Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 54 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5585 Week
» 7323 Month
» 134766 Year
» 1800142 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Chester Northgate


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam C12 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7366 Snapshot        
Steam C13 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7400 Snapshot        
Steam C13 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7413 Snapshot        
Steam C13 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7414 Snapshot        
Steam C13 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7430 Snapshot        
Steam C13 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7436 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9274 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9281 Snapshot        
Steam C13 4-4-2T 2w/e 17/06/1950 67433 Transfer in from: WRX Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1950 69293 Transfer in from: NTH Northwich    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 69342 Transfer in from: LIV Brunswick    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 40425 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 27/01/1951 46643 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 40425 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 46643 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam C12 4-4-2T 4w/e 14/02/1953 67366 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 65140 Transfer in from:        
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 65208 Transfer in from:        
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1953 69332 Transfer in from: STP Heaton Mersey    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 40527 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41234 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41235 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41239 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 41215 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 41216 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 10/12/1953 40527 Transfer out to: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 41215 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 41215 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 41239 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam C13 4-4-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 67414 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 69281 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 41232 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 84001 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 84002 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 41234 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 41235 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 41321 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 65146 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 65156 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 65170 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 41216 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam C13 4-4-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 67400 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam C13 4-4-2T 3w/e 12/11/1955 67433 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 41280 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 48296 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 48626 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 65181 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam C13 4-4-2T w/e 25/02/1956 67436 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 48135 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam C13 4-4-2T w/e 28/04/1956 67430 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1956 41280 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 41324 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 78055 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 78056 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41231 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41237 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41244 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41321 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 84002 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 09/1956 78057 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 09/1956 78058 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 09/1956 78059 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42417 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 78031 Transfer in from: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 78038 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48626 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40002 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40004 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40069 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40070 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 41231 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 41232 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 41237 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 41244 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 41324 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam J10 0-6-0 on 06/12/1956 65181 Condemned      
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 65140 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 65146 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 65156 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 65170 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam J10 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 65208 Transfer out to:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 40202 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 78057 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/03/1957 40004 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 48135 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 48296 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/06/1957 40002 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42303 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42308 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42415 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 40069 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 40070 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 40202 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 78055 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 78055 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam C13 4-4-2T w/e 07/12/1957 67413 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 78038 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/05/1958 69274 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/05/1958 69293 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/05/1958 69332 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/05/1958 69342 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 78056 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 78059 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 78031 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 78055 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 78058 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 25/07/1959 41323 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 29/08/1959 42308 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/10/1959 42317 Transfer in from: 11D Oxenholme    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 75030 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 75052 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42415 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/01/1960 41215 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/01/1960 41323 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42303 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42317 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42417 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 75030 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 75052 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 09/01/1960 84001 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street