Depot: Didcot
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 1565 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2007 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 1925 | Transfer in from: | did | Lambourn | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 1334 | Transfer in from: | did | Lambourn | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2354 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2566 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5940 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 1335 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 10/1940 | 147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 3736 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 2532 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 3736 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1334 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1334 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1335 | Snapshot | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1861 | Snapshot | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1925 | Snapshot | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2007 | Snapshot | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2202 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2221 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2222 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2226 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2227 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2240 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2289 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2354 | Snapshot | OSY | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2532 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2532 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2783 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3376 | Snapshot | sdn | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3408 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3419 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4318 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4326 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5330 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5381 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5397 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5710 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5744 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5752 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5903 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5935 | Snapshot | rdg | Basingstoke (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5940 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6106 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6329 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6359 | Snapshot | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6923 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6952 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 70843 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7204 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7214 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7228 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7252 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7710 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9006 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9015 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 907 | Snapshot | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9083 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1947 | 2783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1948 | 3396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 4326 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 6379 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 3408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 2579 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5397 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 9006 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 3376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 5397 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6118 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 6168 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 7214 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7713 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7228 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7252 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7204 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 3448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2227 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 4601 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 3419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4326 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4649 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4935 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 6132 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3024 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6134 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6340 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 9413 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 7713 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5710 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6910 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 70843 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6910 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6910 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6923 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1950 | 9083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 1502 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1502 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1502 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1951 | 907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2579 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6166 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6132 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6166 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 6116 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 6116 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 6116 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1951 | 1861 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4998 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2202 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4318 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4998 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4998 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-4-0 | m/e | 09/1952 | 1334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 9300 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 9301 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 9302 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4998 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5783 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2221 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3024 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 2222 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5737 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 9300 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 9301 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 2819 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5381 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 4994 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 4326 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/04/1953 | 8435 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 3845 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6313 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2226 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5330 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9302 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3653 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3837 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4945 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5639 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5697 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6983 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6118 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6134 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9015 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6116 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5626 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6359 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5629 | Transfer in from: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5626 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 3206 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6304 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2820 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1954 | 2532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 2820 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6329 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 5903 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2289 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2819 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2214 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3837 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3845 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3814 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5330 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4979 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5675 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 3814 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9407 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9409 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9413 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 8458 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 9409 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5969 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4945 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5322 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5969 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5943 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6313 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 4939 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 5647 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4928 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 4928 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5746 | Reinstated | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6340 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4935 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5629 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6379 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4979 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1957 | 5735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5326 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 7705 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2246 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5386 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5390 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6969 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5330 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5386 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 2802 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5675 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6304 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5915 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5935 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1958 | 5397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1958 | 5390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 7710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5915 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 4959 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5796 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6915 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6996 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7324 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9305 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6388 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 2819 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 08/12/1958 | 2802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5322 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 4915 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4969 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1959 | 5796 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 7772 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 2821 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 2844 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6388 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1959 | 7705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 2836 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5337 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5351 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5375 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5697 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 5375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1959 | 5737 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2234 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 5918 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6313 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 2821 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 2849 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 4913 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5987 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6124 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1959 | 2252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5361 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6302 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 8720 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4913 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1960 | 5361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2200 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 2201 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 4902 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6333 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6937 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5326 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 03/1960 | 2844 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1960 | 6105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 2230 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6139 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 2234 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 2893 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6664 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6952 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5697 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2214 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5783 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6123 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2200 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6333 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6156 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 3709 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5639 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5697 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5744 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 7772 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6113 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6159 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 5647 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3206 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9407 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1960 | 5337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4950 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4976 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6120 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 2246 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6664 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8435 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8458 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/11/1960 | 5752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 4910 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 3622 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8494 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9450 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2221 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 3653 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 3721 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 4649 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 1502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1961 | 2819 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 48297 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 48693 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5953 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1008 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 3820 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 9781 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 2201 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 5943 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 5953 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 6915 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1007 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90201 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90312 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90565 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 2240 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 90565 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1961 | 9781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 48297 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 2898 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6130 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6957 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 90312 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1961 | 5351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6379 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6156 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 90201 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 3665 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6350 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6113 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 1015 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 3819 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 3840 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5918 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1961 | 6313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 2834 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 2842 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 4969 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1962 | 8494 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 6309 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 2221 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 4915 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 6124 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1962 | 2230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 2201 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 9755 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 9791 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1962 | 4965 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1962 | 6302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 3697 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 9450 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1962 | 6120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1962 | 6123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 4606 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 4976 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 9755 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 3697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3763 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1962 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6126 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3751 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1636 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4935 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 3665 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1962 | 2849 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1962 | 6109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4908 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 5746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1962 | 1007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6824 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6849 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6868 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6874 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 1008 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6910 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 7324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6909 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1015 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1962 | 2834 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 2852 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 7340 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4939 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1963 | 4935 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1963 | 4994 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 3763 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 4606 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5987 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6379 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 7308 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 2898 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 4902 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 4950 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1963 | 6379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 6378 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 5380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 2842 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 2836 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 2852 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 2836 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 2852 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1963 | 4908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 10/10/1963 | 2852 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4905 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6385 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 2836 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6824 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6849 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6868 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6874 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6337 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6921 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 7917 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 3840 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 4910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 4942 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 6385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1964 | 6350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1964 | 9791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 2898 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 3752 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 4950 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5330 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 2201 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 6130 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 6139 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 4950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6126 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6921 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1964 | 1636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 5330 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 7308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 7340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 3838 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 3851 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 3859 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4962 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1964 | 3752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1964 | 6337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 9726 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6921 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 8720 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 2898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 6996 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6156 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3838 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 3859 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 2893 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 6367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 7327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 3814 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 3835 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 7816 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 7829 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 3814 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 3819 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 4959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 26/12/1964 | 9726 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1965 | 3835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6938 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6953 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6991 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 3751 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 3820 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 3851 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6910 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 6969 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 6938 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 6928 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 7813 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 6986 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 6986 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 7813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 7814 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 6156 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 6159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1965 | 6928 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 6963 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 4962 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6136 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6910 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6921 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6937 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6953 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6961 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6983 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6991 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7814 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7816 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7829 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7917 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 48693 | Condemned |