Depot: Annesley
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 18/03/1911 | 165 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/06/1911 | 170 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/08/1911 | 448 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1912 | 1212 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1912 | 1213 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1912 | 1214 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1912 | 1215 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1912 | 1216 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/09/1912 | 1217 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/09/1912 | 1218 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1912 | 1223 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1912 | 1224 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/10/1912 | 449 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1225 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1227 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1220 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1221 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/11/1912 | 450 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1912 | 1228 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1912 | 1219 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/12/1912 | 128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/12/1912 | 129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1915 | 1238 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1915 | 351 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1915 | 375 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1917 | 387 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1917 | 380 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1918 | 389 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/11/1918 | 271 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1919 | 1216 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1919 | 1224 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/11/1919 | 273 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/11/1919 | 274 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/11/1919 | 337 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 07/01/1920 | 345 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 12/03/1920 | 343 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/04/1920 | 370 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/07/1921 | 408 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1922 | 279 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1922 | 4 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1922 | 446 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1922 | 440 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1922 | 441 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1923 | 366 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1923 | 271 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 340 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 273 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 274 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 337 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1923 | 441 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1923 | 446 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/01/1924 | 165 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/01/1924 | 170 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/01/1924 | 448 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/01/1924 | 450 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/02/1924 | 6239 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/03/1924 | 1179 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/03/1924 | 381 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1924 | 382 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/03/1924 | 5129 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/03/1924 | 383 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1924 | 385 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/03/1924 | 1282 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/03/1924 | 383 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/04/1924 | 6267 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/04/1924 | 6264 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/04/1924 | 6323 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 380 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 381 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 382 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 385 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 387 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 6262 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 6307 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 6320 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 22/04/1924 | 5449 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/05/1924 | 6368 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1924 | 6309 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1924 | 6353 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1924 | 441 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/07/1924 | 5128 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 32 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 33 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 37 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 5463 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 279 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1924 | 440 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1924 | 279 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1924 | 440 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1924 | 32 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1924 | 5463 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/11/1924 | 37 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1925 | 5443 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1925 | 6264 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1925 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1925 | 4665 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1925 | 279 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1925 | 33 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/06/1925 | 441 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1925 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1925 | 5036 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1925 | 5440 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/08/1925 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1925 | 6266 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1926 | 752 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1926 | 5036 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1926 | 5443 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/04/1926 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/06/1926 | 5446 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1926 | 752 | Transfer out to: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1926 | 5004 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1926 | 5279 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1927 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1927 | 4665 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1927 | 5280 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1927 | 5381 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1927 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 5380 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/11/1927 | 5370 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1927 | 5394 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/01/1928 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1928 | 5279 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1928 | 5280 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1928 | 5444 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 14/04/1928 | 5370 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1928 | 5442 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1928 | 2709 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1928 | 2710 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/11/1928 | 5280 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/02/1929 | 5343 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/02/1929 | 6274 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 18/02/1929 | 5340 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1929 | 6349 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1929 | 6560 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1929 | 6620 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 23/02/1929 | 5345 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 23/02/1929 | 5366 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 23/02/1929 | 5370 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/03/1929 | 5963 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/03/1929 | 6227 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1929 | 6299 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1929 | 6215 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1929 | 6223 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1929 | 2709 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1929 | 2710 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/08/1929 | 2710 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1929 | 2709 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1929 | 2710 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1929 | 2779 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1929 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1929 | 2781 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1930 | 6262 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1930 | 2709 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1930 | 2780 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1930 | 6339 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/08/1930 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1930 | 2709 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1930 | 2704 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/01/1931 | 5064 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 5067 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1931 | 6356 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/05/1931 | 5963 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/10/1931 | 6267 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1932 | 5471 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1932 | 2975 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1932 | 2704 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/03/1932 | 6282 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/04/1932 | 2704 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/04/1932 | 2975 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1933 | 5440 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1933 | 6495 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1933 | 6496 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1933 | 5472 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1933 | 5279 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1933 | 2779 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1933 | 2694 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1933 | 2779 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1934 | 5032 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1934 | 6354 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/02/1934 | 6202 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/02/1934 | 6368 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/02/1934 | 6218 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1934 | 1289 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 5471 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1935 | 6532 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1935 | 1287 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1935 | 6225 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1935 | 5469 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 5287 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 5064 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/12/1935 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/12/1935 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/04/1936 | 5067 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/04/1936 | 6179 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1937 | 6599 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/10/1937 | 6273 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/10/1937 | 6575 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1938 | 5470 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1938 | 6266 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1938 | 6356 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1938 | 6353 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1938 | 6354 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1939 | 6242 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/02/1939 | 6226 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1939 | 6242 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1939 | 6239 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1939 | 6323 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1940 | 6214 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1940 | 6575 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1940 | 6220 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1940 | 6220 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1940 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1940 | 6309 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1940 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1941 | 2975 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1941 | 6212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1941 | 717 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 6217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/10/1941 | 768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/10/1941 | 776 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1941 | 3089 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1941 | 3090 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1943 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1943 | 6220 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5031 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5462 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5471 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5480 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5481 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5483 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/05/1943 | 5479 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1943 | 5476 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5458 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5467 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5477 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 5478 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1943 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5458 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1943 | 5478 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5458 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5467 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5477 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 5478 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1943 | 3089 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5441 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5443 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 1287 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 1289 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 2780 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 2781 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 2975 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1943 | 5439 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1943 | 5445 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 5460 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 5464 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 6307 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 6320 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/10/1943 | 6288 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1943 | 5393 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1943 | 5479 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5462 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5480 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5483 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 1289 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 1495 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 1497 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 1498 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 1927 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 2697 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5031 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5032 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5033 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5458 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5460 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5464 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5469 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5472 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5476 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5478 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1943 | 5481 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1943 | 5470 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1943 | 5471 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6209 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6258 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6495 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6496 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 5381 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 6299 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 6213 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1944 | 6292 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1944 | 6288 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/01/1945 | 6300 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/01/1945 | 5408 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/04/1945 | 6562 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/04/1945 | 5394 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1946 | 6299 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1946 | 6347 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/03/1947 | 1359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3613 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3636 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3756 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3762 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3876 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4716 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4719 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4720 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4739 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4747 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4750 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4757 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4762 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4805 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4955 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4980 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1350 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1351 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1353 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1354 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1355 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1356 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1358 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1947 | 1357 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1947 | 1352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3069 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3605 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3613 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3614 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3635 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3636 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3681 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3735 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3761 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3853 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 1479 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 1480 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3571 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3580 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3582 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3589 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3596 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3614 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3631 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3633 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3635 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3638 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3662 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3674 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3681 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3699 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3700 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3706 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3716 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3720 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3722 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3723 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3735 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3742 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3743 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3759 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3761 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3794 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3801 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3804 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3841 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3853 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3873 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3893 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3899 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3912 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1947 | 3685 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1947 | 3739 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1947 | 3069 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1947 | 1479 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1947 | 1480 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1895 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1974 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1975 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1976 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1977 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1979 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1980 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7105 | Snapshot | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8927 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8929 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8935 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8972 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8975 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8976 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 1732 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1948 | 3851 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 1732 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 1732 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3068 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3631 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3899 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 63021 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 63036 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3638 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3662 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3700 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3720 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3801 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3073 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 63025 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 63027 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 63069 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 63157 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 63184 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/02/1948 | 3687 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/02/1948 | 3805 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3752 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3970 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3987 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3589 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3706 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3687 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3752 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3970 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3987 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3687 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3752 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3970 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3987 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/02/1948 | 1732 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 1650 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 1669 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8972 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3706 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3805 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3687 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3752 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3970 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3987 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3589 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3706 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3805 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3706 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3805 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1948 | 1209 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1209 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1209 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1895 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3750 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3895 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3762 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 3575 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3750 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3895 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3750 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3895 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1948 | 3599 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1948 | 3713 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 3599 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 3713 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 3599 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 3713 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 63021 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 63027 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/04/1948 | 3573 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/04/1948 | 3781 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3573 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3781 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3573 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3781 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1948 | 63686 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1948 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 63686 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 63686 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3641 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3721 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3827 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3848 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3068 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3639 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3641 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3721 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3827 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3848 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3641 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3721 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3827 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3848 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63025 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63036 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63069 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63157 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63184 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1948 | 3639 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1948 | 3639 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 3797 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 3798 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 3899 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 63662 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3797 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3798 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3899 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 63662 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3797 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3798 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3899 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 63662 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 4361 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 7106 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9286 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 63073 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1948 | 63695 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1948 | 3756 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 63695 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 63695 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | on | 27/08/1948 | 7105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 1943 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 63762 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 3721 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 3894 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 63762 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 63762 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1664 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 77085 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 77181 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 77372 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 78643 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 61650 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 63638 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 63638 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 63638 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1948 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77181 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 63746 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 3805 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 63746 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 63746 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/12/1948 | 63851 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/12/1948 | 3573 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | on | 31/12/1948 | 67106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 63851 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 3594 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 63579 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 3750 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 3797 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 3594 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 63579 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 3594 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 63579 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 3610 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 3806 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 63700 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3610 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3806 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63700 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3610 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3806 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63700 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 77085 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 77372 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1949 | 63694 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1949 | 3713 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1949 | 63867 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1949 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 02/1949 | 67107 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 63694 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 63867 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 63694 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 63867 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63858 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63580 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63043 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63116 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63127 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63858 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 67104 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63858 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/02/1949 | 3792 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1949 | 63759 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67363 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1949 | 63589 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1949 | 63589 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 05/1949 | 67104 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 63043 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 63127 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 63116 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 90636 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1949 | 63859 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 1066 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61063 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 63838 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61063 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 63838 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 1664 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 1669 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61063 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 63838 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/07/1949 | 63762 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63735 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 67387 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 63876 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67387 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67387 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 69286 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63631 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63721 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63631 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63721 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63631 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63721 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63580 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63787 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63638 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63580 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63787 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63580 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63787 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 65494 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63599 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63787 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 63582 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 63761 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 8935 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63575 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63713 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63805 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63694 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63804 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63899 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63575 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63713 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63805 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63575 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63713 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63805 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/04/1950 | 63795 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/04/1950 | 63633 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/04/1950 | 63687 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/04/1950 | 63879 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/04/1950 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/04/1950 | 63848 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J4 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 3646 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63646 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63752 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63868 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63869 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63901 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63686 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63695 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63713 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63805 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63862 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/07/1950 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63578 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63689 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63803 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63808 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63863 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63575 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63631 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63641 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63794 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63895 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63573 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63781 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63859 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63827 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63702 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63761 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63787 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63851 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63618 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63699 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63723 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63767 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63893 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 63777 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 63780 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 63739 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 63742 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 63743 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 63799 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 63796 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 63886 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 63721 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1950 | 63786 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63777 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63780 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63786 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63796 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63886 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63777 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63780 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63786 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63796 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 63886 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63590 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63591 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63592 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63619 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63630 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63650 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63652 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63663 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63670 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63678 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63711 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63725 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63768 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63773 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63784 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63789 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63817 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63854 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63865 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63872 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63887 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63890 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63573 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63580 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63614 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63635 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63662 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63681 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63700 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63702 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63706 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63716 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63722 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63748 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63761 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63787 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63841 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63853 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63858 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63859 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63873 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63912 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63590 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63591 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63592 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63619 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63630 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63650 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63652 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63663 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63670 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63678 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63711 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63725 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63768 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63773 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63784 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63789 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63817 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63854 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63865 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63872 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63887 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63890 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63590 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63591 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63592 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63619 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63630 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63650 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63652 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63663 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63670 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63678 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63711 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63725 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63768 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63773 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63784 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63789 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63817 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63854 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63865 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63872 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63887 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63890 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90025 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90492 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90025 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90492 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90025 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90492 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 90001 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63676 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63740 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63676 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63740 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63676 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63740 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90001 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90025 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90492 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 63618 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 63699 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 63618 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 63699 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 63618 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 63699 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 64406 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 65494 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1951 | 63699 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1951 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 69691 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 69695 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 67387 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61977 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1952 | 63618 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/08/1952 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63639 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63798 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68825 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68834 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68851 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68883 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68927 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68929 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68975 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68976 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68825 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68834 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68851 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68883 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68825 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68834 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68851 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68883 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68927 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68975 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68976 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68825 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68834 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68883 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68896 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68927 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68975 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68976 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68851 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68927 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68975 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68976 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68896 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68896 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67408 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67408 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67363 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 68975 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68975 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 69257 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 67363 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 69257 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1953 | 63751 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61943 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1953 | 63751 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 69692 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 69695 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 69689 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 69691 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69692 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 69692 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 61856 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 61974 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 69689 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64317 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64324 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64364 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64386 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64361 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 64317 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68975 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64402 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63602 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63639 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68927 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/06/1956 | 63639 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1956 | 63725 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 48678 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61975 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/10/1956 | 69809 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61066 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/10/1956 | 69825 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/10/1956 | 61209 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67363 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69692 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/10/1956 | 69818 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1956 | 61063 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 63602 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 63845 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61979 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 61975 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/12/1956 | 63725 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 48678 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 63652 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 63670 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 63687 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 63780 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 63879 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 92010 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 92013 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 92014 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 92043 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 61272 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 63596 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 63650 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 63795 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 63796 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 63803 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 63868 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 63579 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 63646 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 63663 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 63678 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 63725 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 63773 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 63571 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 63590 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 63619 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 63630 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 63746 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 63786 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92067 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92068 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92069 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92070 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92071 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92072 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92073 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92074 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92075 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92076 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92087 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92088 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92089 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92090 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92091 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92092 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 92093 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/03/1957 | 92095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 63579 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 63796 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 63887 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 63890 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 92094 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/04/1957 | 92096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64352 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64359 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64420 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64439 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64386 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64406 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/05/1957 | 63784 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/05/1957 | 63872 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92011 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92012 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92030 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92031 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92032 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92033 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 64364 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 64375 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64739 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64747 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64798 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64955 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63589 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63592 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63594 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63768 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63863 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 64324 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 64352 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1958 | 61272 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 92154 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/06/1958 | 69800 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/06/1958 | 69800 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48220 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48315 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 92154 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 92009 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 92120 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 92009 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 92120 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 92081 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 92094 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/12/1958 | 69809 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/12/1958 | 69825 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/12/1958 | 69818 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 47429 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 47458 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 68896 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 68976 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42339 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42361 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42636 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42769 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42784 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42847 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42872 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42897 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 47638 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 48220 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 48315 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 42333 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 42636 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 47429 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 47458 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 47638 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 64359 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 64439 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 92094 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 92081 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 61856 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 61975 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 61980 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/08/1959 | 64747 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92013 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 92013 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1959 | D3859 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1959 | D3860 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 44932 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45116 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45223 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45234 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45450 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 41280 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 42333 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 42339 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 42361 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 61976 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 92014 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 92070 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | D3861 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 64375 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 64420 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 42847 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45215 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42897 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45217 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45444 | Transfer in from: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 42769 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 42784 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 42872 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3859 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3860 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D3861 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 92083 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 92120 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1960 | 64955 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 92083 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45223 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92014 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92052 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92117 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92129 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92012 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 41227 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 92057 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 92120 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 92129 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1962 | D4089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 92117 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84007 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84027 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 41227 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 92052 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 84006 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 41280 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | D4089 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 30925 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Basingstoke | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D3696 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 44665 | Transfer in from: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 70048 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | D3696 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44717 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45267 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 64798 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48002 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48005 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48024 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48057 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48064 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48079 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48099 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48117 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48141 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48142 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48168 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48220 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48293 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48304 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48324 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48333 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48378 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48615 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48700 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48770 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 46112 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 46143 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 46153 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 46158 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70048 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 48007 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 63777 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 63792 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 63796 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 63838 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 63886 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 64739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 45626 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63578 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63591 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63689 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63808 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63817 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63854 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63865 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63867 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63869 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 63901 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 63579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 63610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 63676 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 63806 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46126 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 48005 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 46122 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48220 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 46153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 30925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 46169 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 45626 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 46111 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 48167 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 44932 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 45116 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 45444 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 48167 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 44932 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 45234 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 92082 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 92083 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 92089 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 48002 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 48007 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 92082 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44846 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45234 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45267 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92010 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92083 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 48678 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 92057 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 92075 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 45334 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48037 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48166 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 45217 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48333 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48615 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48770 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 92088 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1963 | 46169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 92088 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 46101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46114 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 46114 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1963 | 46111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1963 | 46126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 45529 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 45735 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 46156 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 92075 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1963 | 46158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 92076 | Transfer out to: | 16J | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48099 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92109 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 84007 | Transfer out to: | 15B | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1963 | 46143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 92154 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1964 | 45529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 92132 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Kettering | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 12/03/1964 | 42618 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 22/03/1964 | 42618 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1964 | 46167 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 92025 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Kettering | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 92027 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 48678 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 92109 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 48064 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 02/05/1964 | 84027 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 48024 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1964 | 46112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 44847 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 44848 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 44984 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 45342 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 45416 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45346 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 84006 | Transfer out to: | 15B | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 48117 | Transfer out to: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 48700 | Transfer out to: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1964 | 46163 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45335 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1964 | 45735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1964 | 46125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 44835 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 45190 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 45406 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1964 | 46156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 46122 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 45267 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 45333 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 92113 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 92025 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 92027 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 48363 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 48661 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92083 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 45190 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 45267 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48024 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48053 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48356 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 92014 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 92069 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 92083 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 92090 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 92092 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 92094 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 92013 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 92030 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 92073 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92033 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92067 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92074 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92087 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92132 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1965 | 45334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 44932 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 45215 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 45234 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 45342 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 45346 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 45450 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48024 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48037 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48053 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48079 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48141 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48166 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48168 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48293 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48304 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48324 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48356 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48363 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 48661 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92031 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92032 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92072 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92075 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92088 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92093 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92095 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92113 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 92154 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 45301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 45335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 45416 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 44932 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 45267 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48057 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 92071 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 44717 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 44846 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 92091 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 92011 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 45190 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 48142 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 44665 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 44835 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 44847 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 45190 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 45333 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 45406 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 45267 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44848 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44932 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44984 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 92096 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 92043 | Transfer out to: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 92068 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby |