Depot: Cardiff Cathays
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Unclassified | 0-4-0ST | on | 15/01/1931 | 1338 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 14/02/1931 | 1338 | Transfer out to: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 46 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 38 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 5672 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 6401 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5644 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5684 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 64 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 38 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5672 | Transfer out to: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 6401 | Transfer out to: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5607 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5644 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5684 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | B1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 267 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 301 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 371 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6401 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 4820 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 6433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1420 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1420 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1425 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2066 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 267 | Snapshot | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 301 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 301 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 343 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 344 | Snapshot | rhy | Dowlais Central | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 346 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 347 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 348 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3597 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 360 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 364 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 371 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 371 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 383 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 393 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 46 | Snapshot | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5607 | Snapshot | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5614 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5651 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5659 | Snapshot | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5672 | Snapshot | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5681 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 64 | Snapshot | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6401 | Snapshot | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6433 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6433 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6435 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6615 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6635 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6635 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 1461 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 1461 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 301 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 301 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 1461 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5659 | Transfer out to: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6627 | Transfer out to: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5659 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 348 | Transfer out to: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 360 | Transfer out to: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 371 | Transfer out to: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 348 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 360 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 371 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 433 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6659 | Transfer out to: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6660 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 1461 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 6627 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 6660 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6659 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1948 | 301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1949 | 2724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2140 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4601 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5411 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 9631 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 345 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 377 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5601 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5636 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5669 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5670 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6612 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6647 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6665 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6682 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6684 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5605 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5624 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5651 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5658 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6615 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6648 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 9631 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5697 | Transfer in from: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5646 | Transfer out to: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6655 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6661 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 2140 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 2140 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1425 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5614 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 1425 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 433 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5617 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5659 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5659 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4601 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 83 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 286 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5678 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 286 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 5678 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 286 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 5678 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 01/09/1950 | 1629 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 1629 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 1629 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5623 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5630 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5653 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5654 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5683 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5692 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5659 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5661 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5672 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 6627 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5630 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5653 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5654 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5683 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5692 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5630 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5653 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5654 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5683 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5692 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3672 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 1629 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 3672 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 3672 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 1629 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4618 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1629 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4618 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 66 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1629 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4618 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 66 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 7242 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 73 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 66 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 7242 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 73 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 7242 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 73 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 434 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 434 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6664 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8420 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8424 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5411 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 375 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6603 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6603 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6603 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 6607 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8420 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 6607 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 6607 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1951 | 2066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 58 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 59 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 8424 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 58 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 59 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 58 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 59 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 57 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5659 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5617 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8471 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2140 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 371 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 393 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5617 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 8471 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5617 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 8471 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 1461 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 1461 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1952 | 8481 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1952 | 9470 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1952 | 57 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 8481 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 9470 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 8481 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 9470 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/04/1952 | 8482 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 1461 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 1461 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 8482 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5617 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 59 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 8482 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1952 | 73 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 8484 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 8484 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 8484 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 8489 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5650 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8489 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 8470 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 8478 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 58 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 66 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 18/11/1952 | 344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5639 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8455 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 9470 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 362 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 370 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5639 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5639 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1953 | 434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 4581 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1420 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1425 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1461 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1629 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4580 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4589 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8495 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9470 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5639 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5697 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6433 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6435 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6436 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6664 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 05/10/1953 | 346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5511 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5534 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5572 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5663 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5568 | Transfer in from: | WTD | Whitland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 7779 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 80 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 376 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 377 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 390 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 8455 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 9470 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 7726 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 5680 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 8489 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 384 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1954 | 80 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5677 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 9747 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5680 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 7249 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 7252 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 79 | Transfer in from: | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 399 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 7249 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 7252 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 5793 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9747 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5600 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5608 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5610 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6638 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 7249 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 7252 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 399 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5681 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 10/02/1955 | 360 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 378 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 307 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 7252 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 307 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 4224 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 7249 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 5626 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1955 | 79 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 7772 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5600 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5608 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5610 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5659 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 9426 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5637 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 6689 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 22/09/1955 | 345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 05/10/1955 | 343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 312 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 384 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4101 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4177 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4634 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4224 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5650 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 381 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 4105 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 5627 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 13/02/1956 | 384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 13/03/1956 | 307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 23/03/1956 | 367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 385 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5724 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5636 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 6423 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 387 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5636 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5710 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 6435 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 05/05/1956 | 348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 28/05/1956 | 362 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 11/06/1956 | 312 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 388 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6614 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8469 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 9426 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 361 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4581 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 4101 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 03/09/1956 | 391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 4101 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 4105 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 01/10/1956 | 388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 376 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 7751 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6606 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6648 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5677 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5678 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 05/11/1956 | 387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1956 | 347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 17/12/1956 | 378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 14/01/1957 | 376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 390 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5545 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5622 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5626 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 29/01/1957 | 361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6416 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 04/03/1957 | 364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 01/04/1957 | 305 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 01/04/1957 | 385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3727 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4122 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4123 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4124 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4126 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4129 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4672 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4698 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 381 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 383 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 390 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5687 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6434 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5727 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 7312 | Transfer in from: | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5545 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1957 | 5710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1957 | 5724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5727 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 7738 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 9769 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 9776 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 4553 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6434 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 7312 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9769 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 6434 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 6624 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5601 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9679 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5511 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5627 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5654 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6435 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3727 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4580 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4589 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5622 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5630 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5653 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5663 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6635 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 7751 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8482 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8484 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8489 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8495 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4101 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5572 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5793 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4122 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4123 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5574 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5670 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5534 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5568 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5692 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 7738 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 7772 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 7726 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 4124 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6402 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1958 | 7779 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5669 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6604 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 9679 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4634 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 9776 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 4126 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 4618 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5636 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4129 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 4672 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 4698 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8481 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5637 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6434 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1962 | 8470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 8471 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 6647 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 13365 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15101 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15102 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15103 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15104 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15105 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 15106 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3258 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3259 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3260 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3261 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3262 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3263 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3264 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3265 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3266 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3267 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3362 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3363 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3364 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3366 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3397 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3398 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3399 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3400 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3401 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3402 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3404 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3405 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3407 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3419 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3420 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3421 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3422 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3423 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3424 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3425 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3426 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3427 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3428 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3527 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3593 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3594 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3595 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3596 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3603 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3605 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3606 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3607 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3747 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3749 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D3823 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | D3186 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D3748 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1963 | 6607 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D3807 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D3808 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3255 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3256 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3257 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3403 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 11/04/1963 | 6638 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3520 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3809 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D3401 | Transfer out to: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6603 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6612 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3403 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3520 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 7242 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1963 | 6659 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3362 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3593 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3596 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3605 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3606 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 3672 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 6606 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1964 | 6682 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1964 | 5683 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D3823 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D3823 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D3186 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Margam | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 6624 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 6660 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D3365 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D3808 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D3255 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 06/09/1964 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 06/09/1964 | 6665 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1964 | 6684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1964 | 8469 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15101 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15102 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15103 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15104 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15105 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15106 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3256 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3257 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3258 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3259 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3260 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3261 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3262 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3263 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3264 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3265 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3266 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3267 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3363 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3364 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3366 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3397 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3398 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3399 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3400 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3402 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3404 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3405 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3407 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3419 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3420 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3421 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3422 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3423 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3424 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3425 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3426 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3427 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3428 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3527 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3594 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3595 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3603 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3607 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3807 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3809 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3823 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1965 | 4177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1965 | 6648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 6614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 6689 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D3749 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |