Depot: Cardiff East Dock
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Unclassified | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 14/02/1931 | 1338 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 12/1943 | 1338 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 2022 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 155 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1884 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1888 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1897 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2008 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2022 | Snapshot | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2022 | Snapshot | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2048 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2086 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2123 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2124 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2130 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2141 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2147 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2781 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 285 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 297 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 31 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | M | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 33 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 36 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 37 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 46 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | M | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 47 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | M | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 51 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 52 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 53 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 54 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 55 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 57 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 58 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 59 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 61 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 66 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 67 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6701 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6708 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6744 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 68 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 681 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 682 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 72 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 73 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 74 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7751 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8743 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 92 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 94 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1947 | 1707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 58 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 73 | Transfer out to: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1948 | 54 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 67 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 67 | Transfer out to: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1948 | 2781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 73 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 61 | Transfer out to: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 61 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | M | 0-6-2T | on | 18/10/1948 | 51 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2008 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1949 | 1897 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 210 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 285 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 297 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4616 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 31 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4616 | Transfer out to: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | M | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1949 | 47 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1949 | 53 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 1878 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1949 | 1884 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 1878 | Transfer out to: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1949 | 52 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 3783 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 24/11/1949 | 1610 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1949 | 1888 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1949 | 2022 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5603 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1950 | 61 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1950 | 2130 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 3681 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 39 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 8414 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 5603 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/06/1950 | 1620 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1620 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5710 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1620 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1950 | 2124 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1950 | 46 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 1620 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 3672 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 3672 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 3672 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1950 | 2141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1950 | 2754 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 1610 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1950 | 1705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 03/11/1950 | 6773 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6770 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6771 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3672 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 6770 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 6771 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 6770 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 6771 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4618 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6778 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6779 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 9776 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 66 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1951 | 74 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6778 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6779 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 9776 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6778 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6779 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 73 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 9776 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | M | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1951 | 33 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1951 | 8429 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1951 | 8469 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 35 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 63 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 8429 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 8469 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 8429 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 8469 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 35 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 63 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8464 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 35 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 63 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2086 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 59 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 38 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 40 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 38 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 40 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 41 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 57 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 2048 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2140 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1952 | 2150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 2140 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 2140 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1952 | 72 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 211 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1952 | 2140 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 210 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 59 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4616 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/05/1952 | 8484 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8484 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8484 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8478 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8484 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/07/1952 | 8489 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 8489 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 8489 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1952 | 63 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1952 | 67 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 8489 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1952 | 2123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 7711 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 210 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 211 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 56 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 58 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 66 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 8478 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 65 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1953 | 55 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1953 | 2147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8469 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1953 | 155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1953 | 56 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1953 | 95 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1953 | 40 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1953 | 682 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 279 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 290 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 83 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 7711 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 204 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 335 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 376 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 377 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 378 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 399 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 210 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 3650 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 5642 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1954 | 65 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 42 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6736 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 9769 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 03/1954 | 90 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 18/03/1954 | 335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | m/e | 04/1954 | 96 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 4698 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1954 | 279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1954 | 684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1954 | 82 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | m/e | 05/1954 | 93 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S | 0-6-0T | m/e | 05/1954 | 94 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 208 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 385 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 378 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1954 | 68 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 06/1954 | 91 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 06/1954 | 92 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 19/06/1954 | 308 | Transfer in from: | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3734 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4626 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 7738 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8722 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 376 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 349 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 371 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 374 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 381 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4686 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 399 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8465 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8469 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1954 | 58 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8424 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9494 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 377 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 381 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 385 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1954 | 683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 378 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 78 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 349 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 18/01/1955 | 371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 312 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1955 | 681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1955 | 210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 389 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 9470 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 378 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 377 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1955 | 83 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 7772 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1955 | 204 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1955 | 208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1955 | 290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1955 | 59 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1955 | 66 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 365 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3730 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 381 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5642 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 7772 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1955 | 39 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1955 | 78 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8400 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8459 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8787 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 43 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 44 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5724 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 8437 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 365 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 3707 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 19/09/1955 | 374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 312 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 8446 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 9477 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 3650 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 381 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 19/12/1955 | 308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/12/1955 | 3400 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 20/01/1956 | 389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 377 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/01/1956 | 3401 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 29/02/1956 | 3402 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 29/02/1956 | 3403 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5724 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 6721 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1956 | 3404 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5710 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 9470 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/04/1956 | 3405 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1956 | 41 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/05/1956 | 3406 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6769 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6774 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6775 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6779 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8459 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8469 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1956 | 44 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9494 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/08/1956 | 3407 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/08/1956 | 3408 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1956 | 37 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 8457 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 7751 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 8446 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 8465 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/10/1956 | 3409 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1956 | 35 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 9443 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 8400 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1957 | 43 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6700 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5687 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4698 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/05/1957 | 13363 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/05/1957 | 13364 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1957 | 13365 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1957 | 13366 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 13362 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 9769 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 9776 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13258 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13259 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13260 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13261 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13262 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13263 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13264 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13265 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3730 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3734 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3783 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6774 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6778 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8722 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8743 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8787 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1957 | 42 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 13266 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 4626 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 4686 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6770 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6771 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 7738 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1957 | 36 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1957 | 38 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9769 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 8437 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 13267 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1957 | D3397 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1957 | D3398 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1957 | D3399 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1957 | D3419 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/11/1957 | D3400 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/11/1957 | D3401 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1957 | D3402 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1957 | D3403 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5648 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9769 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1957 | 6708 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/12/1957 | D3404 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1957 | D3420 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1957 | D3405 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1957 | D3406 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/12/1957 | D3421 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/12/1957 | D3407 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1957 | D3422 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1958 | 6703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1958 | 6705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1958 | 6706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1958 | 6709 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1958 | D3423 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3400 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3402 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3403 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3404 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3405 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3406 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3407 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3408 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3409 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5648 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5687 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6704 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6707 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8414 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8429 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8457 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8464 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9443 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9477 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/02/1958 | D3424 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/02/1958 | D3425 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3681 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6769 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 8424 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1958 | D3427 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1958 | D3428 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6736 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6773 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6775 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1958 | D3426 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 6744 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6701 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6702 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | D3527 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 15101 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3593 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3594 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3595 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3596 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 15102 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 15103 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 15104 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 15106 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 13258 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 13267 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 13366 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3406 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3419 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3424 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3426 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3527 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3593 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 13258 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 13267 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 13366 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 15105 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3406 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3419 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3424 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3426 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3527 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3593 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3603 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3606 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | D3607 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | D3605 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3406 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D3747 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D3749 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | D3823 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D3403 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5043 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5073 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5081 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5092 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5097 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 7016 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 2887 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3755 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3784 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3804 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3810 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3862 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4242 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4633 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4918 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4936 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4953 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5220 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5224 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5225 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5261 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5749 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6326 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6345 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6681 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6822 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6847 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6859 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6909 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6912 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6918 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6935 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6936 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6939 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6944 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6950 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6995 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7317 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7805 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7820 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7913 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7925 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7927 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8466 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8471 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8484 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92003 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92208 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92210 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92216 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92219 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92232 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92236 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92237 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92241 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92244 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92246 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9426 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9461 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1962 | 4090 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1962 | 5015 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1962 | 5074 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6808 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6875 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6931 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6945 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6987 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 8425 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 9437 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 9651 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 22/10/1962 | 3755 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4272 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 13365 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15101 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15102 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15103 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15104 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15105 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15106 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3258 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3259 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3260 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3261 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3262 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3263 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3264 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3265 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3266 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3267 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3362 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3363 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3364 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3366 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3397 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3398 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3399 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3400 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3401 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3402 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3404 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3405 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3407 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3419 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3420 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3421 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3422 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3423 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3424 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3425 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3426 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3427 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3428 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3527 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3593 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3594 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3595 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3596 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3603 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3605 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3606 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3607 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3747 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3749 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3823 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6909 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92244 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 92244 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 9629 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6822 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/11/1962 | 7016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 7303 | Transfer in from: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1962 | 5029 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5937 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 8452 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 3689 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 3748 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8425 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8728 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9426 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9437 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9603 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9648 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9651 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9681 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9713 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9794 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8425 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8466 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9426 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9437 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 9651 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1963 | 5074 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1963 | 5097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 4618 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6941 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6808 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1963 | 4633 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 04/1963 | 5224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 9648 | Transfer out to: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/04/1963 | 5015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1963 | 4953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5984 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4618 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1963 | 7820 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1963 | 4918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1963 | 4090 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 7805 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5972 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6875 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6935 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6936 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6941 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1963 | 5092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 5749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 8728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 9713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1963 | 5056 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 4297 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6681 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6987 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 8471 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 08/1963 | 5225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 3862 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4297 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 92209 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 92243 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 2887 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3810 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4297 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 7317 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 10/1963 | 4272 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1963 | 6939 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 06/10/1963 | 92208 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1963 | 5081 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1963 | 5937 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1963 | 8425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3822 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 5231 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 7903 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 92220 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 92224 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3689 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3784 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6973 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 92216 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9426 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9437 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9461 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9603 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9794 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2875 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 3840 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 5952 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6914 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6984 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6987 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 7303 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92241 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92246 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 12/1963 | 5220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 5972 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1963 | 5043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5206 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 9437 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 6326 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 6345 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 92210 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 5029 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1963 | 5039 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1963 | 5042 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1964 | 3822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1964 | 4936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 6936 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/02/1964 | 5073 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1964 | 6912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1964 | 4242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1964 | 2875 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 04/1964 | 5231 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1964 | 6914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1964 | 8452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 5202 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 5056 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1964 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1964 | 3748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3837 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6826 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6863 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6957 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6995 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 9629 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 5952 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 7903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1964 | 5039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6820 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6958 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 9671 | Transfer in from: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1964 | 3804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 3818 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 4852 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6869 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6973 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 7913 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1964 | 6826 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 2859 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6945 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6987 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1964 | 6826 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3790 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 4285 | Transfer in from: | 88G | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 5979 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 7916 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 9676 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 2859 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3818 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3837 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3840 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 4852 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6918 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6958 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6984 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 5979 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 6863 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 6936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 92224 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6815 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6837 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6838 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6860 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6872 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 4285 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 5206 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 8484 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 92236 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 92237 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 92243 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 9437 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 7916 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 92232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1965 | 5984 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6935 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 02/1965 | 4297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 6860 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 6935 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 92243 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 92248 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 7923 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1965 | 5261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 92003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 92220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1965 | 9671 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 6876 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 7804 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 7811 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 7826 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 7826 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 7249 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 6826 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 3738 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 4623 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 5208 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 7249 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 3790 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 4623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 4639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 06/1965 | 5202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 06/1965 | 5208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1965 | 7923 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1965 | 9676 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 92209 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 92248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 6820 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 6837 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 6869 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 7811 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1965 | 9651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 3654 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 4612 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 92007 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 92209 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1965 | 6838 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1965 | 6872 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1965 | 3654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1965 | 3738 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1965 | 4612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1965 | 9681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 6815 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 6847 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 6859 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 6876 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 7804 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 7925 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 7927 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 92007 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 92243 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 92244 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 92219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6931 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6944 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 92209 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |