Depot: Dumfries
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 17263 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1109 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1171 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1175 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1179 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 170 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17263 | Snapshot | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17288 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17329 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17337 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17349 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17405 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2908 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2909 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2918 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2919 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57286 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57343 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57602 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57623 | Snapshot | 27D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 614 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 902 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 904 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 912 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 15164 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Beattock | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 57286 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 17230 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 17238 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 17288 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1948 | 57343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 42915 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6656 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1948 | 57636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 6656 | Transfer in from: | 12G | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 6656 | Transfer out to: | 12G | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 46639 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 46656 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/01/1950 | 57409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/04/1950 | 46635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 13/04/1950 | 55124 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 57397 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 57397 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 57397 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/10/1950 | 57391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 8562 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8562 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8562 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 43868 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 57563 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40904 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 44199 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45169 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 43868 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68533 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 68505 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 68533 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40185 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45480 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 140 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 54438 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 57395 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1952 | 57337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 05/12/1952 | 41171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 24/12/1952 | 41109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1953 | 57397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1953 | 57395 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 54502 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/11/1953 | 68505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 41135 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 56327 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/04/1955 | 40912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/04/1955 | 41175 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 56243 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 68562 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | 140 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/05/1955 | 54438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 44189 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 40185 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/01/1956 | 44995 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1956 | 40902 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 44189 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 44199 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/02/1957 | 56243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 56310 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 40151 | Transfer in from: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1957 | 41179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55232 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Beattock | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55164 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1958 | 57405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40151 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1959 | 56327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 56302 | Transfer in from: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 40576 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 40670 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 40152 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 44885 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/11/1960 | 56310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 56312 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 55124 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 57661 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 56326 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/07/1961 | 57349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 29/07/1961 | 40577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | 42269 | Transfer in from: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 29/09/1961 | 55232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 40614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/10/1961 | 56326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1961 | 57623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 42689 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 08/01/1962 | 40152 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 08/01/1962 | 40170 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 42699 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1962 | 57621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 46450 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/05/1962 | 56312 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1962 | 57362 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 45453 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 57296 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 68750 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 42914 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1962 | 57378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 54502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 57329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 40670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/12/1962 | 68750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 42915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 42918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/12/1962 | 56302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 57601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 57602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 78026 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 42269 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 80023 | Transfer in from: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44707 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44957 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44967 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44996 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 57688 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1963 | 57661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1963 | 57302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 42689 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 42699 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 46475 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 78016 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 80076 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 80116 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 80117 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57296 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 46474 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 80119 | Transfer in from: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 80116 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1963 | 42914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1963 | 44885 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 45153 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 46467 | Transfer in from: | 67F | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 46479 | Transfer in from: | 67F | Stranraer | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 78016 | Transfer out to: | 67F | Stranraer | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 78026 | Transfer out to: | 67F | Stranraer | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | D3926 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 17/04/1964 | 44996 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 44957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 44967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 45153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 44699 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 44723 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 44784 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 45158 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 45456 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 45463 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 45467 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 42908 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 42909 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 44784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1964 | 45158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1964 | 46467 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1964 | 46474 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | D2738 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | D2741 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | D2761 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1964 | 46475 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 30/07/1964 | 80076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 78051 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 80061 | Transfer in from: | 65J | Fort William | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | D2731 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76074 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 42919 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1964 | 45456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | 45115 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | 45471 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | D2741 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 29/05/1965 | 80119 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/06/1965 | 45467 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 45471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/07/1965 | 46479 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/07/1965 | 80061 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/10/1965 | 80023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76102 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76103 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 76103 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 80117 | Transfer out to: | 66F | Beattock | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44707 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1966 | 46450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | 76074 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | D2731 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | D2738 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | D2761 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44699 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44723 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44995 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45115 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45463 | Transfer out to: | 67F | Stranraer | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 76102 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 78051 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1966 | 45480 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3926 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr |