Depot: Carlisle Upperby
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 09/11/1933 | 13246 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 17/11/1933 | 13251 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 13263 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 13264 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 13266 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 2965 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1934 | 13258 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 2956 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 2962 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1935 | 13247 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1935 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 13248 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 13249 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 13250 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 13254 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 2953 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 2946 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 2951 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1935 | 2948 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5972 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5999 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5999 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1935 | 13254 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4495 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5593 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1936 | 2977 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1936 | 2964 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1936 | 2962 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1936 | 2953 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1936 | 2958 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 2963 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 2965 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1936 | 2970 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1937 | 2960 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1937 | 2955 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1937 | 5972 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1937 | 2970 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2946 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2956 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2960 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2966 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2977 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1937 | 2946 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1938 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1938 | 2947 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1938 | 2955 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1939 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1939 | 2946 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2946 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2949 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2950 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1947 | 6205 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12432 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4081 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4086 | Snapshot | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4086 | Snapshot | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4121 | Snapshot | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4346 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4390 | Snapshot | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4495 | Snapshot | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 46883 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4783 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4784 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4785 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4786 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4868 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4869 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4876 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4905 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4906 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4907 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4936 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4939 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5021 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5046 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5106 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5129 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5133 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5139 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5184 | Snapshot | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5193 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5243 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5244 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5246 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5293 | Snapshot | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5295 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5296 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5299 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5307 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5311 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5323 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5348 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5354 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5368 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5371 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5388 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5393 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5414 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5428 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5439 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5450 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5494 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5541 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5593 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5595 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5599 | Snapshot | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5677 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5718 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6110 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6128 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6137 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6226 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6228 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 654 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 673 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 699 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7295 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7326 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7340 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7377 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7408 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7415 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7614 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7664 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 25354 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4816 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4907 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 28583 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 46883 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25354 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4784 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4785 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5046 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1948 | 6205 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5517 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5523 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5542 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5567 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 6134 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 45378 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 6153 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 356 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5412 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 6255 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 5197 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 5508 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 12432 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 446 | Transfer out to: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4786 | Transfer out to: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 654 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4871 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 44086 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 6128 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 45687 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 45523 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5129 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5129 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 46137 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 45307 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 45567 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 46137 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46137 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46137 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 44906 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 45045 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4905 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 46158 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 46158 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 45630 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 45327 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 45508 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 46147 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 46137 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 46158 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 28417 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45345 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45512 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45514 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45506 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45678 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45718 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 46249 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 46250 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5553 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5563 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 58367 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 44868 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 5450 | Transfer out to: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 44907 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 45243 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 47327 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 4065 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45502 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45505 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46253 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45514 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46136 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 46136 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 46153 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5445 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 45021 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 45393 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 58367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 45551 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 45578 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 45578 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 40403 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 40403 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 40673 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 40403 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 40673 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45351 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45526 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45502 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45599 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46238 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46253 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45351 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45526 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45351 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45526 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 40448 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45718 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46238 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46253 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46110 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45718 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46238 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46253 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45718 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46238 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46253 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45133 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40673 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40673 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 47327 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 40673 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 40673 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 58376 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 58376 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 46134 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45524 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45524 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45519 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45524 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 43896 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12081 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12082 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12083 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12084 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12085 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12086 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 12087 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 43896 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 43896 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45519 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45524 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 12087 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12084 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12085 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12084 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 12085 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 44763 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45014 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46110 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46146 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45505 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45595 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45677 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45718 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46228 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46238 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40673 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 44763 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 45014 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46110 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46146 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 44763 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 45014 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46110 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46146 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 44763 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12084 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12085 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12086 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45505 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45508 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45524 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45537 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45593 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45677 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46226 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46228 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46238 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44869 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44871 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44876 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45014 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45505 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45508 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45516 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45524 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45537 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45593 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45599 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45677 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46226 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46228 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46238 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45505 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45508 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45524 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45537 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45593 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45677 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46228 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46238 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 58419 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45439 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 45438 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45140 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45624 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 46110 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 46146 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 46147 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46238 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46238 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45325 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45516 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45524 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45537 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45630 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46255 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45643 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44060 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45537 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45543 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45630 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45643 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44390 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45643 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45677 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45687 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46253 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46254 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45543 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 58376 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 45248 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 40582 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45248 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45248 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 12087 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40582 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45502 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45592 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40582 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45070 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45286 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45315 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45316 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46255 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45517 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45518 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45550 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45592 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45354 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45388 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46254 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45325 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45371 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 46226 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 45371 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 46146 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 46146 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 12/06/1954 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45129 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45311 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45316 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45505 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45508 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1954 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40396 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40412 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40536 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 46248 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45416 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 46135 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 40655 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 40692 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45543 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46116 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46126 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46141 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46228 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46248 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45500 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 46228 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 58412 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 45037 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 45329 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45180 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45504 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45506 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45513 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45524 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45630 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45643 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 42544 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45317 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 45382 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 46226 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 47292 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 46126 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 46126 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 46449 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 46130 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40628 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40629 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40656 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40657 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40695 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40582 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45070 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45184 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45248 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45329 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45382 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 45329 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 45139 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1955 | 13170 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1955 | 13171 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 44910 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45071 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45184 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45248 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45259 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45431 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45299 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45345 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 44126 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 45316 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 44910 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1955 | 40448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 45428 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47403 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47556 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1955 | 58412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 45037 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 45180 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 46141 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 46255 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 12087 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 46141 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 46255 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42343 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44596 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45552 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45613 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40536 | Transfer out to: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45552 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1956 | 12082 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 12082 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46116 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | DELTIC | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1956 | DP1 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 13171 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40536 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46116 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 13171 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45230 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45286 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45317 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45519 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 44916 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45402 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45508 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 46250 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | DELTIC | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1956 | DP1 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45182 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45286 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45317 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45328 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45394 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45503 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46135 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 44916 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46226 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 44916 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45182 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45328 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45503 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45519 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46250 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 13087 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 13088 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 47602 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 12081 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 12082 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 44916 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 44678 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45304 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45382 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45546 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 42404 | Transfer in from: | 11E | Tebay | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45304 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 40582 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45000 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45041 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45073 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45185 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40356 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40396 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40412 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40536 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40652 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40655 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40692 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 42404 | Transfer out to: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 46136 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 46136 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 42539 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 42664 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 42343 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40695 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40699 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44678 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45071 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45073 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45106 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45613 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46130 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 44834 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45002 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45073 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45195 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45271 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45308 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45613 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 46137 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44827 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45021 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45070 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45106 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45397 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45437 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46106 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45002 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45195 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45271 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45308 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46137 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46228 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42594 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45588 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45723 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 40657 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42544 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 44827 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45021 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45073 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 46116 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42426 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40582 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 45000 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 46126 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 46126 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42467 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 45299 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 46457 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 45299 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46233 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46236 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46237 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46243 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46244 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46250 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45041 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45184 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45382 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45409 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45613 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46106 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45025 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 45724 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 45500 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 45431 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45507 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45533 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45672 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46257 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45348 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45724 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46233 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46243 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 47664 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 45297 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 45542 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 45543 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 47391 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 47618 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 44016 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 44326 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 47288 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12083 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 45504 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 45506 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 45519 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 47337 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 45431 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 44816 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 45317 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 45494 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 45112 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 45317 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 45494 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42430 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42467 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45544 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45549 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45550 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46122 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46228 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46488 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46489 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44939 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45112 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45248 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45329 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45451 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45494 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45599 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D213 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 44939 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 46225 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 45431 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 45549 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 45550 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 46228 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | D216 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 42594 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 40629 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 44326 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/08/1959 | D229 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 42594 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/09/1959 | D230 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D212 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D225 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D229 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D230 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45236 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45451 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45555 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45688 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45703 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45721 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45734 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45738 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45741 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45742 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 47342 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 13171 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46122 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46126 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46136 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46141 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 46234 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 46256 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45502 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45507 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45508 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45533 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45537 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45541 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 40656 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40629 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1959 | 43896 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 47337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45507 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 46455 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 45070 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40629 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 46220 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 46233 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45414 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 45502 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 45508 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 46220 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 46233 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46256 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46449 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 46434 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | D225 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D6 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 45412 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 45438 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | D225 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 42539 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 44065 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45315 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45351 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45394 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45445 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45703 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46488 | Transfer out to: | 12F | Workington | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 47288 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45414 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45551 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | D255 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | D267 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 43011 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 43028 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 43029 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45351 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45703 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 42594 | Transfer out to: | 12G | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45258 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45414 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45734 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D5 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/08/1960 | D287 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 43073 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 13/08/1960 | 46209 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 46248 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D213 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D225 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45140 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 03/09/1960 | 46209 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 46248 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1960 | 45502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45501 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45503 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45505 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45510 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45511 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45513 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45524 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45544 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46136 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 47288 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 43029 | Transfer out to: | 12H | Tebay | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44596 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45593 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45672 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45696 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45734 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D295 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 44125 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/10/1960 | D5079 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 42301 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 42449 | Transfer in from: | 11C | Oxenholme | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | D295 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | D295 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 46136 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 42440 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 46108 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 13088 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45044 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45111 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 45508 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D288 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D212 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45555 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46236 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 40628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42426 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42664 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 46220 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 46221 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 11/02/1961 | 45511 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | D317 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | D330 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 46236 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 45297 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46221 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46237 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46244 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46255 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46257 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 43000 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 42301 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 44121 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 44125 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 46115 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 42440 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 42449 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/06/1961 | D91 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/06/1961 | D5079 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | D101 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42357 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42393 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45545 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45632 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45678 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45680 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45681 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 44936 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45721 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45723 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 46115 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 45295 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 12/08/1961 | 45503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 45295 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 45728 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1961 | 45501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 45731 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | D101 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45696 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 46129 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 45691 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 45716 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 42426 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 42664 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 46458 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1961 | D4107 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 44126 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | D138 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 46457 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1962 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1962 | 46201 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1962 | 46203 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42426 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42664 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 45505 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 45507 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D6 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45012 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45081 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45724 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45732 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 44016 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 44060 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45295 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45316 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45716 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45728 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 46129 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | D236 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 47340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45044 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45111 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 46221 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 46237 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/04/1962 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/04/1962 | 46203 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 47342 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46134 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 42393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 47667 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | D138 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 45193 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42613 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 45092 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D219 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42369 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43908 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44399 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44469 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45295 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45316 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42613 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 45532 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 45540 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46103 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46122 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46123 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46132 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46137 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46157 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46160 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46162 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46106 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46118 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 46141 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45588 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45678 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45680 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45681 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45688 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45691 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45703 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45724 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45731 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45732 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45734 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45738 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45741 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45742 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | D91 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 44937 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 45632 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 45082 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 45083 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 45437 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 45437 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 47269 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D289 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D291 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D294 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46136 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46103 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 47345 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/10/1962 | D5008 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 42369 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 42357 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 46201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 46123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 46137 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44452 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 45028 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 45072 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 43000 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 43028 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 43073 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44081 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 46106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 46127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 46122 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/12/1962 | D5008 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 47292 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 46108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 46234 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 46138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44081 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 44469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 45540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 46220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 44689 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 45083 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 46221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 44399 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D297 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D325 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 43004 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3087 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3170 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D4107 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 43011 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44689 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44939 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45012 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45025 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45028 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45072 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45081 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45082 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45092 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45106 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45185 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45236 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45244 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45246 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45259 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45286 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45293 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45295 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45296 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45316 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45317 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45323 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45351 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45368 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45397 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45402 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45437 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45451 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46157 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46160 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 47377 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 47408 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 47602 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 47666 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | D325 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44439 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D297 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | D317 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 46132 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 46162 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 46489 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 44439 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70036 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70037 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70038 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70039 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70040 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70041 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 43908 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 46426 | Transfer in from: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 70037 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 70038 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 70041 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1964 | 45532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 70036 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 70039 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 70040 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D217 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D317 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 14/03/1964 | 46236 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 44346 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1964 | 46136 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1964 | 46141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 43004 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1964 | 45545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1964 | 46118 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D292 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D293 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 44911 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 44939 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 45081 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 44484 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D217 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D292 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D293 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 44802 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 45106 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45527 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45736 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 44689 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 45531 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 46115 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 47415 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1964 | 47345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45527 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45531 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45736 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46237 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46250 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D223 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D228 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 46122 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 17/10/1964 | 46122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44390 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44484 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1964 | 45526 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 70029 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 70032 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 70048 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44689 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44802 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44911 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 45106 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 45512 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 46115 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 47288 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 47577 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 41222 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 41285 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | D223 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | D228 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D287 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D288 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D289 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D330 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 47667 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 70011 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 70013 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 47577 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 41217 | Transfer in from: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 13/02/1965 | 41264 | Transfer in from: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 47326 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 47614 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 47295 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 46513 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 70020 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 70030 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 70031 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 44390 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 41229 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 45340 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 45451 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 44081 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5700 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5701 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5702 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5703 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5714 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5715 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5716 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 45081 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 44939 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 70018 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1966 | 70019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41207 | Transfer in from: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D216 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D219 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D236 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D255 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D267 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D291 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D294 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D295 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D317 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | on | 06/06/1966 | D5700 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | on | 06/06/1966 | D5703 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 25/06/1966 | 70030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 46513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 46426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 46434 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3736 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3740 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3741 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46457 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46470 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1966 | 41207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1966 | 41229 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1966 | D3009 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1966 | D3283 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 41285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 11/12/1966 | 41264 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5704 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5705 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5706 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5707 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5708 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5709 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5710 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5711 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5712 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5713 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5717 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5718 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1966 | D5719 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 41217 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 41222 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 44937 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 45340 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 45371 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 46455 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 46457 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 46470 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70011 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70013 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70018 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70029 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70031 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70032 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70048 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 46458 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D3009 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D3283 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D3736 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D3740 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D3741 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1967 | 44834 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/07/1967 | D7672 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/07/1967 | D7675 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/07/1967 | D7676 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D7671 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D7673 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D7674 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D7677 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D5704 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D5709 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D5710 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D5713 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5701 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5702 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5705 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5706 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5707 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5708 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5711 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5712 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5714 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5715 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5716 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5717 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5718 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 28 | Co-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D5719 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7671 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7672 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7673 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7674 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7675 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7676 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D7677 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |