Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 925 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1833 Week
» 12978 Month
» 112763 Year
» 1778139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Derby


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1889 1831 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1889 1832 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1831 Snapshot 8 Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1832 Snapshot 4M Malvern (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1900 2628 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1900 2629 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2628 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2628 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2629 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2629 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1408 Snapshot 18 Nottingham    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1419 Snapshot 18 Nottingham    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1420 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1421 Snapshot 5 Brecon    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1428 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1428 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1429 Snapshot 1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1429 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 29/11/1930 1419 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1327 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1375 Snapshot M15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1408 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1408 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1418 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1420 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1421 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1428 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1428 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1429 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1429 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 13/07/1935 1418 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/04/1940 1327 Condemned      
Steam 1262 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1252 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1337 Snapshot 8 Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1361 Snapshot 3 Saltley    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1370 Snapshot 6 Swansea (Upper Bank)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1373 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1375 Snapshot 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1404 Snapshot 8 Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1408 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1408 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1426 Snapshot 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1428 Snapshot 20C Royston    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1429 Snapshot M1 Derby    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1429 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 15/06/1946 4962 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2341 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/06/1946 7417 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 21/12/1946 1205 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 28/12/1946 1206 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/08/1947 1205 Snapshot 20G Hellifield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/08/1947 1206 Snapshot 20G Hellifield    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 07/09/1947 1404 Condemned      
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/11/1947 1408 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1000 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1003 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1033 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1036 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1055 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1057 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1059 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1060 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1083 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1084 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1088 Snapshot        
Steam 0F 0-4-0T on 01/01/1948 1535 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1695 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1726 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1754 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1773 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1779 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1788 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1795 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1833 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1847 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2340 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2341 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2341 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2847 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2872 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2897 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3191 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3200 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 325 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3273 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3308 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3312 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3315 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3318 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3323 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3324 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3364 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3368 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3370 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3402 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3406 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3459 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3469 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3482 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3496 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3510 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3548 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3550 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3572 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3574 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3578 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3584 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3598 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3658 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3735 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3745 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3759 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3763 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3776 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 383 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3838 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3839 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3840 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3881 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3955 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4023 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4031 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 404 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 407 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4101 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 411 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4142 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 416 Snapshot 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4177 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 418 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4195 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4214 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 426 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4263 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4402 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4409 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4419 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4420 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4430 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4432 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4542 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4565 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4566 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4601 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4602 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4605 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4809 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4815 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4818 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4819 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 482 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4839 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4851 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5088 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 513 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 516 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5261 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5285 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5585 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5602 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5610 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5639 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5656 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5667 Snapshot        
Steam 1262 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 58035 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 58035 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 632 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 711 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 734 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 735 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7417 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7417 Snapshot 17A Derby    
Steam 3P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 743 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 756 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8157 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8322 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8390 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8404 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8432 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8640 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8647 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8654 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8677 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 930 Snapshot        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/02/1948 1361 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 14/08/1948 1033 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 25/09/1948 1036 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 41196 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 41197 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 4249 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45639 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 58203 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 3881 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 43273 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45639 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 3P 4-4-0 m/e 02/1949 40735 Condemned      
Steam 3P 4-4-0 m/e 03/1949 40711 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 04/1949 41788 Condemned      
Steam 3P 4-4-0 m/e 05/1949 40756 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 46120 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3P 4-4-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 40743 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 42872 Transfer out to: 16B Spital Bridge    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 44839 Transfer out to: 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 44962 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 3P 4-4-0 m/e 10/1949 40734 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 25/11/1949 43049 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 45602 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44195 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 45602 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 46120 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 44917 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 43308 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 45285 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 4w/e 28/01/1950 58035 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 03/1950 40516 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 2w/e 17/06/1950 1889 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 41196 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 40934 Transfer in from: 21B Bournville    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 41083 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45602 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 41014 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 43847 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 43859 Transfer in from: 16B Spital Bridge    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 43862 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 44555 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/12/1950 58090 Transfer out to: 23A Skipton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/12/1950 42174 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 45602 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44112 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 45590 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 48121 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 41055 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 48677 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 31/03/1951 41003 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 04/1951 73000 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1951 58052 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 05/1951 73001 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 05/1951 73002 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42160 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 43961 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 43991 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44545 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 48677 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42341 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44112 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 45590 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 41023 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45570 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45626 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 41059 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 43862 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45602 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45639 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41057 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 43379 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 43773 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 40411 Transfer out to: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 11/08/1951 41023 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48711 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 43773 Transfer out to: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Diesel D16/2 1Co-Co1 on 15/09/1951 10202 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 29/09/1951 41000 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 40907 Transfer in from: 28C Carstairs    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 41057 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 41143 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45260 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45297 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 13/10/1951 40325 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 44287 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 58219 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 58224 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 73004 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 40930 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 43776 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 44917 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel FELL 2-D-2 - Later 2-B-B-2 4w/e 26/01/1952 10100 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 44917 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48001 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48005 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48011 Transfer in from: 9G Northwich    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 73002 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48404 Transfer out to: 20F Skipton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48677 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48711 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 73002 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 73004 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 41069 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 43013 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 41057 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 43312 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 43406 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 43574 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 48640 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel D16/2 1Co-Co1 4w/e 19/03/1952 10202 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 44917 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1952 42181 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1952 42342 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 73000 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 41197 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 48001 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 48005 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 58224 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 73000 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 40326 Transfer in from: 23B Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 44018 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 44963 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 40632 Transfer out to: 20G Hellifield    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 10/05/1952 41014 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 3w/e 17/05/1952 58203 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/05/1952 58069 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 43027 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 8w/e 14/06/1952 47629 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 8w/e 14/06/1952 41779 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 43013 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 05/07/1952 40383 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 44428 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 21/08/1952 80044 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 41192 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 45564 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 42897 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 44287 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 45260 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 42897 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 44965 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45264 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40934 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45667 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 43975 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 40482 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 45585 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/12/1952 42336 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 03/01/1953 80044 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 44295 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 45585 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 73016 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 73000 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 04/02/1953 44304 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/02/1953 41795 Transfer out to: 19C Canklow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 43975 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/02/1953 58067 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/03/1953 41795 Transfer in from: 19C Canklow    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 73000 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 73016 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1953 41695 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44378 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44380 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 41060 Transfer out to: 40A Lincoln    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44018 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44101 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 07/1953 73031 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 40907 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 43496 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 43658 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 44963 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 44018 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 44856 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 45564 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 43925 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 44018 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 05/09/1953 44851 Transfer out to: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 44776 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 44839 Transfer in from: 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 44963 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 43961 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 73000 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 73002 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 44369 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 48510 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 44432 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 45186 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 4w/e 28/11/1953 51217 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 73030 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 44776 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 45088 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1953 41833 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 26/12/1953 43364 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 43429 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 48083 Transfer in from: 19C Canklow    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 48470 Transfer in from: 19C Canklow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44555 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44601 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 58158 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 58209 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 41069 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 46440 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41143 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 22/05/1954 43191 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41083 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 43041 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 43294 Transfer in from: 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 43879 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 44020 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 44169 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 1357 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 58246 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 43469 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 45264 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 45297 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 48432 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 48654 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 58209 Transfer out to: 17C Coalville    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 19/06/1954 41084 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 41094 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 43482 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 43598 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 10/1954 73068 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 43598 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 45264 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 44249 Transfer out to: 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 on 06/11/1954 73069 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 45407 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 45186 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 58089 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 41050 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 41077 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 44023 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 44049 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 44224 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 44023 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 44963 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 44965 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 45261 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 45407 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 01/01/1955 41710 Transfer in from: 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 44334 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 48011 Transfer out to: 19C Canklow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 44048 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 45264 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 43312 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 44602 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 23/04/1955 41889 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/04/1955 42336 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/05/1955 41724 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/05/1955 42146 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/05/1955 42184 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 40418 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/05/1955 42342 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 44023 Transfer out to: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 44224 Transfer out to: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 4w/e 21/05/1955 51217 Transfer out to: 21C Bromsgrove    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 25/05/1955 13250 1st Allocation        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 40418 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 16/07/1955 42050 Transfer in from: 21B Bournville    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 16/07/1955 42340 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 73054 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 43839 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 43859 Transfer out to: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 43925 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 73069 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/09/1955 41754 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 07/10/1955 13179 1st Allocation        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 40682 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/10/1955 41754 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 44848 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 44851 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 45260 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 45263 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 4w/e 08/10/1955 51217 Transfer in from: 21C Bromsgrove    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/10/1955 13180 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/10/1955 13181 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 43429 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 46120 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 13180 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 03/12/1955 42160 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 31/12/1955 47417 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 41103 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44017 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44542 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 43292 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 46120 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 13180 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 44601 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 45407 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 73015 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 73001 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 43658 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 44042 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 41077 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 41094 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 12/05/1956 40326 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/05/1956 13248 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/05/1956 13249 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 45602 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 02/06/1956 41050 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 16/06/1956 47563 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 48168 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 13179 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 13180 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 13181 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 16/06/1956 41795 Transfer out to: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44819 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45260 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45407 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45602 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 48470 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 14/07/1956 43838 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 43855 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 43881 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 43925 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 43969 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 44176 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 43049 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 08/09/1956 43598 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42228 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 44425 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 44501 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 44589 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 44819 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45260 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45602 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48005 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48293 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48403 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 43745 Transfer out to: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 46440 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 43323 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 08/12/1956 41088 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 22/12/1956 43550 Condemned      
Steam 0F 0-4-0T 4w/e 29/12/1956 41534 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 05/01/1957 40418 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 46440 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 13248 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 13249 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43855 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 46440 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 12077 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 13248 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40356 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40396 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40412 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40536 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44605 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 13/04/1957 43402 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 46440 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 40356 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 40396 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 44501 Transfer out to: 17E Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 44743 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 44744 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 44745 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 0F 0-4-0T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41535 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 73015 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 73054 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 73068 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 25/05/1957 43847 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 01/06/1957 41192 Condemned      
Steam 0F 0-4-0T 4w/e 15/06/1957 41534 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 41143 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 43033 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/06/1957 42228 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 44839 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 45260 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 45263 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 45570 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 45610 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 73031 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 07/1957 40404 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1957 41710 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 44747 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45610 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45585 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 46440 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1957 44017 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 41086 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 41185 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 40538 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42326 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44839 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45062 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45260 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 8w/e 05/10/1957 47007 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 12077 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 13248 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45602 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 8w/e 05/10/1957 51217 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 11/1957 40426 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 m/e 11/1957 41185 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 16/11/1957 41103 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43115 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44465 Transfer in from: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45006 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45648 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44402 Transfer out to: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44809 Transfer out to: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 18/01/1958 43312 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 12033 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 45663 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 43294 Transfer out to: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 43763 Transfer out to: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 73030 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 41114 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 43930 Transfer in from: 17E Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 44378 Transfer out to: 17E Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 12/04/1958 43879 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 43040 Transfer in from:        
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 4w/e 19/04/1958 47007 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 m/e 05/1958 41086 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 17/05/1958 41114 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 06/1958 40407 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 41049 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 41090 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44690 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44691 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44941 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45416 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44743 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44744 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44745 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44747 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 14/06/1958 41724 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45627 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 4w/e 12/07/1958 47007 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1958 42326 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 25/07/1958 D5700 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 12034 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 44688 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 13250 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 01/09/1958 D5701 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42326 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 29/09/1958 D5702 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 43115 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 44839 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel FELL 2-D-2 - Later 2-B-B-2 on 15/10/1958 10100 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 20/10/1958 D5703 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 05/11/1958 D5704 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 08/11/1958 41102 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/11/1958 44839 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST w/e 15/11/1958 51232 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 1357 0-6-0 w/e 22/11/1958 58246 Transfer out to: 15D Coalville    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 03/12/1958 D5002 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 05/12/1958 D5705 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 05/12/1958 D5706 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/12/1958 44589 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 12/12/1958 D5003 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 19/12/1958 D5707 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/12/1958 42050 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/12/1958 42174 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/12/1958 42181 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/12/1958 42184 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 20/12/1958 41083 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 20/12/1958 41090 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 20/12/1958 41102 Condemned      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 22/12/1958 D5004 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 03/01/1959 D5005 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 03/01/1959 D5006 1st Allocation        
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 03/01/1959 47000 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 03/01/1959 47007 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 10/01/1959 D5708 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 10/01/1959 D5709 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 10/01/1959 41121 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 10/01/1959 41157 Transfer in from: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 10/01/1959 41173 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/01/1959 42184 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43727 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 46402 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 46440 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 46497 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 46499 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 46500 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 46502 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73135 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73136 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73137 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73138 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73139 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73140 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73141 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 73142 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 42847 Transfer out to: 16D Annesley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 42897 Transfer out to: 16D Annesley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43027 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43033 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43040 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43041 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43379 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43572 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44690 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44815 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44848 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44941 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 45006 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 45062 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 45260 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/01/1959 42174 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 17/01/1959 73143 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 m/e 02/1959 41173 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 07/02/1959 40925 Transfer in from: 21B Bournville    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 07/02/1959 41062 Transfer in from: 21B Bournville    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/02/1959 73144 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 07/02/1959 41121 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 07/02/1959 43578 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 14/02/1959 D5710 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 14/02/1959 D5711 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/02/1959 42181 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST w/e 14/02/1959 51232 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 73157 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 73158 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 73159 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 44691 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 44819 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 45416 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 28/02/1959 D5008 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 m/e 03/1959 41049 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 m/e 03/1959 41143 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 m/e 03/1959 43292 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 07/03/1959 D5712 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 07/03/1959 D5713 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43306 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/03/1959 48270 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/03/1959 42146 Transfer out to: 27F Brunswick    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5002 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5003 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5004 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5005 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5006 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5002 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5003 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5004 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5005 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1959 D5006 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 14/03/1959 D5009 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 14/03/1959 D5714 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 21/03/1959 D5010 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 21/03/1959 D5008 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 21/03/1959 D5008 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 28/03/1959 D5009 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 28/03/1959 D5011 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/04/1959 47429 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 04/04/1959 43324 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 11/04/1959 D5715 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 43435 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/04/1959 48002 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/04/1959 D5010 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/04/1959 D5011 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/04/1959 D5012 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/04/1959 D5012 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1959 D2508 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1959 44295 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1959 44409 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 25/04/1959 D5008 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 02/05/1959 40416 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 02/05/1959 41062 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/05/1959 42146 Transfer in from: 27F Brunswick    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 09/05/1959 40412 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 09/05/1959 40536 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 16/05/1959 D5716 1st Allocation        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 16/05/1959 40538 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 D3766 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 D3767 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 D3768 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 D3769 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 30/05/1959 D5016 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 06/06/1959 D5017 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 06/06/1959 43584 Condemned      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/06/1959 D5016 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 19/06/1959 D5717 1st Allocation        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 48198 Transfer in from: 17E Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42184 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44042 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44177 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 12072 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 27/06/1959 D5018 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 04/07/1959 40513 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 04/07/1959 40682 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 04/07/1959 D5017 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 04/07/1959 41726 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 04/07/1959 43727 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 11/07/1959 D5718 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/07/1959 42184 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/07/1959 42326 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/07/1959 D5019 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 01/08/1959 D2508 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/08/1959 43969 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 22/08/1959 43315 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 22/08/1959 43318 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/08/1959 D3775 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/08/1959 D3773 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/08/1959 D3774 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/08/1959 D3776 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/09/1959 D3766 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/09/1959 D3767 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/09/1959 D3768 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 D3769 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 D3773 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 26/09/1959 D5008 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 26/09/1959 D5018 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 26/09/1959 D5019 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/10/1959 D3773 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo on 17/10/1959 D5719 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 45668 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 45663 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 24/10/1959 D5008 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42352 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43778 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45668 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48124 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48393 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43840 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44601 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45668 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 09/11/1959 44304 To Store      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1959 12072 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1959 42181 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 14/11/1959 40925 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 21/11/1959 D3861 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45557 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45559 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45598 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45612 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45618 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 21/11/1959 47006 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44688 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44818 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44839 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44856 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73135 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73136 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73137 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73138 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73139 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73140 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73141 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73142 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73143 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 73144 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45649 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 21/11/1959 43370 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/11/1959 D3862 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 28/11/1959 44304 Reinstated        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/11/1959 48393 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 28/11/1959 43759 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 03/12/1959 44304 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 05/12/1959 D3863 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 44380 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 05/12/1959 43881 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 05/12/1959 43930 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 44142 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 44369 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1959 D3864 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1959 D3865 1st Allocation        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 31/12/1959 41754 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 43840 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 D3776 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42181 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 44565 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 44566 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 11/01/1960 D255 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 75040 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 16/01/1960 D5004 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/01/1960 D255 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D3773 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D3774 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D3775 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 75040 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 30/01/1960 12072 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5712 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5713 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5714 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5715 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5716 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5717 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5718 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/01/1960 D5719 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42587 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/02/1960 47236 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/02/1960 47441 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/02/1960 47533 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/02/1960 47638 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 58219 Condemned      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 05/03/1960 D5006 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/03/1960 44430 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 43570 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 43621 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 43679 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 41847 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/03/1960 D3861 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/03/1960 47563 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/03/1960 42181 Transfer out to: 27F Brunswick    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 43991 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5003 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 05/1960 44031 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/05/1960 42181 Transfer in from: 27F Brunswick    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 14/05/1960 12072 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 14/05/1960 47000 Transfer out to: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 19/05/1960 58158 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 21/05/1960 41157 Condemned      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 04/06/1960 D5005 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 04/06/1960 43570 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/06/1960 47644 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45006 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45260 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45416 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 73157 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 73158 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 73159 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1960 41773 Condemned      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 02/07/1960 D5712 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/07/1960 45559 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 09/07/1960 47000 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/07/1960 D5713 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/07/1960 44428 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 06/08/1960 D5717 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 06/08/1960 D5718 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 06/08/1960 D5719 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 13/08/1960 D5716 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 27/08/1960 43840 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45186 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45221 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 73156 Transfer in from: 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45627 Transfer out to: 41C Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 17/09/1960 43735 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 12072 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 44433 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 45342 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 46454 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 73156 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/10/1960 47325 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/10/1960 47327 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/10/1960 D11 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/10/1960 44476 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 22/10/1960 D12 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1960 44691 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/10/1960 47257 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/10/1960 47534 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 22/10/1960 D5714 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 22/10/1960 D5715 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 05/11/1960 D13 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/11/1960 D68 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 D3865 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 24/11/1960 D14 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 26/11/1960 D69 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/12/1960 D68 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/12/1960 D15 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/12/1960 42112 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/12/1960 D70 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/12/1960 42352 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 12/12/1960 D78 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/12/1960 D16 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/12/1960 D79 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 17/12/1960 D80 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/12/1960 D68 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/12/1960 D71 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/12/1960 D72 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 21/12/1960 D81 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 23/12/1960 D17 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 24/12/1960 D14 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 31/12/1960 D18 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 31/12/1960 D19 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 31/12/1960 D82 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 31/12/1960 D83 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 31/12/1960 D84 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 31/12/1960 D73 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 31/12/1960 D11 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo m/e 01/1961 D5700 To Store      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D73 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D74 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D75 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D76 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D77 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/01/1961 42112 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D73 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 44078 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/01/1961 48338 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 44334 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 04/02/1961 D12 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 04/02/1961 D13 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 06/02/1961 D85 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/02/1961 42091 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/02/1961 44078 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/02/1961 48647 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 18/02/1961 D15 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 18/02/1961 D16 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 24/02/1961 D20 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 24/02/1961 D87 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/02/1961 46495 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 02/03/1961 D88 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 03/03/1961 D21 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/03/1961 42091 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/03/1961 42587 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 44020 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 44169 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 44419 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 44465 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 44545 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45006 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45186 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45221 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45260 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45648 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45649 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48002 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48005 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48168 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48293 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48338 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48390 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/03/1961 48403 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 04/03/1961 43548 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 04/03/1961 43778 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/03/1961 D86 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 11/03/1961 D90 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 11/03/1961 43306 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 17/03/1961 D91 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/03/1961 44476 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 22/03/1961 D89 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 25/03/1961 D92 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/03/1961 47429 Transfer out to: Horwich Works    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 28/03/1961 D93 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/03/1961 D22 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 06/04/1961 D94 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 08/04/1961 D23 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/04/1961 D17 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/04/1961 D18 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 08/04/1961 43459 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 11/04/1961 43435 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/04/1961 D24 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/04/1961 D25 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/04/1961 D95 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1961 D96 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 22/04/1961 D26 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 22/04/1961 D97 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 22/04/1961 D304 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 4w/e 22/04/1961 D93 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 26/04/1961 D98 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 29/04/1961 D27 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/04/1961 D24 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 29/04/1961 43200 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 03/05/1961 D99 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 04/05/1961 D28 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 08/05/1961 D100 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 13/05/1961 D29 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 18/05/1961 D102 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 20/05/1961 D101 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 20/05/1961 D30 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 20/05/1961 D304 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/05/1961 D103 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 01/06/1961 D104 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 03/06/1961 D31 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/06/1961 D91 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/06/1961 D105 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/06/1961 D101 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 44691 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 12/06/1961 D32 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/06/1961 D106 1st Allocation        
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46100 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46106 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46118 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46137 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D19 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D20 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D22 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D26 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D29 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D30 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D31 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 45416 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 19/06/1961 D33 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 29/06/1961 D34 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/06/1961 D109 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/06/1961 D35 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 44421 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 06/07/1961 D36 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/07/1961 43950 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D21 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D25 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D27 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D68 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D77 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D86 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D90 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/07/1961 D37 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 13/07/1961 D38 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/07/1961 D68 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 20/07/1961 D107 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 20/07/1961 D39 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 22/07/1961 D34 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 25/07/1961 D110 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 26/07/1961 D40 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 28/07/1961 D108 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 29/07/1961 D41 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 04/08/1961 D111 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/08/1961 D24 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 08/08/1961 D112 1st Allocation        
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1961 46100 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 19/08/1961 D42 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/08/1961 D77 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/08/1961 D90 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/08/1961 D93 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/08/1961 D35 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 46118 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 28/08/1961 D115 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 01/09/1961 D116 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D86 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D23 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D28 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 02/09/1961 46106 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 02/09/1961 46137 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/09/1961 D117 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/09/1961 D101 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D33 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D36 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D37 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D38 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D39 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D40 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D41 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1961 D42 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 11/09/1961 D2377 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 14/09/1961 D113 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 16/09/1961 D118 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D22 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 44047 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D24 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D32 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D68 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D69 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D70 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D22 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 19/09/1961 D114 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 22/09/1961 D2378 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 23/09/1961 D119 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/09/1961 D120 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 30/09/1961 73140 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 30/09/1961 73144 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/09/1961 D101 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 06/10/1961 D121 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/10/1961 44289 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D71 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D72 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D73 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D74 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D75 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 11/10/1961 D122 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 11/10/1961 D2379 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/10/1961 44664 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/10/1961 45346 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 19/10/1961 D2380 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 21/10/1961 D124 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 21/10/1961 D138 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 27/10/1961 D2381 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 28/10/1961 D123 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 31/10/1961 D125 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 03/11/1961 D139 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 08/11/1961 D2382 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/11/1961 D126 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/11/1961 D76 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/11/1961 D77 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/11/1961 D78 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 14/11/1961 43368 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/11/1961 D127 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 16/11/1961 D2383 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 17/11/1961 D141 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 18/11/1961 D128 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 43953 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 43958 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 44138 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 44151 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 44394 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 44578 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45557 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45598 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45610 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45612 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45618 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45626 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45668 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 46454 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 25/11/1961 D129 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 25/11/1961 D140 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 27/11/1961 D2384 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 01/12/1961 D143 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 04/12/1961 D130 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 05/12/1961 D142 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/12/1961 D131 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 09/12/1961 D144 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 09/12/1961 D145 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/12/1961 42333 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/12/1961 42339 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 44048 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 15/12/1961 D146 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 16/12/1961 D132 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 16/12/1961 D147 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 45575 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 45614 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/12/1961 D144 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 21/12/1961 D133 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 22/12/1961 D148 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/12/1961 D145 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/12/1961 D146 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/12/1961 D134 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/12/1961 D135 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/12/1961 D136 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/12/1961 D137 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 30/12/1961 D149 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 30/12/1961 D150 1st Allocation        
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/12/1961 D5719 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/01/1962 D101 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/01/1962 44203 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1962 73000 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/01/1962 D138 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/01/1962 D149 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/01/1962 44421 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1962 45656 Transfer out to: 41D Canklow    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 06/01/1962 47006 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/01/1962 47638 Transfer out to: 18B Westhouses    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D105 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D108 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D134 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D147 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/01/1962 47327 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/01/1962 47533 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/01/1962 47629 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D79 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D80 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D86 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/01/1962 D93 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 17/01/1962 D151 1st Allocation        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/01/1962 48060 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 25/01/1962 D153 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/01/1962 42333 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/01/1962 44047 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 27/01/1962 43679 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 30/01/1962 D58 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 01/02/1962 D152 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D105 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D108 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D134 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D93 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D101 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D141 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D151 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D153 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5701 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5702 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5703 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5704 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5705 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5706 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5707 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5708 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5709 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5710 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5711 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5712 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5713 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5714 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5715 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5716 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5717 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5718 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D81 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D82 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D83 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D85 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D87 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 06/02/1962 D59 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 44218 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 45059 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/02/1962 D85 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/02/1962 D148 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/02/1962 42339 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 73144 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/02/1962 D88 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/02/1962 D89 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/02/1962 D90 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/02/1962 D92 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/02/1962 D60 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 16/02/1962 D154 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 16/02/1962 D155 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 45062 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 23/02/1962 D156 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 24/02/1962 D154 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 03/03/1962 D157 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/03/1962 D86 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/03/1962 D87 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/03/1962 D88 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/03/1962 D89 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/03/1962 D90 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/03/1962 D92 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 73140 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 08/03/1962 D61 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 44047 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 10/03/1962 D5142 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/03/1962 D155 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 15/03/1962 D158 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 15/03/1962 D62 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/03/1962 D101 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 23/03/1962 D159 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 24/03/1962 D149 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 44816 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 45335 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 24/03/1962 D107 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 44203 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 24/03/1962 D5142 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 29/03/1962 D63 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 31/03/1962 D160 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 31/03/1962 D161 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 31/03/1962 D141 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 43254 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 43620 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 43669 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44825 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44839 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44858 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 45532 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 45540 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/04/1962 D83 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 43958 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44047 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44218 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44289 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44394 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44433 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44578 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 45575 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 45614 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 09/04/1962 D162 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 09/04/1962 D64 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 13/04/1962 D65 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 44777 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 45279 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel Peak 1Co-Co1 w/e 14/04/1962 D6 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 17/04/1962 D66 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1962 D163 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 19/04/1962 D164 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 43621 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 44774 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 44941 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 45274 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 45285 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 03/05/1962 D67 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 on 04/05/1962 D165 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D107 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D145 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D155 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D140 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D149 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D152 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D158 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/05/1962 47257 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D145 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D155 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/05/1962 D146 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/05/1962 48530 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/05/1962 48636 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/05/1962 D143 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 43950 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 43953 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 44151 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 44425 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/05/1962 D146 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 43510 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/05/1962 D115 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/05/1962 D115 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/05/1962 43925 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 19/05/1962 D5002 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 22/05/1962 D50 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/05/1962 45059 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel Peak 1Co-Co1 w/e 26/05/1962 D6 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel Peak 1Co-Co1 w/e 26/05/1962 D6 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/06/1962 D138 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 05/06/1962 D51 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 07/06/1962 D52 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/06/1962 D106 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/06/1962 D147 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/06/1962 D158 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/06/1962 D106 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/06/1962 D153 Transfer in from: 65B St Rollox (Balornock)    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D148 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D154 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45059 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 23/06/1962 47006 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48057 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 25/06/1962 D53 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/06/1962 D146 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 45532 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 45540 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/07/1962 D13 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/07/1962 D140 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/07/1962 D143 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/07/1962 D145 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 07/07/1962 D2502 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/07/1962 D91 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 14/07/1962 D144 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 14/07/1962 D52 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 14/07/1962 D53 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/07/1962 44138 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/07/1962 D11 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/07/1962 D151 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/07/1962 44333 Transfer in from: 15D Coalville    
Diesel Peak 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/07/1962 D6 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 28/07/1962 D12 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 08/08/1962 D54 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/08/1962 D155 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 18/08/1962 43254 Condemned      
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 D2502 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 25/08/1962 47006 Transfer out to: 15D Coalville    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 01/09/1962 43637 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 01/09/1962 47006 Transfer in from: 15D Coalville    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/09/1962 D149 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/09/1962 D152 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 10/09/1962 D55 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/09/1962 D11 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/09/1962 D12 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/09/1962 D13 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/09/1962 D50 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/09/1962 D51 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/09/1962 D54 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75040 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75041 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75042 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75043 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75044 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75055 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75056 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75057 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75058 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75059 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75060 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75061 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75062 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75063 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 75064 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/09/1962 42174 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/09/1962 42184 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44774 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44777 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44816 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44825 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44839 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44851 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44858 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44941 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45059 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45062 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45279 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45285 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45335 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45342 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/09/1962 48057 Transfer out to: 16D Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 73000 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/10/1962 42335 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/10/1962 42339 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44023 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44545 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44776 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 45253 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/11/1962 42146 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 43855 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 44241 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/11/1962 47644 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 44454 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 44517 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 45262 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 44777 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 44819 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 22/12/1962 D133 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 22/12/1962 D133 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1963 43855 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1963 44241 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D55 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D58 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D59 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D61 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D62 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D64 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D65 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D66 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D67 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D83 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/01/1963 D84 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 43342 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45561 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45585 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45610 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45611 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45612 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45614 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45667 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45712 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/02/1963 48121 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 16/02/1963 43342 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/02/1963 47272 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/02/1963 47629 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D11 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D12 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D13 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D43 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D44 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D45 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45633 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45700 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D46 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D47 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D48 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D49 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D50 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D51 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D53 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D54 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D55 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D56 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D58 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D59 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D61 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D62 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D65 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D66 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D67 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D68 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D69 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D71 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D72 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D73 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D74 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D75 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D77 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D78 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D79 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D80 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D81 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D83 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/03/1963 D84 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 44776 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 44777 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45253 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45262 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45346 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/03/1963 48060 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/03/1963 48530 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/03/1963 D52 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/03/1963 D76 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/03/1963 44545 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1963 43521 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/04/1963 D70 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 20/04/1963 D64 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 43342 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/05/1963 D82 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/05/1963 42335 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/05/1963 42339 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/05/1963 47272 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/05/1963 47629 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45102 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45442 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45464 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 46447 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1963 48103 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75011 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75039 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75051 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 44664 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 44819 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45274 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 46495 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1963 48636 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75055 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75056 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75063 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 01/06/1963 D155 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/06/1963 D155 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 15/06/1963 D77 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45579 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44517 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1963 48103 Transfer out to: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 on 29/06/1963 D57 1st Allocation        
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/06/1963 D74 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/06/1963 D76 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/06/1963 D57 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45649 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45709 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/07/1963 D45 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45700 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/07/1963 D49 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/07/1963 D61 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/07/1963 D85 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 06/07/1963 43521 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 44176 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/07/1963 D103 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 44118 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 45633 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/08/1963 45260 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/08/1963 D90 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 D3587 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 24/08/1963 43342 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45709 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/09/1963 44284 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 28/09/1963 D79 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 28/09/1963 43658 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44454 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 75040 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 75062 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 05/10/1963 45649 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/10/1963 42181 Transfer out to: 16J Rowsley    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 26/10/1963 D5404 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/11/1963 D144 Transfer out to: 16A Toton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 44888 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/11/1963 48103 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/11/1963 48214 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 44023 Transfer out to: 16F Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44690 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44811 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44815 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44830 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44920 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44962 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45062 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45221 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 46497 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 46499 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 23/11/1963 47006 Transfer out to: 16J Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75011 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75039 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75041 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75042 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75043 Transfer out to: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75044 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75051 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75057 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75059 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75060 Transfer out to: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75061 Transfer out to: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75064 Transfer out to: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44659 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44804 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 45088 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 30/11/1963 D5404 Transfer out to: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 45712 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 45670 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 45684 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 44049 Transfer out to: 16G Westhouses    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 12/12/1963 D1696 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/12/1963 D1685 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/12/1963 D1688 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/12/1963 D1695 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/12/1963 45253 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/12/1963 47434 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/12/1963 47437 Transfer in from: