Depot: Crewe North
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 01/08/1935 | 6206 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/08/1935 | 6207 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/08/1935 | 6208 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 23/08/1935 | 6209 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 24/08/1935 | 6206 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 31/08/1935 | 6207 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 31/08/1935 | 6208 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/09/1935 | 6209 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 25728 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5027 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5297 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 6102 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 6129 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 6135 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 6159 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 22922 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25698 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25835 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25840 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 25698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 25728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 25835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 25840 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2925 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5131 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5677 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/6 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/1936 | 7074 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2392 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5586 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5665 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5671 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1936 | 5742 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1936 | 5740 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1936 | 5741 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1937 | 5299 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1937 | 5300 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 04/08/1938 | 6207 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/08/1938 | 6207 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/09/1939 | 6202 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/09/1939 | 6204 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1939 | 6212 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/10/1939 | 6204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/10/1939 | 6212 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1940 | 22922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 10/08/1940 | 6207 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 10/08/1940 | 6208 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 28/09/1940 | 6203 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 05/10/1940 | 6201 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 02/11/1940 | 6205 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 02/11/1940 | 6203 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/08/1941 | 6202 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1942 | 6209 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 02/06/1942 | 6206 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1943 | 6200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1943 | 6210 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1943 | 6211 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1943 | 6212 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1943 | 6206 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/05/1943 | 6204 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1943 | 6206 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1943 | 6203 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/01/1944 | 6205 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1944 | 6200 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1944 | 6201 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1944 | 6203 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1944 | 6204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 24/03/1945 | 6201 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 24/05/1945 | 6204 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 6126 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 6157 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2925 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/12/1946 | 1200 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/12/1946 | 1202 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/12/1946 | 1201 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/12/1946 | 1203 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/12/1946 | 1204 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1112 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1115 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1160 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1167 | Snapshot | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1173 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1200 | Snapshot | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1201 | Snapshot | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1202 | Snapshot | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1203 | Snapshot | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1204 | Snapshot | 4E | Tredegar | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2392 | Snapshot | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4758 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4759 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4760 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4764 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4765 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4766 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4767 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4788 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4789 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4790 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4801 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4807 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4808 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4832 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4833 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4834 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4835 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4836 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4837 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4838 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4862 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4863 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4864 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4865 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4874 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4875 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4908 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4952 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4954 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4967 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5027 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5131 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 529 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5299 | Snapshot | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5300 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5374 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5422 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5511 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5512 | Snapshot | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5539 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5542 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5548 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5549 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5551 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5578 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5586 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5596 | Snapshot | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5600 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5632 | Snapshot | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5637 | Snapshot | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5647 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5665 | Snapshot | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5671 | Snapshot | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5674 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5677 | Snapshot | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5686 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5688 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5722 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5737 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5740 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5741 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5741 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5742 | Snapshot | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6102 | Snapshot | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6113 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6115 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6125 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6126 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6126 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6129 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6135 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6146 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6147 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6154 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6155 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6157 | Snapshot | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6159 | Snapshot | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6163 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6166 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6167 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6227 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6229 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6233 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6234 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6235 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6236 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6256 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6711 | Snapshot | ||||
Diesel | D3/6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7074 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 6680 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 6680 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 6681 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 25400 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5054 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5298 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5511 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 6256 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4758 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4759 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4760 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4761 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4762 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4763 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4764 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4768 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4769 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4770 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4771 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4772 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4773 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4758 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4759 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4760 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4764 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 402 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 405 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 448 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5511 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5517 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5054 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5294 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 25400 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5298 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 479 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 13/03/1948 | 6200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 4870 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 46154 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 46162 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 46236 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 6246 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 6711 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 6153 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 22/05/1948 | 6605 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5528 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 6710 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4801 | Transfer out to: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4835 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4836 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4862 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4952 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4967 | Transfer out to: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5517 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5539 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5542 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5676 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5737 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 6147 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 6153 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 12/06/1948 | 6681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 45555 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5412 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5637 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5647 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 6248 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 45741 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 25301 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 25332 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 6643 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 45303 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 46236 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4829 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4860 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6126 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 28551 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 5508 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 45532 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6643 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 28385 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 25332 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 28551 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 46227 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4788 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4789 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4790 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 1154 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 5070 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 926 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 5549 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 40332 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 45724 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 45734 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 46130 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4862 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 527 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5539 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5543 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5547 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5634 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5733 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5737 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5738 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5742 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 6128 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 6157 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 45512 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 46112 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 45523 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 45687 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 40471 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45535 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45422 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45436 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 45675 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5511 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 44829 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 44832 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5511 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 44834 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 44838 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1948 | 44716 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5534 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 25301 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 45303 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 45596 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5294 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5374 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5493 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5522 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1948 | 44717 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46119 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46243 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5534 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 6710 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2266 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/12/1948 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/12/1948 | 46201 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/12/1948 | 46204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5534 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 6710 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/12/1948 | 492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/12/1948 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/12/1948 | 46205 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 45045 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 45294 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 45303 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 5374 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Experiment | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 5522 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 40322 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 44908 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 45630 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 45092 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 46158 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 45294 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5374 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 5445 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 45013 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 45014 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 40405 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45015 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45241 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45454 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45506 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45510 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45529 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45678 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 28/05/1949 | 46204 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5553 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44864 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44865 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44874 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44875 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45070 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45709 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45724 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45737 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5445 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 58010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 45549 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5552 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 45006 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 45096 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 46146 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 46157 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40479 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41115 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 46146 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 46157 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 527 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 09/1949 | 46710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41115 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42677 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45606 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45647 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45709 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45718 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45721 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45726 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45737 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45741 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46225 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46229 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45006 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45013 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45014 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45015 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45096 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45454 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45534 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46115 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 01/10/1949 | 46204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 01/10/1949 | 46205 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 46229 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 45555 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 44808 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 45606 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2447 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 40529 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 41173 | Transfer out to: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 42309 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 44860 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 44863 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 44862 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2447 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44860 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44863 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 45513 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2447 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 45551 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 45742 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 45513 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 45513 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 44874 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 45721 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 45737 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 45738 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 58371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 42309 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 42447 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 45303 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 58388 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44716 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44768 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44769 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44772 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44773 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44807 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44860 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44863 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44870 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44874 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45092 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45503 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45511 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45539 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45549 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45555 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45600 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45603 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45632 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45688 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45709 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45718 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45734 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 46119 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 46161 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 5552 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45502 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45738 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 10/06/1950 | 46204 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 58429 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45726 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45741 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44681 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44682 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45502 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45503 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45511 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45592 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45738 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44759 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45502 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45738 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46130 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 45503 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 45511 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 45592 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 45503 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 45511 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 45592 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 425 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 40448 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45241 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45547 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41151 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45724 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46118 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42309 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 30/09/1950 | 46204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41151 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45724 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46118 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46459 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45724 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46118 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1950 | 41285 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1950 | 41286 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1950 | 41287 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1950 | 58388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45028 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45547 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 46158 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 42677 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45535 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45558 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 46158 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 42318 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44911 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45217 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45305 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45703 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44767 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 46158 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 46459 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1950 | 41288 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1950 | 41289 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 42318 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45305 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45703 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 41115 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 42318 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44911 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45028 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45305 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45547 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45703 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44717 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 45535 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 46130 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 41285 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 41286 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 41287 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44717 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 58429 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40527 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42447 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 45547 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40425 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 45305 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42447 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42447 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45587 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45669 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46143 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46144 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46153 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44763 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45703 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46113 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45587 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45669 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46143 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46144 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46153 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45587 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45669 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46143 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46144 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46153 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 41076 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 45587 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 41112 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 45587 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41076 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44759 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44771 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45510 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41076 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44717 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45217 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45669 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46143 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46144 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46153 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46157 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40425 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 42677 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 42447 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 42677 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45509 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 42677 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 23/06/1951 | 46206 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 23/06/1951 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46134 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46140 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/07/1951 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45523 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45528 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45535 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45647 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45738 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46146 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46134 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46140 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46134 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46140 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 46236 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/07/1951 | 46206 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 41160 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/07/1951 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45509 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45509 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45511 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45587 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41288 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 44763 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 44763 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 41289 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 44763 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44871 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45001 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45528 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45535 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46151 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1951 | 46205 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/09/1951 | 46207 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/09/1951 | 46208 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 41210 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44871 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45001 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45528 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45535 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46151 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44871 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45001 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45528 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45535 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46151 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 41160 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 46161 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 41210 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 40529 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 45604 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1951 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 45509 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 41288 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 41289 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45604 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45604 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42318 | Transfer out to: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1952 | 41320 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44685 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44871 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45001 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45678 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 42318 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 41288 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 41289 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45592 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1952 | 41324 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45592 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 05/04/1952 | 80034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45128 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 46110 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44871 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 31/05/1952 | 80034 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44871 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45689 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46132 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44871 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45128 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45689 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45128 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45369 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45678 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 44871 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45506 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45529 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46132 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46161 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46225 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46229 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 42666 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 45524 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 58426 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 41324 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 45724 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/09/1952 | 46205 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40413 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40447 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40567 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45307 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45506 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45510 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45516 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45529 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45544 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46106 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46111 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46126 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46161 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46162 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46225 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46253 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46255 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45543 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1952 | 58426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45028 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45048 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45195 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45543 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 46143 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 46254 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40567 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45028 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45048 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45195 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45543 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46143 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 58389 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40567 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45028 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45048 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45195 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45502 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45543 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46143 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46162 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 46254 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 46143 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 01/1953 | 46680 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45195 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45195 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 46137 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 46156 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 42666 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 46126 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1953 | 58389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42449 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42670 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45235 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42318 | Transfer out to: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45592 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45686 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 46118 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44840 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44911 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45148 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45240 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45300 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45350 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45446 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 46118 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 46119 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42449 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42670 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45028 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45048 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45128 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45195 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45307 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 45369 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 46110 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44708 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44827 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40527 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 45604 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 46119 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 23/05/1953 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 23/05/1953 | 46203 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 13/06/1953 | 46201 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/06/1953 | 46202 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 04/07/1953 | 84000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 06/07/1953 | 84001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44807 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45307 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45578 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45604 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45726 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46119 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46242 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45350 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45528 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45529 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46106 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46111 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46130 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46161 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46254 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46255 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 08/08/1953 | 84000 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 08/08/1953 | 84001 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45071 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45689 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1953 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44871 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45006 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45254 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45271 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45354 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45381 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45385 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46106 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44681 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44708 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 40419 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 41060 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 44871 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45271 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45354 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45381 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 46159 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45385 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/12/1953 | 40425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 45385 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 45529 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 42316 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 45385 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 40583 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46422 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 45006 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45373 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 41076 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 46422 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1954 | 42953 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42961 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 46604 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 46119 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1954 | 40529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | DUKE | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1954 | 71000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1954 | 46202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45555 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45556 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45591 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45535 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46140 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46159 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1954 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45402 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45726 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 46248 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 46129 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 45555 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 45726 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 46118 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 46604 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1954 | 42963 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 18/09/1954 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 25/09/1954 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 41229 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 41901 | Transfer in from: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45528 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45736 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46118 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46119 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46159 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46248 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45543 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 23/10/1954 | 46206 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45703 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 46120 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | DUKE | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71000 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 46134 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | DUKE | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71000 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40522 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 46249 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 46242 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1955 | 42955 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1955 | 42953 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45382 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45625 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45630 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45643 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45721 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 40583 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45504 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45506 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45513 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45516 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45524 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45544 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45547 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45603 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 46134 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 78033 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45307 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45528 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 45382 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 78033 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 44911 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 41322 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 45528 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 46225 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | DUKE | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 71000 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 46225 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | DUKE | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 71000 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 25/06/1955 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1955 | 41154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 46119 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 46151 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 46159 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45071 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45736 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/09/1955 | 40419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 01/10/1955 | 46211 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 45282 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46119 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46159 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46120 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1955 | 40522 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 42677 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45625 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42321 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42677 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 45625 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 42677 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 42964 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 44827 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 45528 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 28/01/1956 | 46212 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 04/02/1956 | 46210 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 04/02/1956 | 46210 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 18/02/1956 | 46210 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 18/02/1956 | 46210 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 42677 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45736 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45678 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 10/03/1956 | 46212 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45000 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45002 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45150 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45390 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45678 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45003 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45528 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 78030 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 42316 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45148 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45148 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 44840 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45301 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/06/1956 | 46211 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1956 | 42964 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45379 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45403 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46120 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 41322 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1956 | 46211 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/07/1956 | 46211 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45369 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45002 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45403 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45591 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1956 | 41160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45402 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1956 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1956 | 46210 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45545 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46110 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46151 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46161 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46226 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46252 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45503 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45302 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45503 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45000 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45003 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45390 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46159 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 46226 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45546 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45591 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45603 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45643 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 46137 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 46159 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45003 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45390 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45546 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45643 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 46135 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 46137 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 41060 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45545 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40652 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40653 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40655 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40673 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40692 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 42575 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40332 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40402 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40413 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40447 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 45545 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 46137 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40925 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 41119 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 41159 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 41168 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 44807 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/06/1957 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/06/1957 | 46204 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 22/06/1957 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 40926 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40679 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44678 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45624 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45655 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41119 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41901 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45150 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45625 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46106 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46129 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41119 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41901 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45188 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45516 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45625 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45723 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/09/1957 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/09/1957 | 46204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45189 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46228 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46253 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45516 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 46253 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 44827 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45021 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45073 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45111 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45305 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42321 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45003 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45188 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 45723 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 46110 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41220 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41906 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40567 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40673 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40925 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41159 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 40692 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 41906 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 41220 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42578 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 45689 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 41901 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45148 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45240 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45630 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45689 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/05/1958 | 42966 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/05/1958 | 42968 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41119 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 41220 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 45630 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 45300 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45501 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45519 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45587 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45613 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45623 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45629 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45689 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1958 | 46204 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41168 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44827 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45111 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45254 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45302 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45305 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46119 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46120 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46156 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46233 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46243 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 05/07/1958 | 46201 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 05/07/1958 | 46204 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45148 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45240 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 46220 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 46221 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45613 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 45503 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 06/09/1958 | 46209 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 42946 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 42954 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 42958 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/09/1958 | 46203 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45004 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45093 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45250 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45254 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45256 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45257 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45305 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45311 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45348 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45503 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46110 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46116 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46119 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46120 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46131 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46152 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46157 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46233 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46241 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 46243 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45507 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45519 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45587 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45624 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45678 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 45243 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 45256 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 46119 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 46131 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 46170 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 41212 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 29/11/1958 | 46211 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 40679 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 40679 | Transfer in from: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 45613 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42776 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42815 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42937 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42946 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42955 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42961 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 40652 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/06/1959 | D217 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45578 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45595 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45678 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45679 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45696 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45704 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/06/1959 | 46200 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 20/06/1959 | 46209 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44682 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44758 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44766 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45373 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46118 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46135 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46161 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46221 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46228 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46234 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/06/1959 | D216 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D215 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 42963 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 46228 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 42963 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 46225 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D215 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 45546 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 45503 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/07/1959 | D218 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/07/1959 | D219 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 44681 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/07/1959 | D220 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 46169 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | D216 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | D217 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | D218 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 45390 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 46151 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/07/1959 | D221 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/07/1959 | D222 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/08/1959 | D223 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | D219 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/08/1959 | D224 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | D220 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 45348 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/08/1959 | D225 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/08/1959 | D226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | D212 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | D221 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | D222 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | D224 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 45132 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 45678 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/09/1959 | D231 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42940 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 44844 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45003 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45348 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 46135 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 46147 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 46164 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45613 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/09/1959 | D232 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D227 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D229 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D230 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 42779 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 42963 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D212 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D223 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D225 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 42963 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/09/1959 | D233 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/09/1959 | D234 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 45704 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/09/1959 | D235 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 44862 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 44678 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/10/1959 | D236 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D226 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D229 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D231 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D232 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D233 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D234 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D236 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44678 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45237 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/11/1959 | 46211 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 70046 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 70047 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 70048 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 40659 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42779 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42937 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44862 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45501 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45548 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45703 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45721 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 70045 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/11/1959 | 46211 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 40655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40653 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40660 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40679 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D233 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 46170 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 70045 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 70048 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 44911 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45037 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45046 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 45070 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | D233 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | D255 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45696 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 46147 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 70046 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 45137 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D255 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D255 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/03/1960 | D268 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 41212 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 44840 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 44869 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45196 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45395 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 41212 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45137 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 46220 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 46233 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 46220 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 46233 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46149 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | D268 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 45623 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 45679 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46233 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | 14/05/1960 | D10 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | |||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | D3 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | D8 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | D255 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D235 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45670 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45696 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45737 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 42578 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 44869 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45070 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45736 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46120 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46135 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46170 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46243 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46246 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46248 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 46252 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 41212 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 45737 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45676 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45703 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 44840 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45196 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45395 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | D224 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45603 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45734 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45740 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45703 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 46152 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/08/1960 | D288 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 46152 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 46170 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 13/08/1960 | 46209 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 70047 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/08/1960 | D289 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D227 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/08/1960 | D290 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D288 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/08/1960 | D291 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 03/09/1960 | 46209 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | D289 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/09/1960 | D292 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | D227 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45534 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45736 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 46108 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 46111 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 46115 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 46127 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 46135 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | D290 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 12/09/1960 | D293 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D220 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D291 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45148 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/09/1960 | D294 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 46248 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 46256 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | D292 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 45603 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/09/1960 | D295 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | D220 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 46221 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 46229 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | D220 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45696 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45734 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45740 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/10/1960 | D296 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/10/1960 | D68 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/10/1960 | D305 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D293 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D294 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D295 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/10/1960 | D297 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/10/1960 | D306 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/10/1960 | D298 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/10/1960 | D69 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 42079 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | D296 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 46170 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/10/1960 | D299 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/10/1960 | D307 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 46136 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/10/1960 | D300 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/11/1960 | D301 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 45282 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 45305 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 46108 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/11/1960 | D302 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/11/1960 | D308 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 12/11/1960 | D70 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D233 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D5133 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D220 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D224 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D227 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/11/1960 | D309 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/11/1960 | D303 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 19/11/1960 | D72 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D297 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D298 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D299 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D68 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/11/1960 | D71 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/11/1960 | D73 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 44780 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 44937 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45034 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D307 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D308 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45655 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D69 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/11/1960 | D304 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1960 | D310 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/11/1960 | D76 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/12/1960 | D75 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | D68 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 45670 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/12/1960 | D74 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/12/1960 | D311 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/12/1960 | D325 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/12/1960 | D77 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D301 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D305 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D309 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 45684 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D70 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/12/1960 | D312 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D68 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D71 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D72 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/12/1960 | D313 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/12/1960 | D326 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | D304 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | D310 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/12/1960 | D5133 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/12/1960 | D314 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/12/1960 | D327 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45270 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | D300 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | D306 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | D312 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42776 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42815 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42940 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | D73 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 48408 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D302 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D74 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D75 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D76 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D77 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/01/1961 | D328 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/01/1961 | D315 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/01/1961 | D5060 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | D313 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | D314 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | D326 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45528 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45529 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46159 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/01/1961 | D329 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/01/1961 | D316 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | D303 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | D328 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D325 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D327 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D329 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/01/1961 | D330 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/02/1961 | D317 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/02/1961 | D331 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | D302 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 46220 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 46221 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/02/1961 | D5060 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/02/1961 | D332 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/02/1961 | D318 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/02/1961 | D333 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | D317 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | D330 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | D331 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | D332 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/03/1961 | D334 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/03/1961 | D319 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/03/1961 | D335 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1961 | 46205 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1961 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/03/1961 | D336 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/03/1961 | D320 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/03/1961 | D337 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D318 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/03/1961 | D338 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | D318 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | D328 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/04/1961 | D321 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/04/1961 | D339 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46229 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46241 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46249 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 19/04/1961 | D340 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/04/1961 | D322 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 22/04/1961 | D321 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/04/1961 | D341 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/05/1961 | D342 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 44780 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 45037 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 45379 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 46115 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 19/05/1961 | D323 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D321 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D233 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D302 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D318 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | D233 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | D303 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42923 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42934 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45552 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45554 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45560 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45567 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45578 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45587 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45613 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45631 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45638 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45655 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45671 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45740 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42958 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42968 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 44844 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 44911 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45003 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45034 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45073 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45534 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45545 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46111 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46152 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 46157 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/06/1961 | D324 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 46149 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | m/e | 07/1961 | 46211 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 42964 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45721 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45723 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 46166 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 08/07/1961 | 46206 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 18/07/1961 | 46203 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/08/1961 | D344 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 02/09/1961 | 46200 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1961 | 46203 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1961 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42781 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42926 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42933 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45225 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45241 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42954 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42963 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42964 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42966 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45638 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45655 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45671 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45740 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 48408 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45142 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45148 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/10/1961 | 46211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 07/10/1961 | 46212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 46110 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 46116 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 46134 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | D291 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | D302 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | D318 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 44937 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 45630 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | D213 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | D292 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | D296 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/12/1961 | D369 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/12/1961 | D370 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/12/1961 | D371 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | D344 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | D369 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | D370 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | D371 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | D344 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | D291 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45004 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45045 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45142 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45254 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45567 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 46164 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1962 | 46209 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D8 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D8 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D10 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D3 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 45148 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D8 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 46129 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 46169 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 42781 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 42923 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 42926 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 42933 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 42934 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45235 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45237 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45311 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45348 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45369 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45587 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45604 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45613 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45625 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45629 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 46127 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D5006 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D5009 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D5012 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46128 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 46166 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1962 | D5005 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D2 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5005 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42677 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D223 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D293 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D299 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D300 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D326 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42100 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42227 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45567 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45647 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45709 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45021 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45046 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45189 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45225 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45257 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D214 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 46161 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | D2 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 70044 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 70053 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 70054 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | D223 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 42227 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 46135 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 46136 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 46161 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D298 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D301 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D304 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D313 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D331 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D332 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45021 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45046 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45189 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45257 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5133 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70016 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70018 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70020 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45736 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46128 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46129 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | D299 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | D326 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 42575 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46170 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | D2 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42575 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42079 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | D2 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 42575 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 45723 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | DUKE | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 71000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 70016 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 42100 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 45643 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 45240 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 45567 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/01/1963 | D5008 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/01/1963 | D5082 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/01/1963 | D5083 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 70050 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 70051 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45567 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/01/1963 | D5017 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45241 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 46253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45142 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45353 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D297 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D299 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45033 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45631 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45647 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45674 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45676 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45709 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 46251 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 46254 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 45257 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 45270 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 45353 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 46251 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 46254 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70000 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70025 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70042 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70019 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 41204 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45534 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45704 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46120 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46144 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 78007 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D297 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D298 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 41212 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 41220 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | D374 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 70030 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | D296 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1963 | 46120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 45189 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1963 | D5000 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1963 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D297 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D298 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70033 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45021 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45046 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45093 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45132 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45142 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45446 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D5000 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D5006 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 45250 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1963 | 45591 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 45709 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 45726 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1963 | D5009 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1963 | D5012 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 23/11/1963 | 45709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45560 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1964 | 46144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 45647 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 45647 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D290 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D305 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D306 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D309 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | D312 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41204 | Transfer out to: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 44759 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 70053 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 45721 | Transfer out to: | 16F | Burton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | D290 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | D292 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | D293 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44963 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 45250 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1964 | 45534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 41204 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D229 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D231 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D296 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D343 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44684 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44759 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45001 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45048 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45067 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45272 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45418 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 70034 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 70043 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 41204 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 78007 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D217 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D292 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D293 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D269 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D310 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D314 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D374 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45250 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45272 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 46245 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 45631 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1964 | 45631 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1964 | 45556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 46248 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D229 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D231 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D269 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D310 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D314 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D343 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44684 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44759 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44963 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45001 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45048 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45067 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45567 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45595 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45689 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46245 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | m/e | 10/1964 | 46254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 46256 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 45674 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1964 | 45674 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/1964 | D1631 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 78030 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/11/1964 | D1632 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1964 | 45553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1964 | 45554 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/11/1964 | D1634 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/11/1964 | D1633 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/11/1964 | D1635 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1964 | 46165 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D5144 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D5145 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D214 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D217 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D230 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D233 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D292 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D297 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D298 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D299 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D301 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D302 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D304 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D305 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D306 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D309 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D312 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45418 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1964 | D5009 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1964 | D5012 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 45689 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1964 | 45689 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D288 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D289 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D330 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70004 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70010 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70012 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70020 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70031 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5009 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5012 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5144 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5145 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44762 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44763 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44764 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1965 | 45704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 45567 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 45595 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1965 | 45567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1965 | 45595 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 70027 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 70046 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D309 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D312 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D329 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1813 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1815 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 44761 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D309 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D312 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D329 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/04/1965 | D1839 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/04/1965 | D1841 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/05/1965 | D1837 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/05/1965 | D1838 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/05/1965 | D1842 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/05/1965 | D1843 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/05/1965 | D1844 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 23/05/1965 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 41212 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 41229 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44678 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44681 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44685 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44765 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 45243 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70000 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70010 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70012 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70018 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70019 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70025 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70027 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70030 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70031 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70033 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70034 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70042 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70043 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70044 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70046 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70051 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 70054 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D1813 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D1815 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D288 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D289 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D313 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D321 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D324 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D315 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D320 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D323 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D331 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D334 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D337 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D340 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5008 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5017 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D318 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D322 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D339 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D344 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70050 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D300 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5083 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1631 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1632 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D5133 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1633 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1634 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1635 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1837 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1838 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1839 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1841 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1842 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1843 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1844 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D213 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D293 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D296 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D303 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D311 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D316 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D319 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D328 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D330 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D332 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D333 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D335 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D336 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D338 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D341 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D342 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5082 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division |