Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 40 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1877 Week
» 13022 Month
» 112807 Year
» 1778183 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Carnforth


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 5039 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 5333 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 5343 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 5392 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 103 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2267 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2428 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2429 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2431 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2432 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2544 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2601 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2613 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2615 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3189 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3237 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3329 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3570 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3757 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3760 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4060 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 41 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4118 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4126 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4374 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4375 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4510 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5039 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5039 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5050 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5291 Snapshot 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5306 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5333 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5333 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5343 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5343 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5392 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5392 Snapshot 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5427 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7317 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7339 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7406 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7407 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7409 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7410 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7503 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7605 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8934 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9109 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9151 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9188 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9269 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9314 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 43237 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 44118 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 03/1949 49110 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 49113 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 45333 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 09/1949 49269 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 10/09/1949 49188 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 43189 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 03/1950 48934 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 09/09/1950 7407 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44905 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/10/1950 42615 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45343 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 44874 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45004 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45072 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45133 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45241 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 40103 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 44126 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 49154 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/01/1951 40001 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 44364 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 40011 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49434 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49151 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 44892 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45019 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 44364 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 45017 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 45039 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45054 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49434 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 45092 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 49113 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45114 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45325 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45326 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44374 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 45114 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45050 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45325 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 44306 Transfer in from: 12C Durran Hill (Carlisle)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 44060 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 43984 Transfer in from: 23C Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 43984 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45004 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 45327 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 44454 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 45392 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/07/1954 42591 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 49154 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 01/01/1955 47605 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42544 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42601 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 49314 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/04/1955 42428 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/04/1955 42429 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 45133 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 45097 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 03/12/1955 47373 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 45037 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 42427 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 45291 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 42427 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 45291 Transfer out to: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45230 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45291 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/08/1956 42542 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 45241 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45014 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45046 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45291 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 45241 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/04/1957 42542 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 43240 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45303 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44904 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42431 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 49394 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43329 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49394 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42320 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/04/1958 40011 Transfer out to: 61C Keith    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 45072 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/04/1958 47503 Transfer out to: 11B Workington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 44375 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45092 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 21/06/1958 43757 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 44892 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42591 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 45072 Transfer in from: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42591 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 44892 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 43760 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/11/1958 44469 Transfer in from: 11E Tebay    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/01/1959 47342 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/02/1959 45317 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/02/1959 45494 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/02/1959 42320 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 43570 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 45317 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 45494 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 49428 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 49439 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/05/1959 45017 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/05/1959 45019 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/05/1959 45327 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 44905 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44305 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44445 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44905 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44939 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45494 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 43240 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 49439 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 45431 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 44939 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 44905 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 29/08/1959 40011 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 44905 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 45370 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45500 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45510 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45539 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45547 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45291 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45370 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45494 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 45511 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 45547 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44083 Transfer in from: 11E Tebay    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44345 Transfer in from: 11D Tebay    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45501 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45546 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45548 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42432 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42591 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45037 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45046 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45431 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47342 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47373 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44306 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 44445 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/12/1959 47339 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1959 43908 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/12/1959 47409 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/01/1960 D3838 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/01/1960 D3839 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 45592 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 45606 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 45632 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 45676 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 45686 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/01/1960 47401 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1960 90212 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 16/01/1960 D3840 1st Allocation        
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 16/01/1960 49428 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45501 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45511 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45546 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45548 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 06/02/1960 D3841 1st Allocation        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90178 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 D3841 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 D3841 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 44510 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 45592 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47317 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47401 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47406 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47410 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 26/03/1960 45500 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 26/03/1960 45539 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/04/1960 45097 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 16/04/1960 40081 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/05/1960 45072 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/05/1960 45592 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1960 42578 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42217 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45503 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/06/1960 47288 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/06/1960 47471 Transfer in from: 20H Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 40081 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44305 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45676 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 45097 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/07/1960 45606 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 06/08/1960 40011 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 13/08/1960 40016 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 13/08/1960 45606 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 27/08/1960 90212 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45513 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 10/09/1960 49428 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 10/09/1960 49449 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45503 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45510 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 17/09/1960 40081 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 17/09/1960 40118 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 44454 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/09/1960 47288 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/09/1960 47471 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1960 90178 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/10/1960 40041 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/10/1960 42217 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47473 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47514 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47522 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47668 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 D3838 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 D3839 Transfer out to: 21E Monument Lane    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 D3840 Transfer out to: 21E Monument Lane    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 D3841 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/11/1960 47341 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/12/1960 47341 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45394 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/02/1961 47662 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/02/1961 42578 Transfer out to: 65C Parkhead    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 25/02/1961 40206 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 11/03/1961 46203 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 11/03/1961 46211 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/03/1961 90187 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/04/1961 47662 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/06/1961 42319 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/06/1961 42359 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 45000 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 45002 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 45632 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 44302 Transfer in from: 12F Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 45344 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/06/1961 47375 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 m/e 07/1961 46211 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 08/07/1961 40016 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 44302 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 45002 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 18/07/1961 46203 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 44874 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 44874 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 19/08/1961 40118 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 26/08/1961 40086 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 02/09/1961 46200 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45582 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45633 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 09/09/1961 46203 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 09/09/1961 49196 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45513 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45696 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45714 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45730 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 44345 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45000 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45241 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45344 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45427 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47522 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/10/1961 49196 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/10/1961 40081 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/10/1961 44445 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/11/1961 42578 Transfer in from: 65C Parkhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/01/1962 42578 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 27/01/1962 46200 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Princess Royal 4-6-2 on 27/01/1962 46203 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/02/1962 40138 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/02/1962 42267 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 17/02/1962 40206 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/02/1962 47473 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 44016 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 44060 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/03/1962 47520 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44016 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 44016 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 44083 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45587 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45604 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45613 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45625 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45629 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/05/1962 47514 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/06/1962 45543 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/06/1962 45550 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/06/1962 45014 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42238 Transfer in from: 12G Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42322 Transfer in from: 12G Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42358 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42369 Transfer in from: 12G Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42457 Transfer in from: 11D Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42464 Transfer in from: 12G Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42571 Transfer in from: 12G Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42594 Transfer in from: 12G Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42613 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 44060 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42415 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42613 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45340 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45390 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45398 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45399 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/06/1962 40086 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/06/1962 40138 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42369 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 43908 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44016 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44469 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42315 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42358 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/07/1962 44445 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 11/07/1962 D4139 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/07/1962 42415 Transfer out to: 12H Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/07/1962 42378 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/08/1962 D4140 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 45306 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 08/08/1962 D4141 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/08/1962 D4142 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 45306 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/08/1962 47668 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/09/1962 47375 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/09/1962 47520 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44081 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44390 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 45097 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42457 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 45543 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 45686 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 45550 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 45582 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 49428 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 49449 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 45587 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/12/1962 42315 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 44081 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 44390 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45633 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90369 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90392 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/05/1963 42449 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/05/1963 42238 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42238 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44948 Transfer in from: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45072 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45092 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45209 Transfer in from: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45354 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/06/1963 47287 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45604 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45613 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45629 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45696 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45730 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/06/1963 42299 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/07/1963 90392 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/07/1963 45181 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/07/1963 45329 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 20/07/1963 45714 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1963 D4156 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1963 D4157 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1963 45645 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/09/1963 48519 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/09/1963 48712 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 07/09/1963 45625 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45604 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42464 Transfer out to: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45181 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45329 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 12/10/1963 42238 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 19/10/1963 42319 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 19/10/1963 45645 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/10/1963 47287 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/11/1963 45703 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42198 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44390 Transfer in from: 12F Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 09/11/1963 42571 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 44386 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 44464 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 44390 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/11/1963 42309 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44439 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 45209 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 45354 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90187 Transfer out to: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90369 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1964 44300 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1964 44439 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/02/1964 42147 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 45209 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47317 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47375 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47468 Transfer in from: 20H Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47599 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47616 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47641 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47662 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90187 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90369 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 18/04/1964 42378 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 44211 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90187 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90369 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/04/1964 42594 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1964 44464 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/05/1964 42680 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/05/1964 45095 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/05/1964 45294 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/05/1964 42154 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45328 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1964 47362 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1964 47531 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45592 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 27/06/1964 45606 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 45154 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 45451 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45154 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45303 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45394 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45451 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/07/1964 45604 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/07/1964 45703 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/07/1964 47641 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/08/1964 47616 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/08/1964 47375 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1964 47468 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44733 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44778 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 45286 Transfer in from: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 45495 Transfer in from: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 26/09/1964 42309 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1964 45212 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1964 45227 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 43066 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 43095 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 43105 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1964 44211 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 43011 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 43027 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 43036 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 43103 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 24/10/1964 42359 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 31/10/1964 43045 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/11/1964 42449 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/01/1965 45306 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 45212 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 45294 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 45340 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/03/1965 45286 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 20/03/1965 42299 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 27/03/1965 42680 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/04/1965 47317 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/05/1965 42147 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 08/05/1965 42198 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/05/1965 47662 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/05/1965 44386 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/05/1965 42105 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42118 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42247 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45212 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45342 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44894 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 45027 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42616 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 44809 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 45374 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/07/1965 42322 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/08/1965 44809 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/08/1965 42247 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/08/1965 45230 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42663 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/08/1965 45017 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/08/1965 45437 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48365 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48739 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/08/1965 47362 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/08/1965 47531 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 09/1965 45398 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 46400 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 43036 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 43045 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/09/1965 48365 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1965 43011 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/09/1965 45027 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/09/1965 45212 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/09/1965 45437 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/09/1965 42118 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 46499 Transfer in from: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/10/1965 47599 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/10/1965 42105 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 44300 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 44904 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/01/1966 44987 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/01/1966 45424 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/01/1966 42663 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48739 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/02/1966 42663 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/02/1966 42154 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/02/1966 42616 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/02/1966 42663 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/03/1966 42613 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 44667 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 44758 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 44889 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45014 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45025 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45193 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45373 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45394 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45435 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45445 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 46422 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 46431 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 46433 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 46441 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 46486 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 46514 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 43004 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 43023 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48247 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/06/1966 46514 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 46522 Transfer in from: 2D Banbury    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 44987 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 on 29/10/1966 92212 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3008 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3826 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48384 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/11/1966 92087 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/11/1966 92118 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/11/1966 92128 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 19/11/1966 43103 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 26/11/1966 43095 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 45001 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 45134 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/12/1966 45399 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/12/1966 46422 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 31/12/1966 43119 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 07/01/1967 43066 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1967 D3566 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1967 D4156 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2500 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2502 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2503 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 75019 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 75027 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 75039 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/02/1967 75015 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 25/02/1967 92087 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1967 D3200 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1967 D4157 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1967 45495 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 45326 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/03/1967 46431 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 01/04/1967 92077 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 43023 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 43027 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 45227 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 45373 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75026 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75041 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75042 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75058 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75059 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 44892 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/04/1967 46441 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2274 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2500 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2502 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2503 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 75019 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 75026 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 75027 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 75039 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 29/04/1967 75021 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 29/04/1967 75033 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/05/1967 48400 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/05/1967 48247 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46400 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46433 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46486 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46499 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46522 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/05/1967 48451 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/05/1967 48712 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 27/05/1967 43105 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/06/1967 D2392 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 75020 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 75043 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 17/06/1967 92016 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75009 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75010 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75034 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75040 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75048 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75062 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 43004 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 43119 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 44733 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 45014 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 15/07/1967 D7638 Transfer in from: 41C Wath    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/07/1967 D7638 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/07/1967 D7638 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/07/1967 D7638 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/07/1967 75059 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 08/1967 44667 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 08/1967 45193 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44897 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44963 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/08/1967 48384 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1967 45072 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1967 44948 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/09/1967 48400 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/09/1967 48451 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1967 45328 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 10/1967 45374 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1967 D245 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/10/1967 48519 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/10/1967 75010 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/10/1967 75040 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 21/10/1967 92016 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1967 44905 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/11/1967 75042 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/11/1967 92088 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/11/1967 92167 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/11/1967 92128 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1967 44778 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/12/1967 45092 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 75015 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 75033 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 75043 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 75058 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 D2390 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 06/01/1968 70013 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 75019 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 75027 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 75032 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 06/01/1968 92004 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 06/01/1968 92009 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 06/01/1968 92223 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 D2274 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/01/1968 44889 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 27/01/1968 75041 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 on 30/01/1968 92212 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1968 45054 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1968 75021 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1968 75034 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1968 75062 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/02/1968 75032 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/03/1968 45001 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 23/03/1968 92004 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 23/03/1968 92009 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/04/1968 92223 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/04/1968 45424 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/04/1968 92088 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 44877 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 45231 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/05/1968 92091 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/05/1968 92160 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/05/1968 D245 Transfer out to: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 11/05/1968 D2390 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D3007 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2392 Transfer out to: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 18/05/1968 D7638 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 25/05/1968 92091 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 25/05/1968 92118 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/06/1968 92077 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45209 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45435 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45445 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 29/06/1968 92160 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 29/06/1968 92167 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44735 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44781 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44809 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44871 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45200 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45206 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45268 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45310 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45330 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 73069 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1968 44758 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1968 44963 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1968 45200 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1968 45394 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1968 D3007 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 44735 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 44809 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 44874 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 44877 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 44897 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45095 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45134 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45206 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45231 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45268 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45310 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45330 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 45342 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 75009 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 75019 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 75020 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 75027 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/08/1968 75048 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3008 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3200 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3566 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4139 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4140 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4141 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4142 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 44894 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 45017 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 45025 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 45390 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 73069 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/08/1968 44781 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/08/1968 44871 Condemned      
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 on 17/08/1968 70013 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 24/06/1991 08659 Condemned