Depot: Croes Newydd
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3327 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3403 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1936 | 3327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2287 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1937 | 3403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | 2232 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | 6422 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5334 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 7305 | Transfer in from: | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 2030 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1946 | 3203 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1401 | Snapshot | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1457 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 645 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1706 | Snapshot | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1747 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1773 | Snapshot | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1780 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2030 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2183 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2184 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2188 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2232 | Snapshot | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2259 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2287 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2287 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 2704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 2713 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 2717 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3203 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3203 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3206 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4375 | Snapshot | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5315 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5319 | Snapshot | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5334 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5334 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5365 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5810 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6303 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6316 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6422 | Snapshot | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6625 | Snapshot | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6694 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6698 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 70808 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7305 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7305 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7310 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7414 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7817 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2071 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5774 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 9656 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1948 | 1706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2871 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3825 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6392 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6405 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 08/1948 | 1780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2232 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 6392 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 10/1948 | 2717 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2745 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2065 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2152 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 6404 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2065 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1401 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1411 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2538 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 9614 | Transfer in from: | BCN | Brecon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2287 | Transfer out to: | BCN | Brecon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 2262 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 9614 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 09/1949 | 2713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 6311 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 7313 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2822 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2840 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1950 | 2745 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 2538 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 03/1950 | 1773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 03/1950 | 2704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 1473 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5742 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 2152 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 7447 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 05/1950 | 1747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1950 | 2071 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 1624 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 2878 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 70808 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 4645 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7432 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7435 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 4645 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7432 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7435 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 4645 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7432 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7435 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 11/1950 | 2719 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4617 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7435 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 4617 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 4617 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7825 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7826 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2822 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4683 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7825 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7826 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4375 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6327 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 7432 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7825 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7826 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4683 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4683 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5315 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 5365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5313 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5315 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2185 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4525 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 6611 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 6617 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 9793 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 1624 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2232 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 2259 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 6611 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 6617 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 9793 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 6611 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 6617 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 9793 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 1410 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 1410 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 1410 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2259 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 2259 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 2259 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 1426 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3033 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2259 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 1426 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 1426 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 2262 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 3825 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 2259 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 1426 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6632 | Transfer in from: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5313 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6632 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6632 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3203 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 5912 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2853 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5912 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5912 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5912 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 7442 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6696 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 2107 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6625 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6698 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1646 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 7825 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 7826 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 1457 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5334 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 3206 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1953 | 4525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9028 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2107 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1635 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5328 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6339 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2259 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2297 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 1473 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5328 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6339 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5416 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1410 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 5315 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 2295 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6339 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2295 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6404 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 6404 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 28/02/1955 | 1660 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5319 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 7305 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2202 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2256 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2202 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2256 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6633 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5319 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2296 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 09/07/1956 | 5811 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8791 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2853 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6338 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 7447 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 24/09/1956 | 9028 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 10/1956 | 1416 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 1465 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 7422 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 1465 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 1646 | Transfer out to: | 60C | Helmsdale | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 1465 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 1659 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 7422 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 2247 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 9004 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 9014 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2247 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2296 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2211 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2230 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6817 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9018 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5319 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1958 | 1465 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 5742 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1458 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2211 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2230 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5416 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7817 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 7817 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 8727 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6303 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6311 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4683 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6429 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 7428 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 9621 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 1458 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 1635 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 01/1959 | 5810 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 1635 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 2855 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 3689 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 3828 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 6404 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5378 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6307 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2840 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2878 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 6405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 6429 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 2294 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3201 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6674 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 9018 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1959 | 5378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6615 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1959 | 1635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3815 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 2294 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7341 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 9621 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 1618 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 3749 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 3760 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 40126 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 4683 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5606 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5651 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6353 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6610 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8734 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 9610 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 7230 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 7300 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 40126 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6316 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6353 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 3630 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 3665 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 3676 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 3786 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 4602 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 6380 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 7762 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8709 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8729 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8730 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 9794 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 3630 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 3786 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4602 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 7762 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8709 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8729 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1960 | 9004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2200 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2222 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3207 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3786 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6306 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6698 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 7314 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3665 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3676 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8730 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9794 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1960 | 6307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 3210 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 2200 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 3786 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 2200 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6610 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 7341 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3756 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 7403 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1960 | 1659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1960 | 9014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 3846 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6374 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 2200 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 3207 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6696 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7428 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 3210 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5606 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6374 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2222 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 3756 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 7431 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 2871 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 7817 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 8791 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 7828 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 2201 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 2210 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 2236 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 2856 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6380 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6817 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1961 | 7409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7339 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7341 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7811 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7821 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 2201 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 2210 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 2236 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 2856 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7300 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7314 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7442 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1961 | 6306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 1447 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 7812 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 6357 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 7418 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 7442 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 1447 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1962 | 8734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 4617 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 7442 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1962 | 8727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 5679 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 1618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 6339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 7313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1632 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5330 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6301 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6375 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80079 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80080 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 2855 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 3760 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 6617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 7341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 1663 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3209 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7314 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3201 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 05/10/1962 | 5774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7803 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 6301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1628 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3789 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 7442 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9608 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6375 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 7314 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 80096 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 80098 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 1663 | Transfer out to: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 7418 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 80104 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 3689 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 3828 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5651 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 7418 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 3209 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 5679 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 7811 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 46507 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 46508 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 46509 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5679 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 7442 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 7812 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 80070 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 80078 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 80101 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 80105 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75006 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75009 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75020 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75021 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75023 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75024 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75026 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75027 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 7803 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 7821 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 7828 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 80070 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 80096 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 80098 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 80101 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 80104 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 80105 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 3813 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 3831 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 3865 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 5679 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 7414 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 7418 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1963 | 6615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 1663 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/05/1963 | 6651 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 1663 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 1663 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 48659 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1963 | 6674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 48659 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1963 | 9793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 3831 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1963 | 6632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 3862 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 08/09/1963 | 5667 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 80096 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 48762 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 48020 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 48269 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1963 | 6694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 48020 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 48269 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 48762 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1963 | 3846 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 5330 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 7310 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 7339 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 41201 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 41202 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 46442 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 03/1964 | 3829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 84003 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 84009 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 3849 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 3815 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 1663 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 1663 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 41201 | Transfer out to: | 2M | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 41202 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 84003 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 84009 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 07/1964 | 7230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/07/1964 | 75071 | Transfer in from: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 3782 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 41204 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 41241 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1964 | 7431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9630 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9639 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 06/09/1964 | 5676 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 06/09/1964 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 06/09/1964 | 6665 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 3809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 1628 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 46442 | Transfer out to: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 3782 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9608 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 1628 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48134 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48325 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48479 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48518 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48665 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 75006 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 48353 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 48479 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1965 | 1663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 75020 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 75023 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1638 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3850 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 3855 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 84000 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 84004 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 48353 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 3862 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46507 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46508 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46509 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 75026 | Transfer out to: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 75027 | Transfer out to: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 48518 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 48134 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 3865 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1965 | 1632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 25/04/1965 | 5677 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Rhymney | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 3849 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 80096 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48134 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 73032 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 73045 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41204 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41241 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73004 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73096 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 75024 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 46507 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 46507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 3813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1965 | 5667 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 6625 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 6665 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 73040 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 73045 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 73096 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/07/1965 | 80078 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/07/1965 | 80079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 24/07/1965 | 80080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 3850 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 3855 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 46508 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 73032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 48122 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 48147 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 48252 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 73095 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 9639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1965 | 3789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1965 | 4683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45130 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45198 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48440 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5659 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6683 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 30/10/1965 | 84000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 30/10/1965 | 84004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1965 | 3749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1965 | 4645 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1965 | 5676 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1965 | 5677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1965 | 6611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1965 | 6626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 3709 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6668 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 6697 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 48411 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 48697 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 5659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 48255 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 48554 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6668 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48287 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48632 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 5605 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48255 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48554 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 48134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48747 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1966 | 1660 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 75009 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48287 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48411 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48632 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48697 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 75010 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 75012 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 75047 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 75012 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 75021 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48287 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73004 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73040 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73095 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1966 | 5605 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1966 | 6697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 75046 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 75048 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 75060 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 92029 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 92074 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 92125 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 92135 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 75021 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 8767 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 9641 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 75047 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/07/1966 | 48147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1966 | 1638 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1966 | 3709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 92137 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 45045 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 46508 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 92029 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 45344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1966 | 1628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1966 | 9610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1966 | 9630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 76040 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 76048 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48339 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48385 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 76086 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 76086 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1966 | 9641 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44872 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92135 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44762 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44776 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48253 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48632 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48669 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48697 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 44762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 48385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 75002 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 75047 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 75052 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 92074 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 92125 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 92137 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 75047 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 76048 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 48122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 48440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 48253 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 48665 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75006 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75009 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75013 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75016 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75047 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 75055 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 45198 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 48325 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 48632 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 76037 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 76039 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 76040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 48287 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 43088 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 75060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 45130 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 75021 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75009 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75010 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75013 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75046 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75055 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 44872 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 44776 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 75048 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 43088 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 75002 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 48252 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 48669 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 48697 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 75006 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 75047 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 75052 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 75071 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 76037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 76039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 75016 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick |