Depot: Corkerhill
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 4156 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2804 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2880 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5575 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 17632 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5576 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1110 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1127 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1148 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1149 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1182 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15140 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15143 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15182 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15193 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15206 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15235 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16350 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17241 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17255 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17300 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17359 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17560 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17695 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17698 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2275 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2276 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2277 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2804 | Snapshot | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2880 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2910 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2911 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2912 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2915 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2916 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2917 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4156 | Snapshot | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5047 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5049 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5168 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5560 | Snapshot | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5575 | Snapshot | 27J | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5575 | Snapshot | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5576 | Snapshot | 27J | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5576 | Snapshot | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5643 | Snapshot | 29F | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5644 | Snapshot | 29F | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5645 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57561 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57566 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57580 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57589 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57594 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57596 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57632 | Snapshot | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 594 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 595 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 596 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 598 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 599 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 637 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 641 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 651 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7329 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 905 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 906 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 909 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 919 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 920 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 2275 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 2276 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 2277 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1148 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1149 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1182 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 03/04/1948 | 622 | Transfer out to: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1127 | Transfer out to: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 4969 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 15193 | Transfer out to: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 40913 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 1110 | Transfer out to: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 40920 | Transfer out to: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 42915 | Transfer out to: | 12G | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 4969 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 915 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 2200 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 2688 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 2200 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 2688 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 42913 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 57624 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42744 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42745 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 57561 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42744 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42745 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42744 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42745 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 4329 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 43899 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 44159 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 44198 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 42744 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 42745 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 42910 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 42912 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 42917 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 45163 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 45174 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 45575 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 45644 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 24/04/1950 | 42917 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 592 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40592 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40592 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 40908 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 15182 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | K | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 17695 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | K | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 17698 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 40592 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40908 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40908 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1951 | 57594 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1951 | 57594 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 57594 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 57594 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45010 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 45010 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 45010 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 40620 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 45010 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1951 | 43996 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/04/1951 | 43996 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 44001 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 45362 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/04/1951 | 43996 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 45119 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42212 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 42212 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 42380 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45119 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 42212 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45119 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42419 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42420 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42212 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45119 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45166 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 40620 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 07/12/1951 | 80024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 13/12/1951 | 80025 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42229 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42380 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42914 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 42914 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45160 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 42911 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 57359 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 11/03/1952 | 80030 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42420 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42190 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/03/1952 | 57255 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42190 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42191 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42190 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42419 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 42191 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 42742 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 42806 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 42191 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45047 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45049 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45163 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 57579 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42742 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40605 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40572 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 57359 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 45491 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/09/1952 | 55140 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45560 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45576 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45643 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45646 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44791 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45621 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45665 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45687 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45711 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45720 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44159 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45645 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 80000 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40572 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40605 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40620 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40651 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40598 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/12/1952 | 80008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 55143 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 30/12/1952 | 80009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 45168 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 41133 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 08/06/1953 | 40566 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 40598 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 40607 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 40651 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 41142 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/07/1953 | 55135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40620 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40666 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41134 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41139 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45030 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45030 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 20/11/1953 | 40905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 14/12/1953 | 40566 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 40607 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 40666 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 29/01/1954 | 40919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 44968 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 40602 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 40913 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 41126 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 41141 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 41146 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 41176 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 45030 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 45175 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 03/09/1954 | 40914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 45173 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 45677 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 45707 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 41126 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 41141 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 14/09/1954 | 41139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 17/09/1954 | 41134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 29/09/1954 | 41133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/10/1954 | 40915 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 26/10/1954 | 41146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 40602 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 40651 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 55187 | Transfer in from: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 07/01/1955 | 40906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 21/01/1955 | 41176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 42697 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 18/02/1955 | 55187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 42806 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1955 | 73079 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 06/07/1955 | 40908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 45011 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 42914 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 11/08/1955 | 40913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1955 | 73100 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1955 | 73101 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 40604 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1955 | 73102 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1955 | 73103 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1955 | 73104 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 42917 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 45011 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 45030 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 07/11/1955 | 80127 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 23/11/1955 | 80128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 42916 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 45166 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 45175 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 57266 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/03/1956 | 45173 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 42697 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1956 | 40909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1956 | 41142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/08/1956 | 45174 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 10/1956 | 56249 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/10/1956 | 57589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 40647 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 44189 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 56364 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 56267 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 57309 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/01/1957 | 55211 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/07/1957 | 56350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 57560 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 57580 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1957 | 76095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 57566 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1957 | 57575 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1957 | 57579 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 40647 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 44329 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 57594 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/11/1957 | 56369 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 45707 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 45711 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 57596 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 57562 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 56156 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 45707 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 45711 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 55227 | Transfer in from: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/07/1958 | 56267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 45007 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 45161 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 06/10/1958 | 80030 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 44319 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 56279 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 55227 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 40595 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 55269 | Transfer out to: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1959 | 80030 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 42238 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 42240 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 42247 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 05/1959 | 47329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 05/05/1959 | 40599 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1959 | 57241 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 42800 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 42801 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 45053 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 45452 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 54472 | Transfer in from: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 54473 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Forres | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 55203 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 55264 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 56031 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 57620 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Forres | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40011 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 42270 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 42271 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 56029 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 80005 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 54472 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 54473 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 40011 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 45677 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 42211 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 42800 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 45251 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 45490 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 45621 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 45720 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 56029 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/10/1959 | 56156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 12/11/1959 | 40594 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 12/11/1959 | 40598 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 12/11/1959 | 40636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 40649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 42271 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 42801 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45160 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45161 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45194 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45452 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45665 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45707 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45711 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 44159 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 44330 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40603 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40641 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40642 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 56031 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 04/02/1960 | 80046 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42211 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42229 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42238 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42240 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42247 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42270 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 44323 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 68458 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 44319 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 11/03/1960 | 80047 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40602 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40613 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40615 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40629 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40651 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 40695 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 14/03/1960 | 80044 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 80052 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 42191 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 11/04/1960 | 80050 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 22/04/1960 | 80048 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 05/05/1960 | 80049 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45164 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45384 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45486 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45621 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45665 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45707 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45711 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45720 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 07/05/1960 | 80045 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 07/05/1960 | 80051 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 80053 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 44723 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 44798 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45124 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45460 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45673 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45677 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45692 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45727 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 55231 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/06/1960 | D2439 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45365 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45467 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 40602 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 40651 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 40695 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/07/1960 | D2440 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 17/08/1960 | D2441 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45486 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 05/09/1960 | D2442 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 45007 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 45489 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 28/09/1960 | D2443 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45053 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45384 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 31/10/1960 | D2444 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1960 | 56279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/11/1960 | 56361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45486 | Transfer in from: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45486 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/12/1960 | 56364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1961 | 40627 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1961 | D3922 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1961 | D3923 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/01/1961 | D3924 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1961 | D3925 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1961 | D3926 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 45124 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 45467 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 55264 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 68458 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 76095 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 40629 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D24 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 45192 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 25/05/1961 | 55219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 25/05/1961 | 55235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 06/06/1961 | 55231 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 40603 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 44699 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45171 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45361 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45366 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 55221 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80111 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80112 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80111 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80112 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 11/07/1961 | 40603 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 80020 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 80021 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 45192 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | D24 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | D2442 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | D3926 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 40650 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 57249 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 57359 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | 40596 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | 40637 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1961 | 43996 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 27/09/1961 | 55206 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | on | 27/09/1961 | 55266 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 40621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 12/10/1961 | 55221 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | D2442 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 42203 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 44801 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45488 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45497 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76091 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76093 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76094 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 80000 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 80128 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 40613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 40615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 23/10/1961 | 40620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 42203 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 43899 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 44159 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 44189 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 44198 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 57300 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 21/12/1961 | 55203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 76095 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 45497 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 08/01/1962 | 55225 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | D147 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 80000 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 80128 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D2444 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1962 | 44001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44784 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44785 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45117 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45123 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45470 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45479 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 70050 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 70051 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 70052 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44784 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44785 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45117 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45123 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45470 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45479 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 76114 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | D147 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1962 | 57620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44784 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44785 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 44322 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 76001 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Fort William | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 45164 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 45460 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 44323 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 44330 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | 45467 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 70050 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 70051 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 44322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45687 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45693 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45720 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1962 | 61134 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1962 | 61197 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1962 | 61243 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1962 | 61261 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1962 | 61355 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1962 | 61396 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 44707 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 44957 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 44967 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 44996 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 73005 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 73006 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 73009 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 73077 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 73120 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 76099 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D2441 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 44801 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1963 | 61134 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1963 | 61197 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1963 | 61243 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1963 | 61261 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1963 | 61355 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1963 | 61396 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44707 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44957 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44967 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44996 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | D2438 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45362 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45488 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45361 | Transfer out to: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | 44723 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | 45365 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 17/04/1964 | 45366 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | D3201 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | D2443 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 44699 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 44784 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 45467 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 76001 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 76091 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 76099 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 08/06/1964 | 80048 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 08/06/1964 | 80030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 08/06/1964 | 80049 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | D3277 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 73057 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 80000 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 76094 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 80000 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 44785 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 07/07/1964 | 80052 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 07/07/1964 | 80053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 13/07/1964 | 80008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 13/07/1964 | 80021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 73006 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 73106 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 80077 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 80112 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 30/07/1964 | 80127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 08/1964 | 42190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 80063 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/09/1964 | 80009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 12/10/1964 | 80077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 80004 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 80005 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 14/11/1964 | 80044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1964 | 80050 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 78026 | Transfer in from: | 67F | Stranraer | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/01/1965 | 73077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 76095 | Transfer out to: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 80045 | Transfer out to: | 66F | Beattock | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70052 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/06/1965 | 44791 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/06/1965 | 45171 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 26/06/1965 | 80020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1965 | 73103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1965 | 73104 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45488 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76046 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3215 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | D3216 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D3201 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D3277 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/03/1966 | 73057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 45214 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 45357 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | D3198 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44699 | Transfer in from: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44723 | Transfer in from: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44995 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45084 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 73105 | Transfer in from: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45084 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1966 | 73005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 73009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 17/08/1966 | 80051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1966 | 73101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/08/1966 | 78026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/08/1966 | 80024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/08/1966 | 80025 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/08/1966 | 80047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/08/1966 | 80063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/08/1966 | 80112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 44798 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1966 | 73105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1966 | 44723 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | D3198 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 76114 | Transfer out to: | 66F | Beattock | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1966 | 44995 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1966 | 45488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 45124 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 45214 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 45357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 73102 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 73120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 31/12/1966 | 80000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1967 | 73100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 45124 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/02/1967 | 76093 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D3409 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 04/04/1967 | 80128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | 73079 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1967 | 44699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/05/1967 | 76046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 01/05/1967 | 80004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 01/05/1967 | 80046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D2439 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D2440 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D3215 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D3216 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D3898 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D3396 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D3922 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D2438 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D2442 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3297 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3409 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D3924 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D3733 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1970 | D3906 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1970 | D3297 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1970 | D3898 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D3923 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3925 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3728 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3396 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3733 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3906 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3728 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield |