Depot: Copley Hill (Leeds)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1924 | 1169 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1924 | 6166 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1924 | 1164 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/09/1924 | 274 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1924 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1924 | 6100 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1925 | 6098 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1925 | 6168 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1925 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1925 | 6104 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1925 | 6101 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1925 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1925 | 6167 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1925 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1925 | 6166 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1925 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1925 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/10/1925 | 3274 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1925 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1925 | 6102 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1925 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1925 | 6167 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1925 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1926 | 4657 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1926 | 6095 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1926 | 6096 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 18/02/1926 | 4419 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1926 | 6068 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1926 | 6068 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1927 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 16/02/1927 | 4419 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/03/1927 | 4419 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/03/1927 | 4419 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1927 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1927 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1927 | 1286 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/02/1928 | 4657 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/03/1928 | 5053 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1928 | 5416 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1928 | 5053 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/07/1928 | 3276 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1928 | 5416 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/12/1928 | 3276 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1929 | 1289 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1929 | 1289 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/07/1930 | 206 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/07/1930 | 206 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/05/1932 | 4433 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 03/08/1932 | 3280 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/09/1932 | 4423 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/09/1932 | 4657 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1932 | 6103 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/09/1932 | 4659 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1932 | 6095 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1933 | 6097 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1933 | 6101 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1933 | 6104 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/05/1933 | 4659 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1933 | 6101 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/09/1933 | 4453 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1933 | 4657 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/11/1933 | 4453 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1934 | 2706 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1934 | 2706 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1935 | 6099 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 30/09/1935 | 4460 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 5763 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1936 | 2553 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/10/1936 | 2555 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/11/1936 | 4460 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1936 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1936 | 1286 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/12/1936 | 4423 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/09/1937 | 4473 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/09/1937 | 3280 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/11/1937 | 4473 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/11/1937 | 4473 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 03/01/1938 | 3280 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/01/1938 | 4473 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/06/1938 | 3299 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/07/1938 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/07/1938 | 5373 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/08/1938 | 4428 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/11/1938 | 5373 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/02/1939 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/07/1939 | 3300 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1939 | 6096 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/07/1939 | 4661 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/08/1939 | 6097 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1940 | 6098 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1940 | 6099 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1940 | 6100 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1940 | 6101 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1940 | 6102 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/02/1940 | 2555 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/02/1940 | 2553 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/11/1940 | 3299 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/11/1940 | 4428 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1941 | 6100 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/03/1942 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1942 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/07/1942 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1942 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 16/08/1942 | 4433 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1942 | 6100 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/09/1942 | 3300 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1942 | 6101 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/12/1942 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1943 | 2552 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1943 | 2557 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 15/02/1943 | 4445 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1943 | 4478 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 3300 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 6101 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 23/05/1943 | 4433 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 23/05/1943 | 4445 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/09/1943 | 2551 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/09/1943 | 4478 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/09/1943 | 2557 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/09/1943 | 2545 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/10/1943 | 4480 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/10/1943 | 2554 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1943 | 4480 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/12/1943 | 4478 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/12/1943 | 4481 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 2551 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 4478 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 4481 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/08/1944 | 2562 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1944 | 2543 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1944 | 4475 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/12/1944 | 2545 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/12/1944 | 2554 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/12/1944 | 2546 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1944 | 2552 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4816 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4824 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4832 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4848 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4885 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 2543 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 2546 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 2562 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4475 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/06/1945 | 4803 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 6099 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/07/1945 | 3668 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/08/1945 | 3668 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/11/1945 | 4851 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 6099 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/12/1945 | 4445 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/02/1946 | 752 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/03/1946 | 752 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/04/1946 | 802 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 02/05/1946 | 2863 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/05/1946 | 802 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1946 | 732 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1946 | 745 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1946 | 761 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1946 | 780 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1946 | 814 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1946 | 877 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/08/1946 | 3301 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/10/1946 | 2809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1946 | 1493 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1947 | 1483 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1947 | 1488 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1947 | 1031 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 1033 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1947 | 4749 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4173 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4260 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67377 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67388 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7353 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7356 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7383 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7386 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8911 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8913 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8937 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8945 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8946 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8978 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8984 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8988 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9303 | Snapshot | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9430 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9472 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 8925 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1948 | 4749 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/05/1948 | 60536 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1948 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 46 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 523 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 56 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 62 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 46 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 56 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 62 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 46 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 56 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 62 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1948 | 60537 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 62828 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 67377 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 7383 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 07/1948 | 67388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 22/07/1948 | 62829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1948 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 1295 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/11/1948 | 60134 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/11/1948 | 60118 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/11/1948 | 60119 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/11/1948 | 60136 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/12/1948 | 523 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 69437 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9473 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/12/1948 | 853 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1948 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1948 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/01/1949 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 22/01/1949 | 2875 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 67386 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/04/1949 | 1297 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/04/1949 | 4886 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/04/1949 | 64887 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 1297 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 4886 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 64887 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 1297 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 4886 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 64887 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 68945 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 68946 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 67356 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/05/1949 | 60128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 61085 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 61096 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 61085 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 61096 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 61085 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 61096 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/10/1949 | 61029 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/10/1949 | 1297 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 61029 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 61029 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1949 | 60144 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 60144 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 60144 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1950 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 61810 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 61810 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/04/1950 | 60044 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/04/1950 | 60146 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/04/1950 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/05/1950 | 60141 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/05/1950 | 60136 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60112 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60114 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60117 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60120 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60123 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60125 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60133 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 4886 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60128 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60144 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60146 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 61029 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 61031 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 61085 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 61096 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64887 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60112 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60114 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60117 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60120 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60123 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60125 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60133 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60112 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60114 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60117 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60120 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60123 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60125 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60133 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1950 | 61029 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/11/1950 | 60061 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/11/1950 | 60112 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 60061 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 60061 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1951 | 61310 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 69483 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/02/1951 | 60061 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1951 | 61029 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 67440 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 69483 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 69472 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 69483 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 9271 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 67440 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 67440 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/04/1951 | 60112 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 60112 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 60112 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 67353 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 69450 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 67440 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/07/1951 | 60139 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/07/1951 | 60144 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69450 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69450 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 60139 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 60144 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 60139 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 60144 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/07/1951 | 61309 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 61309 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 61309 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60846 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60861 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60044 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60046 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60056 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60062 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60112 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60123 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60144 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 60846 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 60861 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 60846 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 60861 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/10/1951 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/10/1951 | 60865 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/10/1951 | 60913 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 60865 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 60913 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 60865 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 60913 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 67353 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1952 | 61386 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1952 | 61387 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1952 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1952 | 61310 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 67353 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 67353 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61386 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61387 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61386 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61387 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64276 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64277 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64250 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64260 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/05/1952 | 60117 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61129 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61377 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61129 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61377 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61129 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61377 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/07/1952 | 60107 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 60107 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 60107 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/08/1952 | 60107 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69266 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/09/1952 | 69473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69477 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69477 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69477 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1952 | 61388 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 67353 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 61388 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 61388 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1953 | 60117 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1953 | 60131 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1953 | 60114 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1953 | 60125 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 18/05/1953 | 67372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1953 | 60125 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1953 | 60158 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/06/1953 | 60846 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/06/1953 | 60861 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/06/1953 | 69446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67353 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 69462 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 69468 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67353 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1953 | 61295 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1953 | 60122 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1953 | 60148 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/10/1953 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1954 | 60859 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1954 | 61377 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 08/03/1954 | 69468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1954 | 60051 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1954 | 60053 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1954 | 60106 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1954 | 60125 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1954 | 60148 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1954 | 60158 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1954 | 64911 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/06/1954 | 60058 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 61155 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 61162 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/07/1954 | 69437 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 69436 | Transfer out to: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 69462 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 69471 | Transfer out to: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 69477 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1954 | 60133 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67438 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69691 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69694 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69695 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69696 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1954 | 61162 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1954 | 61155 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 69440 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/03/1955 | 69483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 69696 | Transfer out to: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1955 | 60052 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1955 | 60148 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1955 | 60106 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1955 | 60122 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1955 | 60119 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1955 | 60139 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 69691 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 69695 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 67433 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 69696 | Transfer in from: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/09/1956 | 60885 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1956 | 61214 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67280 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67311 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/10/1956 | 69444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69469 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69694 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69696 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/12/1956 | 69430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67246 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67329 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69434 | Transfer in from: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 67246 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 67329 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 69457 | Transfer in from: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67280 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67311 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67433 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67438 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/04/1957 | 69469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/04/1957 | 69457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 69462 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 69477 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60123 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60130 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 61267 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 61320 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60051 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60052 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60053 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60058 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 68937 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64911 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60843 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60976 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61017 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61115 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61339 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 64911 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/09/1958 | 60843 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/09/1958 | 60865 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/09/1958 | 60913 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/09/1958 | 60976 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61267 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61387 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1958 | 64276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/11/1958 | 68978 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40074 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40112 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40114 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 61189 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 61017 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/03/1959 | 69434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/03/1959 | 69450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 02/04/1959 | 69477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/04/1959 | 69462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60837 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60864 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60877 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60939 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 43099 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 43100 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/08/1959 | 61388 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68892 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68948 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 68892 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 68948 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 64268 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 43099 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 43100 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/11/1959 | 60837 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/11/1959 | 60864 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/11/1959 | 60877 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/11/1959 | 60939 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/11/1959 | 60885 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 42649 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 42650 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60069 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60072 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 68892 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42649 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42650 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/06/1960 | 60808 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/06/1960 | 60809 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/08/1960 | 68913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60808 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60809 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60859 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 42073 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 64203 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1960 | 64911 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 64173 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60115 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60135 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60145 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60069 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60072 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 22/11/1960 | 68911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 42411 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 40074 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1961 | 64268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1961 | 60036 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1961 | 60069 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1961 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1961 | 60077 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 42094 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 68977 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1961 | 61016 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1961 | 61100 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/08/1961 | 61189 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/08/1961 | 61386 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 44912 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 45219 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 68932 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 68977 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60036 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60069 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60077 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42094 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 64226 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 64203 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 12/12/1961 | 68932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/04/1962 | 60123 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/04/1962 | 60131 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/04/1962 | 60134 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/04/1962 | 60135 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61023 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61123 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1962 | 64226 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1962 | 64277 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/11/1962 | 60118 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/11/1962 | 60115 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 19/11/1962 | 40112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 19/11/1962 | 40114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 61100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61385 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/03/1963 | 68925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/03/1963 | 68984 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 41250 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 82026 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61382 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44912 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45219 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/09/1963 | 60120 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/09/1963 | 60141 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/09/1963 | 60145 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 61016 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 61023 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 61115 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 61214 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 61309 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 42311 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 42622 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 82026 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68892 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/11/1963 | 41250 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61123 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61129 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61320 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43101 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43137 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 42311 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 42411 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1964 | 61031 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1964 | 60117 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1964 | 60130 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1964 | 60148 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1964 | 61031 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1964 | 61382 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1964 | 61385 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 42073 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 42622 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 43101 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 43137 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield |