Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 65 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4980 Week
» 16217 Month
» 249137 Year
» 1914513 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Dover Marine


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam P 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1027 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1065 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1161 Snapshot        
Steam D1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1246 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1252 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1255 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1276 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1291 Snapshot        
Steam P 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1325 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1443 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1450 Snapshot        
Steam D1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1470 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1512 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1517 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1520 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1530 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1531 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1532 Snapshot        
Steam D1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1545 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1548 Snapshot        
Steam P 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1555 Snapshot        
Steam P 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1556 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1673 Snapshot        
Steam R1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1705 Snapshot        
Steam R1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1708 Snapshot        
Steam D1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1727 Snapshot        
Steam D1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1735 Snapshot        
Steam L1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1753 Snapshot        
Steam L1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1754 Snapshot        
Steam L1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1755 Snapshot        
Steam L1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1756 Snapshot        
Steam L1 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1757 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1819 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1820 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1821 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1823 Snapshot        
Steam E2 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2108 Snapshot        
Steam E2 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2109 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C156 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C157 Snapshot        
Steam D Tanks 0-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2359 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31108 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31373 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31381 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 767 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 768 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 769 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 770 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 771 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T on 01/01/1948 83 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 924 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 925 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 926 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 927 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 m/e 04/1948 1450 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 30/06/1949 34056 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 1755 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30926 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 1755 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30926 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam O1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31383 Transfer in from: EKR East Kent Railway    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 09/09/1950 34074 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 09/09/1950 34075 Transfer in from:        
Steam P 0-6-0T 4w/e 07/10/1950 31555 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 07/10/1950 30083 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30926 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam P 0-6-0T 4w/e 07/10/1950 31555 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 07/10/1950 34074 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 07/10/1950 34075 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 30/11/1950 42075 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/12/1950 42076 1st Allocation        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30794 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30795 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30796 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30926 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31767 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31859 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 31532 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/12/1950 42077 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/12/1950 42078 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 04/01/1951 42079 1st Allocation        
Steam P 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 1178 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30772 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30773 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30774 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30775 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30776 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30922 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30923 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31145 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31246 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34074 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34075 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30794 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30795 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30796 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31246 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam P 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 31325 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31545 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31735 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31767 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 m/e 03/1951 31443 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 31520 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam O1 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1951 31383 Condemned      
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31727 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34057 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 05/1951 31381 Condemned      
Steam R1 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31339 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam S 0-4-0ST 4w/e 12/05/1951 31685 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 1276 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30922 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30923 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30924 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30925 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30926 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30927 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam R1 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31708 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam R1 0-4-4T w/e 09/06/1951 31705 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30796 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30797 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30798 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/06/1951 31047 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31150 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31317 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30767 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30768 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30769 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31255 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31291 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/06/1951 31339 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 07/1951 31108 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 07/1951 31373 Condemned      
Steam D Tanks 0-4-2T m/e 07/1951 32359 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31258 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam O1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31369 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31817 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31818 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam O1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 1065 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31823 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31859 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 09/1951 31369 Condemned      
Steam S 0-4-0ST m/e 10/1951 31685 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30777 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30778 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30779 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30923 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30924 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 32593 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42073 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42074 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 31517 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31755 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31756 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31757 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30923 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30924 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 31328 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30923 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30924 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam P 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 31027 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30918 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31069 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31521 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam L1 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31755 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31756 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31757 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30770 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30771 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30772 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30773 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30774 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30924 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 9w/e 30/06/1952 34075 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 13/08/1952 42073 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T m/e 10/1952 31673 Condemned      
Steam L1 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 31756 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam L1 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 31757 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30923 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam P 0-6-0T 5w/e 11/12/1952 31555 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/01/1953 30923 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30952 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31161 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 30769 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 30796 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 30797 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 30918 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 27/03/1953 42075 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 27/03/1953 42077 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 30918 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/05/1953 31278 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/05/1953 31521 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30797 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30798 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30918 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam P 0-6-0T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31027 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31329 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31661 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 42075 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 42077 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30769 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30778 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30779 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30798 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30918 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31530 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 01/10/1953 30952 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31470 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 42077 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 42077 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 8w/e 13/05/1954 30086 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam O1 0-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31065 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 30918 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 04/1955 31531 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31407 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31788 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31789 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 21/06/1955 34070 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 21/06/1955 34071 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 42074 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 5w/e 12/08/1955 30086 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T m/e 09/1955 31661 Condemned      
Steam R1 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/10/1955 31147 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/10/1955 31339 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31246 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31407 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31817 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 31512 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 42075 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T w/e 14/01/1956 32593 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 20/04/1956 31278 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 20/04/1956 31329 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 31542 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 17/11/1956 34103 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 17/11/1956 34104 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42075 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30923 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31145 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/12/1956 32108 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/12/1956 32109 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30804 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30805 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam O1 0-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31258 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31317 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam O1 0-6-0 5w/e 19/07/1957 31258 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 11220 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 7w/e 08/10/1957 31010 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 7w/e 08/10/1957 31174 Transfer in from: STL St Leonards    
Steam P 0-6-0T 7w/e 08/10/1957 31178 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34083 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34085 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34086 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34074 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34104 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 22/03/1958 34082 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 22/03/1958 34084 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 22/03/1958 34085 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 22/03/1958 34086 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T q/e 06/06/1958 42092 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T q/e 06/06/1958 42095 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31548 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam R1 0-6-0T w/e 07/06/1958 31069 Condemned      
Steam R1 0-6-0T w/e 14/06/1958 31339 Condemned      
Steam R1 0-6-0T m/e 09/1958 31147 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 42092 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 42095 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 42092 Transfer out to: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 42095 Transfer out to: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 24/01/1959 30776 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 42074 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4601 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4610 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4616 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4626 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4630 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4631 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30938 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30939 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31413 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31414 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31810 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30775 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30777 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30798 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30804 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30805 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31010 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31047 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31174 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31252 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31753 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31754 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31755 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31788 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31789 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 08/1959 30797 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 19/08/1959 31112 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/08/1959 31326 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 19/08/1959 31481 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 31720 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 22/10/1959 42079 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 22/10/1959 42092 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 22/10/1959 42095 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42074 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42075 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42076 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42077 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42078 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80043 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80059 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80064 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80065 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31004 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam O1 0-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31048 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam O1 0-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31370 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 09/02/1960 80043 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 09/02/1960 80059 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 09/02/1960 80064 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 09/02/1960 80065 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32410 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32415 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 09/04/1960 D2287 1st Allocation        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/05/1960 3633 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 10/06/1960 11220 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 10/06/1960 D2287 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 30938 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 30939 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31150 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/07/1960 31326 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/07/1960 31328 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31481 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/07/1960 31542 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam O1 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 31048 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34061 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34084 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 31414 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 17/01/1961 34071 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 17/01/1961 34103 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 02/1961 31258 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31818 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31819 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31820 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam P 0-6-0T w/e 25/03/1961 31027 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31004 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31112 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31413 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31720 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31810 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31821 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34061 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34070 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34082 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34083 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam E6 0-6-2T w/e 17/06/1961 32410 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 w/e 24/06/1961 31065 Condemned      
Steam P 0-6-0T w/e 24/06/1961 31556 Condemned      
Steam E6 0-6-2T w/e 23/09/1961 32415 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 10/10/1961 3633 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 10/10/1961 4610 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 10/10/1961 4616 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/11/1961 4601 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/11/1961 4626 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/11/1961 4630 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/11/1961 4631 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane