 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48471 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48532 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48744 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton |