Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Cricklewood East
Type |
Class |
Wheels |
Period |
Date |
Number |
Event |
Code |
Depot |
Length of Stay |
Notes |
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
04/1892 |
6 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
08/1893 |
2218 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
08/1893 |
2219 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
08/1893 |
2220 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2221 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2222 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2223 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2224 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2225 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2226 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1893 |
2227 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2218 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2218 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2219 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2219 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2220 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2220 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2221 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2221 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2222 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2222 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2223 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2223 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2224 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2224 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2225 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2225 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2226 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2226 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2227 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
01/1899 |
2227 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
6 |
0-4-4T |
|
01/1899 |
6 |
Snapshot |
28 |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1900 |
2626 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2218 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2218 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2219 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2219 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2220 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2220 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2221 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2221 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2222 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2222 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2223 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2223 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2224 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2224 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2225 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2225 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2226 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2226 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2227 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2227 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1902 |
2626 |
Snapshot |
14H |
Hitchin (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1371 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1371 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1372 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1372 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1373 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1373 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1374 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1374 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1375 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1376 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1377 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1378 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1378 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1379 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1381 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1383 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1384 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1385 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1425 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1426 |
Snapshot |
14H |
Hitchin (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
05/1908 |
1427 |
Snapshot |
15S |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1254 |
Snapshot |
3 |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1371 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1372 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1373 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1374 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1378 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1381 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1383 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1384 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1385 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1425 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1426 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
04/1914 |
1427 |
Snapshot |
18 |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1254 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1254 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1373 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1374 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1375 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1376 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1379 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1381 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1383 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1384 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
12/1921 |
1385 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1262 |
0-4-4T |
5w/e |
31/01/1926 |
1254 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1373 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1374 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1375 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1375 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1376 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1376 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1377 |
Snapshot |
16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1379 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1381 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1383 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1383 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1384 |
Snapshot |
15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1384 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
03/1930 |
1385 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
28/11/1931 |
1383 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
26/12/1931 |
1384 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1294 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1375 |
Snapshot |
M1 |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1376 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1377 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1377 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1380 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
M15 |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1377 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1382 |
Snapshot |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1385 |
Snapshot |
M16 |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
20/04/1946 |
1294 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
3782 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1712 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1724 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1811 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1829 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
23 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
25 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
26 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2794 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2855 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
29 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
30 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
31 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
32 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3246 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3261 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3265 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
33 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3313 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3400 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3408 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3440 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3448 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3565 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3629 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3782 |
Snapshot |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3782 |
Snapshot |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
38 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3800 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3806 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3901 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3926 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3934 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3947 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4028 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4029 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4051 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4210 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4243 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4298 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4425 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4581 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4817 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4981 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5264 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5277 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5342 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7200 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7201 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7203 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7204 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7205 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7206 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7207 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7208 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7209 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7210 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7211 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7212 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7213 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7214 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7215 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7216 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7217 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7218 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7219 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7220 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7221 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7222 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7223 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7224 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7225 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7226 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7227 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7228 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7240 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7243 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7248 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7250 |
Snapshot |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7251 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7433 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7434 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7435 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7447 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7548 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7621 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8410 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8414 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8415 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8533 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8541 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
24/01/1948 |
1385 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
8109 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
1379 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
34 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
25 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
3926 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
29 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
38 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
1379 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/05/1948 |
3265 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
3781 |
Transfer in from: |
20G |
Hellifield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
8163 |
Transfer in from: |
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
4416 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
3802 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
7447 |
Transfer out to: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
44416 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
44425 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
44529 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
44531 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
43246 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
43800 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
44298 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
44581 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
3408 |
Transfer out to: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
3781 |
Transfer out to: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
44552 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
4470 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
43802 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
3905 |
Transfer in from: |
13A |
Plaistow |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
4259 |
Transfer in from: |
13C |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
8533 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
4532 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
42759 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
42771 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
44817 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
44981 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
45264 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
45277 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
44552 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
43806 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
3930 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
3962 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
4332 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
43909 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44131 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44552 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44531 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44532 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
47621 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
47250 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
25 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40091 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40098 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40155 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40172 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
31 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
32 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40026 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40033 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
40034 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
44581 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
44470 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
44552 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
41660 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
43982 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
41724 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
43930 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
1208 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
41207 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/11/1949 |
44304 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
44139 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
44195 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
44304 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
4210 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
43909 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
44243 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
44304 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/12/1949 |
64918 |
Transfer in from: |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/12/1949 |
64732 |
Transfer in from: |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
44139 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
44195 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
44139 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
44195 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
12066 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
42774 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
42774 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
42774 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
47200 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
47201 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/01/1950 |
64966 |
Transfer in from: |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
12066 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
12066 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
41829 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
41660 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1950 |
3307 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1950 |
43891 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
48132 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
48132 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
48132 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
12066 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
12066 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
47222 |
Transfer out to: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
47223 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
43909 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
43935 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
44298 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
43962 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
43982 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
44131 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
43909 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
43935 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
44298 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
43909 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
43935 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
44298 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
44033 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48364 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48401 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
58234 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
58310 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
40091 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
40098 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
40155 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
40172 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
43909 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
47204 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
47205 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
48364 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
48401 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/03/1951 |
64732 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/03/1951 |
64966 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
48062 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1951 |
64732 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1951 |
64966 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/07/1951 |
43120 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
10/08/1951 |
43121 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
43261 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
43565 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
58234 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
44139 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
44195 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
58234 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
48653 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
41811 |
Transfer out to: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
43261 |
Transfer in from: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
43629 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
48653 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/03/1952 |
64732 |
Transfer out to: |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/03/1952 |
64918 |
Transfer out to: |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/03/1952 |
64966 |
Transfer out to: |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
44228 |
Transfer in from: |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
44297 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
44530 |
Transfer in from: |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
58310 |
Transfer out to: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
41826 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
41826 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
41826 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
48219 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
43019 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
43118 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
44028 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
44033 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
43019 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
43118 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
43019 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
43118 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
47228 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
42797 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
42904 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
43400 |
Transfer out to: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
42797 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
42904 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
42797 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
42904 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/02/1953 |
44304 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
43031 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/05/1953 |
13022 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
42904 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1953 |
13023 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1953 |
13024 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
05/09/1953 |
40030 |
Transfer out to: |
68D |
Beattock |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43891 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
44298 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
47225 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
47227 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
47243 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
47212 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/01/1954 |
43448 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/01/1954 |
43782 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
42846 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
44555 |
Transfer in from: |
20E |
Manningham |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
42846 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
43313 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
40030 |
Transfer in from: |
68D |
Beattock |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
44205 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
44408 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1954 |
58234 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
44205 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
44408 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
44182 |
Transfer in from: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
44774 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
44777 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
45335 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42771 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42774 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
42797 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
44182 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
48750 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
44555 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45059 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
42794 |
Transfer out to: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
45342 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
48180 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
48410 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
48062 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
48062 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
47209 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1956 |
12063 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/01/1956 |
47215 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/01/1956 |
47220 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1956 |
12063 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
12077 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1956 |
12063 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1956 |
12066 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1956 |
12058 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1956 |
12069 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
12072 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
13179 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
13180 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
13181 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
41207 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
41208 |
Transfer out to: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
41826 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
48415 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48192 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48381 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
47208 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
47218 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
47221 |
Transfer out to: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
42855 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42855 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
41712 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/11/1956 |
92111 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
on |
30/11/1956 |
92112 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
92108 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
92110 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
48192 |
Transfer out to: |
17D |
Rowsley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
48219 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
48541 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
13248 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
13249 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
44663 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
45274 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/03/1957 |
47240 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
12077 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
13248 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
44746 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45238 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
44663 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1957 |
43901 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
05/10/1957 |
47206 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92018 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
92019 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
47207 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
92018 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
92019 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/03/1958 |
43307 |
Transfer out to: |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
47203 |
Transfer out to: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48033 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44746 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
43876 |
Transfer in from: |
15D |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/08/1958 |
47251 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
47217 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
47224 |
Transfer out to: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
92159 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
48638 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
92159 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
44816 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
44941 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
45062 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
92119 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
40025 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
40030 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
42759 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
42855 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43261 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
43440 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
47213 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
47219 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
31/01/1959 |
47432 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
48376 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
48495 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
43876 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1959 |
12069 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1959 |
D2904 |
Transfer in from: |
1D |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1959 |
12069 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
12069 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
12069 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
D2904 |
Transfer out to: |
1D |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
92119 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
92108 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
92110 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
92111 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
92112 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
47214 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
47226 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48142 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48301 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48304 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48306 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48313 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48324 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48367 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48378 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48517 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48538 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48616 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48678 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48033 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48062 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48109 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48132 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48163 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48180 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48376 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48381 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48414 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48495 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48638 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
48750 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
47223 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
13/06/1959 |
47210 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/06/1959 |
12072 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
on |
08/08/1959 |
47216 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
31/10/1959 |
47213 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
13304 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
13305 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
13306 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
D3573 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
07/11/1959 |
40023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/11/1959 |
43934 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
43923 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
48538 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
42134 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
42680 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
42686 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
43119 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
44441 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
47261 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
47554 |
Transfer in from: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
47642 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
43923 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5712 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5713 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5714 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5715 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5716 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5717 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5718 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D5719 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
12/02/1960 |
D3869 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
40022 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
40031 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
40033 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
40036 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
40029 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
40038 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
92057 |
Transfer in from: |
18B |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
92129 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
42134 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
42680 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
42686 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
04/06/1960 |
40036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/06/1960 |
D5088 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/06/1960 |
D5090 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
48625 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
48627 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/06/1960 |
D5089 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
25/06/1960 |
D5091 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
40024 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
D5089 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
D5089 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
D5712 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
44029 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/07/1960 |
48117 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/07/1960 |
D5092 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
48107 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
D5092 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
40031 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
47261 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
48627 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
D5092 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
D5713 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/07/1960 |
D5093 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
D5717 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
D5718 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
D5719 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
40024 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
D5716 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
47433 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
D5714 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
28 |
Co-Bo |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
D5715 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
48616 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
44985 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48301 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
48007 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
48338 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
48604 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
D5084 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
D5087 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
47223 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
48545 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45279 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45285 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
48338 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
48604 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
48770 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
D5086 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
44530 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
48545 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
D5085 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
40022 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
40029 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
40033 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
40038 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
48141 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
48143 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
92014 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
47642 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
48133 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
47554 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/07/1961 |
43905 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
28/08/1961 |
D43 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/09/1961 |
D44 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
08/09/1961 |
D45 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D68 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D69 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D70 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
44985 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45238 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
47548 |
Transfer out to: |
41D |
Canklow |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
48007 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
30/09/1961 |
D47 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
30/09/1961 |
47433 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/10/1961 |
D46 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/10/1961 |
D48 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
07/10/1961 |
D49 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D71 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D72 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D73 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D74 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D75 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
92014 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
92129 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 9F |
2-10-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
92057 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
48107 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
D76 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
D77 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
D78 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
43935 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
44228 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D105 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D108 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D134 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D79 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D80 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D86 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
D93 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1962 |
48133 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/01/1962 |
48143 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/01/1962 |
D4116 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/02/1962 |
D4117 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D81 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D82 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D83 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D85 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D87 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D105 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D108 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D134 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
D93 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
D88 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
D89 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
D90 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
D92 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
45059 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
D85 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
45062 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
47213 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
48770 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
44581 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Coalville |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D86 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D87 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D88 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D89 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D90 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D92 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
47543 |
Transfer in from: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
44816 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
45335 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/03/1962 |
D5379 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/04/1962 |
D5380 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/04/1962 |
D5381 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
D83 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
44777 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1962 |
45279 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1962 |
D5382 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/04/1962 |
D5383 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
44774 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
44941 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
45274 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
45285 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
48625 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1962 |
D5384 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/05/1962 |
D5385 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
48770 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/05/1962 |
D4131 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/05/1962 |
D5386 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/05/1962 |
D5387 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/05/1962 |
D4132 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/05/1962 |
D5388 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/05/1962 |
D5389 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/06/1962 |
D4133 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/06/1962 |
D5390 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/06/1962 |
D5391 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/06/1962 |
D5392 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/06/1962 |
D5393 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
D4132 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
D4133 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/06/1962 |
D5394 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/06/1962 |
D5395 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/06/1962 |
D4136 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/06/1962 |
D5396 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42070 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42086 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42087 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42090 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42092 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42279 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
73157 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
73158 |
Transfer in from: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76035 |
Transfer in from: |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76036 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76037 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76038 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76039 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76040 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
76041 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/07/1962 |
D5398 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/07/1962 |
D5399 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
05/07/1962 |
D4138 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
76043 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/07/1962 |
D5400 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/07/1962 |
D5401 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/07/1962 |
D5402 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D4132 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D4133 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D4134 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D4135 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D52 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D53 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
76042 |
Transfer in from: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/07/1962 |
D5403 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/07/1962 |
D5404 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/07/1962 |
D5405 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
28/07/1962 |
47211 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
28/07/1962 |
47248 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/07/1962 |
D5406 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/08/1962 |
D5407 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
44381 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
44531 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
44532 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
47223 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
47283 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
47442 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
47449 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
47645 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/08/1962 |
D5397 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/08/1962 |
D5409 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/08/1962 |
D5408 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
40022 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
43964 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
44210 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
44294 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
44572 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
47202 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
47437 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
47442 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
47449 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/08/1962 |
D5410 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
47645 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/09/1962 |
D5412 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
47433 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/09/1962 |
D5411 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/09/1962 |
D5413 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D11 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D12 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D13 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D50 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D51 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D54 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
44297 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
44441 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
47283 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/09/1962 |
D5414 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
76047 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
76048 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
76085 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
76088 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
76089 |
Transfer in from: |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
42087 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
42279 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43019 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43031 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43118 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43119 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43120 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43121 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
43947 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
44051 |
Transfer out to: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48117 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48141 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48142 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48304 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48324 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48378 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48770 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1962 |
D5415 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
48306 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
23/11/1962 |
D56 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
15/12/1962 |
40022 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
48392 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D55 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D58 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D59 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D61 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D62 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D64 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D65 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D66 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D67 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D83 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
D84 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
D3773 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
44932 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
45116 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
45444 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/02/1963 |
45234 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/02/1963 |
44932 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
43964 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
44210 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
44259 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
44294 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
44381 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
44531 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
44572 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
44532 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
44777 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
44821 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45223 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45262 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45267 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45277 |
Transfer in from: |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45346 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D11 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D12 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D13 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D43 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D44 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D45 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
45234 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D46 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D47 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
47223 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D48 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D49 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D50 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D51 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D53 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D54 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D55 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D56 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D58 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D59 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D61 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D62 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D65 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D66 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D67 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D68 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D69 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D71 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D72 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D73 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D74 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D75 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D77 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D78 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D79 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D80 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D81 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D83 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
D84 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
48527 |
Transfer in from: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
D52 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
D76 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
D70 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
44529 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
48678 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
47611 |
Transfer in from: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
D64 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
D82 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
73053 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
73066 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
73069 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
73156 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44777 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
45116 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
45444 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
45144 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
45301 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
45417 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
73071 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
44821 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
45223 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
45277 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
73157 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45267 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
48367 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
48392 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
D74 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
D76 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
47437 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
44984 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
D45 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45197 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
D49 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
D61 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
D85 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
73053 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
73071 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
73158 |
Transfer out to: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5203 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5204 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5205 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5206 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5207 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5208 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5209 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5210 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5211 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
D5212 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/08/1963 |
D5218 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
73158 |
Transfer in from: |
14E |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
47543 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
47611 |
Transfer out to: |
18C |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
48527 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
D90 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/08/1963 |
48517 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
D5213 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
D5214 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
D5215 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
D5216 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
D5217 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/08/1963 |
D5221 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
D5203 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
D5205 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
D5207 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
D5210 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
D5403 |
Transfer out to: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/09/1963 |
D5220 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/09/1963 |
D5222 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/09/1963 |
76088 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/09/1963 |
D79 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/09/1963 |
76047 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/09/1963 |
76085 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/09/1963 |
D5229 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5201 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5219 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5223 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5227 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5228 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5386 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5387 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5390 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5392 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5393 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5394 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5405 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5406 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5409 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5411 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
D5412 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/10/1963 |
D7569 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/10/1963 |
D7571 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/10/1963 |
D7572 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/10/1963 |
D5230 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
D5388 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/10/1963 |
D7573 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/10/1963 |
D7574 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
D5404 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
47202 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
D5384 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
D5391 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
D5395 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
D5397 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
D5407 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
D5413 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
D5414 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
47434 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D4135 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D4136 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D5379 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D5380 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D5381 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D5382 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
D5383 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
Bedford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/02/1964 |
44984 |
Transfer out to: |
15D |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
D45 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
D49 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
D85 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
D90 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
D5201 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/03/1964 |
73158 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
45197 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
45417 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1964 |
45144 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1964 |
45262 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1964 |
45301 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/05/1964 |
45346 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
13/06/1964 |
42090 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
48313 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
42070 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
76048 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
25/07/1964 |
42092 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
76040 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
76042 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
76043 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
76036 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
76038 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
42086 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
D5089 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
D5091 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44332 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
73066 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
73069 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
73156 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
12063 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
D7569 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
D7571 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
D7572 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
D7573 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
D7574 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
12058 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
47432 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
47435 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
D5087 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
D5090 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
D5092 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
D5093 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
76035 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
76037 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
76039 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
76041 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
76089 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5084 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5085 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5086 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5088 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5204 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5206 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5208 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5209 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5211 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5212 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5213 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5214 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5215 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5216 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5217 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5218 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5219 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5220 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5221 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5222 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5223 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5227 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5228 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5229 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5230 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5385 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5389 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5396 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5398 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5399 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5400 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5401 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5402 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5408 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5410 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D5415 |
Transfer out to: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D61 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D74 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D76 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D79 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
12069 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/11/1965 |
D3181 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
D3024 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D3023 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D3249 |
Transfer out to: |
16F |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D3180 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D4132 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D4133 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/09/1969 |
D4138 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1970 |
D3795 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1970 |
D4134 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D3700 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1971 |
D3188 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1971 |
D4116 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1971 |
D3795 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/05/1971 |
D3018 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1971 |
D3834 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1971 |
D3518 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1971 |
D4117 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1971 |
D3018 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1971 |
D3188 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1971 |
D4131 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3179 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1972 |
D3770 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1972 |
D3022 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
02/12/1972 |
D3269 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
02/12/1972 |
D3700 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1973 |
D3178 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/03/1973 |
D3178 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D46 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/06/1973 |
D7522 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1973 |
D3869 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1973 |
D3869 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
18/08/1973 |
31104 |
Transfer in from: |
55B |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D1835 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7571 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7572 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7586 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D1836 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D1621 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D1630 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D1634 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D1964 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1973 |
D3802 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1973 |
D3834 |
Transfer out to: |
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
29/12/1973 |
31267 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D36 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D38 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D62 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D7645 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D7522 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
D1835 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1974 |
D3851 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1974 |
25312 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1974 |
25315 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1974 |
25221 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1974 |
25222 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
27/04/1974 |
D63 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25205 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25214 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25325 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Laira |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47205 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47353 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47354 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25236 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25312 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25315 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
25265 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
25214 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/06/1974 |
D63 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
15/06/1974 |
D1964 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
22/06/1974 |
31172 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25243 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25265 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1974 |
08535 |
Transfer in from: |
BY |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1974 |
08768 |
Transfer in from: |
BY |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1974 |
08684 |
Transfer out to: |
BY |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1974 |
08702 |
Transfer out to: |
BY |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/07/1974 |
D63 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1974 |
08902 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/07/1974 |
D4120 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25036 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25205 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
17/08/1974 |
31140 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
2w/e |
24/08/1974 |
31140 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
24/08/1974 |
08234 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
2w/e |
24/08/1974 |
31140 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
28/09/1974 |
31310 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
D64 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
D66 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
D68 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
D71 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
25325 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
D36 |
Transfer out to: |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
D38 |
Transfer out to: |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
47052 |
Transfer out to: |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
19/10/1974 |
31197 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
D100 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
D131 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
31157 |
Transfer in from: |
FP |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
D39 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
D91 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
D62 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
D66 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
25036 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
45072 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
45049 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
47355 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25068 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25069 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25070 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25071 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25072 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25173 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25174 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25175 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25176 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25177 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25178 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25179 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25180 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25181 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25182 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25183 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25184 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25185 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25190 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25193 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25221 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25222 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25236 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25250 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25265 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25309 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25310 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25311 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25312 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25315 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
25324 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
08235 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
08236 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25193 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
31418 |
Transfer out to: |
FP |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
31419 |
Transfer out to: |
OC |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
45033 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
45056 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
45074 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
45049 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
45050 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25203 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25204 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25070 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25182 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25183 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25184 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25185 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
47353 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
25189 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
47203 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
31421 |
Transfer out to: |
OC |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
47205 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
25193 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
25214 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
3w/e |
02/05/1976 |
31422 |
Transfer out to: |
FP |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
3w/e |
02/05/1976 |
31423 |
Transfer out to: |
FP |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
3w/e |
02/05/1976 |
31424 |
Transfer out to: |
FP |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25116 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25251 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25256 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25266 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25278 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25279 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25308 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
45072 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
12/06/1976 |
25030 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25068 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
45060 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
25182 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
25183 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/08/1976 |
25030 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/09/1976 |
25174 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08943 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
10/1976 |
47201 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
10/1976 |
47202 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08199 |
Transfer out to: |
SY |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08535 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25072 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25189 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
10/1976 |
47354 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1976 |
08403 |
Transfer out to: |
BY |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
25081 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
25190 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
03/1977 |
25189 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
03/1977 |
25302 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25053 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25054 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25092 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25111 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25173 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25193 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
04/1977 |
45056 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25173 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25193 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25221 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25222 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
06/1977 |
25190 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
06/1977 |
45056 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25092 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25111 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25173 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25193 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25302 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25095 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25099 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25117 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25120 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25205 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25218 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25308 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25309 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25310 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25311 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25312 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
06/02/1978 |
08635 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
03/1978 |
25111 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
03/1978 |
25173 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
08199 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/06/1978 |
25295 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1978 |
25210 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1978 |
25279 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1979 |
25310 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
25310 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/03/1980 |
25111 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/07/1980 |
25204 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1980 |
08199 |
Transfer out to: |
BU |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/11/1980 |
25116 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25053 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25099 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25183 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25203 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/06/1981 |
25071 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1981 |
25075 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1981 |
25301 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
07/1981 |
45037 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25178 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25190 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25050 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25145 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25321 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1981 |
08458 |
Transfer out to: |
BY |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25205 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25315 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/02/1982 |
25081 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/11/1982 |
25214 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/11/1982 |
25177 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/11/1982 |
25179 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/11/1982 |
25180 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/03/1983 |
25075 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/04/1983 |
25050 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
08/05/1983 |
45045 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/09/1983 |
25243 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/11/1983 |
25120 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/12/1983 |
25301 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/12/1983 |
25069 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/01/1984 |
25117 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/05/1984 |
25250 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
12/09/1984 |
45050 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/12/1984 |
25236 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/01/1985 |
25251 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/01/1985 |
25182 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
25/01/1985 |
25218 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/04/1985 |
25256 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/04/1985 |
25210 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/05/1985 |
25054 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/07/1985 |
25189 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/12/1985 |
25175 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/12/1985 |
25324 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/01/1986 |
25145 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/07/1986 |
25095 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/08/1986 |
25181 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/09/1986 |
25266 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/09/1986 |
25321 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/03/1987 |
25278 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/03/1987 |
25176 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/03/1987 |
25265 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/03/1987 |
25173 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
25/03/1987 |
47202 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
15/06/1987 |
45044 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47201 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47203 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
27/10/1987 |
45049 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/02/1988 |
08606 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
on |
15/05/1988 |
31420 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/07/1988 |
08943 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/07/1988 |
08768 |
Transfer out to: |
CL |
|
|
|
Diesel |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
02/08/1988 |
45046 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/01/1994 |
08603 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/03/2000 |
47642 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/12/2001 |
47849 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/02/2007 |
08902 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/2008 |
08890 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|