Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
on |
10/01/1934 |
13271 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/01/1934 |
13271 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1934 |
13255 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1934 |
13256 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1934 |
13257 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1934 |
13270 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/01/1935 |
13280 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1935 |
2956 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1935 |
13260 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1935 |
2961 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1935 |
13267 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1935 |
13268 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1935 |
13284 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1935 |
2982 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/06/1935 |
2970 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1935 |
13268 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1935 |
2959 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/08/1935 |
2960 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/08/1935 |
2984 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/09/1935 |
2955 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1935 |
2948 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
5019 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
5022 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
5511 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
5957 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
6955 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
7887 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
5022 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
5602 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
2948 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
5022 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Claughton |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1936 |
5957 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1936 |
2960 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
2960 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
2960 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
5019 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/02/1936 |
6202 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1936 |
2960 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1936 |
2961 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1936 |
2967 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1936 |
2980 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1936 |
2982 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
7791 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
9137 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
19/04/1936 |
6202 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1936 |
2951 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1936 |
2958 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
m/e |
09/1936 |
6955 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1937 |
2960 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1937 |
2960 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1937 |
2964 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1937 |
2965 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1937 |
2976 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1937 |
2982 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/09/1937 |
2951 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/09/1937 |
2976 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
5298 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/12/1937 |
2982 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1938 |
2947 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1938 |
2948 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1938 |
2981 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1938 |
2968 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1938 |
2975 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1938 |
2978 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1939 |
2955 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/10/1939 |
6201 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/10/1939 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/10/1939 |
6204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/10/1939 |
6205 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/12/1939 |
6206 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/12/1939 |
6205 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/12/1939 |
6205 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
30/01/1940 |
6205 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
30/01/1940 |
6205 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1940 |
2947 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1940 |
2955 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/04/1940 |
6203 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/04/1940 |
6204 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/04/1940 |
6206 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/04/1940 |
6205 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/06/1940 |
6207 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
08/06/1940 |
6208 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
10/08/1940 |
6207 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
10/08/1940 |
6208 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1940 |
2948 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
05/10/1940 |
6201 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/11/1940 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/11/1940 |
6204 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/03/1941 |
2981 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/05/1941 |
2975 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/05/1941 |
2978 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/05/1941 |
2968 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/07/1941 |
2958 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/03/1942 |
6204 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/03/1942 |
6204 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/04/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/04/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/04/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1942 |
2959 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1942 |
2964 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1942 |
6204 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1942 |
6204 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
17/10/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
17/10/1942 |
6204 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
17/10/1942 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
17/10/1942 |
6204 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1942 |
2945 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1942 |
2978 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/12/1942 |
2945 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/12/1942 |
2965 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
26/12/1942 |
6203 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
03/04/1943 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
03/04/1943 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
03/04/1943 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/05/1943 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
27/05/1943 |
6204 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1943 |
2958 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1943 |
2972 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/10/1943 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/10/1943 |
6203 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
27/11/1943 |
6203 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/01/1944 |
6205 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/05/1944 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/05/1944 |
6201 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/05/1944 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/05/1944 |
6204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
24/03/1945 |
6201 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
24/05/1945 |
6204 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1945 |
2972 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1945 |
2978 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1946 |
2958 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1946 |
2958 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1946 |
2958 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1946 |
2958 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
27674 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2925 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2946 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2955 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2972 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
6100 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
6163 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1946 |
2946 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1946 |
2972 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/04/1947 |
2955 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/04/1947 |
2957 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/04/1947 |
2958 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
12/07/1947 |
6205 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
12/07/1947 |
6205 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
18/10/1947 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
18/10/1947 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
18/10/1947 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
18/10/1947 |
6203 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
18/10/1947 |
6205 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11353 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11439 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11445 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12111 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2426 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2453 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2459 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2564 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2597 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2612 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2658 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2925 |
Snapshot |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
46917 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4904 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4935 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
495 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
50 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5022 |
Snapshot |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5045 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5054 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5094 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51318 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52170 |
Snapshot |
26D |
Bury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5256 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5298 |
Snapshot |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5298 |
Snapshot |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5332 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5344 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5347 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5350 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5351 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5376 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5380 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5387 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5398 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5399 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5400 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5410 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5500 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5501 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5511 |
Snapshot |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5517 |
Snapshot |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5520 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5521 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5523 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5526 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5527 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5533 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5543 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5545 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5547 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5567 |
Snapshot |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5586 |
Snapshot |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5592 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5602 |
Snapshot |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5613 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5623 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5634 |
Snapshot |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5666 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5672 |
Snapshot |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5673 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5681 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5724 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5725 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6106 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6111 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6124 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6134 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6135 |
Snapshot |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6136 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6138 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6144 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6156 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6163 |
Snapshot |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6164 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
628 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6900 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7309 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7325 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7385 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7402 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7404 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7597 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7603 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7651 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7887 |
Snapshot |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7930 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7933 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7938 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7951 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7956 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7958 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7959 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8898 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8908 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8927 |
Snapshot |
25D |
Mirfield |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8933 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8966 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9016 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9032 |
Snapshot |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9130 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9137 |
Snapshot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9155 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9239 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9242 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9287 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9333 |
Snapshot |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9355 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9385 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9449 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
46924 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
17/01/1948 |
6200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
7932 |
Transfer in from: |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
17/01/1948 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
5511 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
5054 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
5298 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
2596 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
14/02/1948 |
6203 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
495 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
5511 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
5517 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
14/02/1948 |
6203 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/02/1948 |
6205 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
9038 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
21/02/1948 |
7938 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
10695 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
50692 |
Transfer in from: |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
50696 |
Transfer in from: |
23C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
7931 |
Transfer in from: |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
46924 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
5387 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
628 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
27580 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
6123 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
51318 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
13/03/1948 |
6200 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
2583 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
2602 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
7320 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
50696 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
9038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
2570 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
7937 |
Transfer in from: |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
7294 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
7603 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
5094 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
m/e |
06/1948 |
7959 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
46243 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
45045 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
45592 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
46917 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5500 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5501 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5520 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5523 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5567 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
6 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
6134 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
6136 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
1560 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
6900 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
7 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
6147 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
5637 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
9126 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
9130 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
58890 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
49006 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
9287 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
07/08/1948 |
7930 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
8948 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
9016 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
8932 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
9346 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
9242 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
52118 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
5534 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
5725 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
58897 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
58932 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
9287 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
49006 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/09/1948 |
52170 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
46251 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
45724 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
5543 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
5547 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
5634 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
58897 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
7720 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
7799 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
50695 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
45567 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
45545 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
8948 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45181 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45236 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45242 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45248 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45276 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45596 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
5534 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
27/11/1948 |
7956 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
on |
04/12/1948 |
7958 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
2564 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45181 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45236 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45242 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45248 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45276 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46101 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46126 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/12/1948 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/12/1948 |
46201 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/12/1948 |
46204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
52330 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
58921 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
2564 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45181 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45236 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45242 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45248 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45276 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46205 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46243 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46251 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
48908 |
Transfer out to: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
58890 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
52330 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
52330 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
44906 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
4905 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
9136 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
m/e |
01/1949 |
47951 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
46138 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
7720 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
49104 |
Transfer in from: |
11E |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
49241 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
49298 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
49357 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
49104 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
49224 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
49104 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
46137 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
46147 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
49404 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
9287 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
45410 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
49419 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
49357 |
Transfer out to: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
49427 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
49429 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
48966 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
9155 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
58908 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
45005 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
47936 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
49298 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45017 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45538 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44904 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44935 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45236 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45672 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
28/05/1949 |
46204 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
4905 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
m/e |
06/1949 |
47936 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
44868 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
11439 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
7651 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
58911 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
58908 |
Transfer out to: |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
m/e |
09/1949 |
47932 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
44907 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
45243 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
50687 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
50695 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
58908 |
Transfer in from: |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
25352 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
m/e |
10/1949 |
50692 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45703 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45724 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
46136 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/10/1949 |
46204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/10/1949 |
46205 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45526 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45586 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45666 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
49032 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
49241 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
9346 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
45670 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
46153 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
48457 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
48512 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
48513 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
8510 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
45724 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
46136 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
42453 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
58926 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
45515 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
8943 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
45393 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
45393 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
45393 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
on |
31/12/1949 |
58883 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
49181 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Warwick |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
40055 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
50687 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
58924 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
45721 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
45737 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
45738 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
49126 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
40054 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
45303 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
50695 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
58908 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
47353 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
44768 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
44769 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
44772 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
44773 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
47416 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
7357 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
40054 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
40055 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
49445 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Coventry |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
48927 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
49399 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
9385 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
49333 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
49181 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45531 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45351 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45703 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45738 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
10/06/1950 |
46204 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45531 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
49412 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
40144 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45531 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
47933 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
49301 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
58897 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
7407 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
7407 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
44868 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
58932 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
7407 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
40001 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
40003 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
40007 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49081 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49173 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49200 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
49394 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45333 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45343 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45726 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
30/09/1950 |
46204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
42658 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
46101 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
58911 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45333 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45343 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45726 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49082 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49173 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49394 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45333 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45343 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45726 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
47309 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49173 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
49394 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
w/e |
07/10/1950 |
47937 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
45028 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
40103 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
49392 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
47320 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
48943 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
40103 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
42892 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
42925 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45113 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45558 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49392 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
40103 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45028 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
49392 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
44773 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
45113 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
47519 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
44773 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
45113 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
47294 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
12/1950 |
48933 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
44773 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
45547 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
47519 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
42925 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
44773 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
45558 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
47519 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
42892 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
49104 |
Transfer out to: |
4B |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
58921 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
45741 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
47411 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
47430 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
47487 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
47489 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
47498 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
40001 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
40003 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
40007 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
40103 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
40144 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
45547 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
45741 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47411 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47430 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47487 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47489 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47498 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
45741 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47411 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47430 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47487 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47489 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
47498 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45019 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45510 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45676 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
9375 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45017 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45181 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45332 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45343 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45350 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
46144 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
46153 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45019 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45510 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45676 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45019 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45510 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45676 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
49082 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
52111 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45017 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45070 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45181 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45343 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
46144 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
46153 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45510 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45676 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
49423 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Warwick |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
9239 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
9239 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
49301 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
9239 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
46166 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
49423 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
49423 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45647 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
46151 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
46158 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
46165 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45019 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45737 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45741 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
07/07/1951 |
46205 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1951 |
45673 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45647 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46151 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46158 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46165 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
42426 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45647 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46151 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46158 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46165 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
46166 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45039 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
48046 |
Transfer in from: |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
48260 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45017 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
15/09/1951 |
46205 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
49271 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
46151 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
46165 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
48898 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/09/1951 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/09/1951 |
46207 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/09/1951 |
46208 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/09/1951 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/09/1951 |
46203 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
42426 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
48046 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
42426 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
49271 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
42426 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
49271 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
44760 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
45333 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
45534 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
10/11/1951 |
46205 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
49314 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
45400 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
49449 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
7F |
0-8-4T |
w/e |
15/12/1951 |
47931 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/12/1951 |
52330 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
49434 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
9368 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
9437 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
45070 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45111 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
48260 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
52105 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
47430 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
48260 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
45069 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
45430 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
45430 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
45128 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
51313 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44760 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
45069 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
45128 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1952 |
12018 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/09/1952 |
46205 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45421 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45525 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
46205 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
42612 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
46106 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
46111 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
46126 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
46205 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
52118 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45525 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45525 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/10/1952 |
12018 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
48510 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/12/1952 |
45637 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
45606 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
45005 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
45248 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
46144 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
45606 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
45256 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
45606 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
45256 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
46149 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
46152 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
46137 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
46156 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1953 |
52105 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1953 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1953 |
46203 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
52140 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/05/1953 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
23/05/1953 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
23/05/1953 |
46203 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
13/06/1953 |
46201 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45249 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
46106 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
46166 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45347 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45647 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45726 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
45413 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/09/1953 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45020 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45069 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45250 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45388 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
46106 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
46166 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
49271 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
42121 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
46226 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
42597 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
46226 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
45373 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
46110 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
46251 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
45373 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
45005 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
45410 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
46135 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
46251 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
12/06/1954 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
42155 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45535 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45603 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45606 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
42664 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
42596 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
9368 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
41116 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
41121 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
41166 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
18/09/1954 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
25/09/1954 |
46206 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
46132 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
46157 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
46228 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
46251 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
23/10/1954 |
46206 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
45111 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
46228 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
46132 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
45516 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
45544 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
46132 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
46226 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
46254 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
45721 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
45020 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
45388 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
45393 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
45603 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
46254 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
46226 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
49314 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
46251 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
46251 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
46251 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
25/06/1955 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
46153 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
46158 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
48509 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/10/1955 |
46211 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
46114 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
46142 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
46251 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
41116 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
41166 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
45401 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
28/01/1956 |
46212 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/02/1956 |
46207 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/02/1956 |
46207 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
25/02/1956 |
46207 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
45344 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
25/02/1956 |
46207 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
10/03/1956 |
46212 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
45113 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
45613 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
45552 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
45583 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
48433 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
44773 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
44773 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/06/1956 |
46211 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
46147 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/06/1956 |
46211 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
46251 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
07/07/1956 |
46211 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
45241 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
45353 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
46110 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
46147 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
46149 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
48932 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
15/09/1956 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
15/09/1956 |
46210 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
27/10/1956 |
51313 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45539 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
47566 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45241 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45353 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
47325 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
42564 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
42564 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
45623 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
45623 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
41121 |
Transfer out to: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
48280 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
42664 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/06/1957 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/06/1957 |
46204 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
22/06/1957 |
46205 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
07/1957 |
51353 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42426 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45249 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45303 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45538 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45249 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45516 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/09/1957 |
46200 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/09/1957 |
46204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
45516 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
46130 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
45554 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
45560 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
46137 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
47488 |
Transfer in from: |
13B |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
46152 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
46157 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
49081 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
49394 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
52140 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
42602 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
46137 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
47431 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
49394 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42602 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
45630 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
45689 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
45630 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45032 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45257 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
46147 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
46155 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
46156 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48479 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48504 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45623 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45689 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
14/06/1958 |
46204 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
05/07/1958 |
46204 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/07/1958 |
46210 |
Transfer out to: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/08/1958 |
D3576 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/09/1958 |
46209 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
48504 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/09/1958 |
46203 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/09/1958 |
D3578 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
42441 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45586 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45678 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45733 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45250 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45256 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45257 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45533 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/10/1958 |
45256 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/10/1958 |
45243 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/10/1958 |
D3579 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/10/1958 |
46119 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/11/1958 |
D3576 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
01/11/1958 |
47431 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
49116 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
49366 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
49416 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/11/1958 |
45549 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/11/1958 |
49130 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
15/11/1958 |
47385 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
29/11/1958 |
46211 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
48249 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
48318 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
48260 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
48504 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1959 |
49132 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1959 |
49130 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1959 |
49423 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
31/01/1959 |
49405 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
31/01/1959 |
49435 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
46130 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1959 |
49082 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
47656 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
28/03/1959 |
49200 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/03/1959 |
49116 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
46130 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
49132 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
47412 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
47285 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
47594 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
49243 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
44714 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
44905 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
44714 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
44905 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45539 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45544 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45549 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45586 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45678 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/06/1959 |
46200 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/06/1959 |
46209 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
48504 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
27/06/1959 |
D215 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
D218 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
D220 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
44905 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
42441 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
42602 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
D222 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
45678 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
45583 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45281 |
Transfer in from: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45578 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45583 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45586 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45613 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45666 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
49064 |
Transfer in from: |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
44905 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
46147 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
46155 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
46164 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
D223 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
46130 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
46132 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
46142 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
45704 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
45666 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
46123 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
03/10/1959 |
46207 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/10/1959 |
49366 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
D231 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
D234 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
D236 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/11/1959 |
46100 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47289 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47336 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
48683 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45256 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45276 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45343 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45380 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45398 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45410 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45534 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
46156 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
07/11/1959 |
46211 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49419 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
49427 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49355 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49429 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49435 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
49445 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/11/1959 |
46211 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
40050 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
42459 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
42583 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
47407 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
47411 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
47489 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
on |
28/12/1959 |
D2912 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
on |
31/12/1959 |
D2913 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
02/01/1960 |
42459 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
02/01/1960 |
42583 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
48927 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
49144 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D2912 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
D2913 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
48479 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
45516 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
45586 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
45704 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
45733 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
47498 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/03/1960 |
42564 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
45515 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
45380 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
45398 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
42459 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D214 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D268 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
47402 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Horwich Works |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
44838 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
45072 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
45187 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
45440 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
48323 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
D2 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
D235 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
45412 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
45438 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
48742 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
D9 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
48683 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1960 |
49064 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
45072 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
45438 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
45670 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42570 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42583 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
51445 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
51441 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/07/1960 |
45196 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/07/1960 |
D2 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/08/1960 |
46203 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
47594 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
47597 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
49155 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
49444 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
D290 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44758 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
10/09/1960 |
46203 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
45735 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
46126 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
46154 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
46233 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
49262 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
49448 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D214 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D218 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D220 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D222 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D268 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
44855 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
49352 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
49262 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
D293 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
44682 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
45381 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
45680 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
45188 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
45410 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
48349 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
49037 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45091 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45307 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45392 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45583 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
48349 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
D305 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
D309 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
D300 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
D306 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
D312 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45520 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45543 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45380 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45381 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45613 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
42081 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
46236 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45525 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
45735 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
46114 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
46126 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
D303 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
D328 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49002 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49142 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49415 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
49432 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45032 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
45527 |
Transfer out to: |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
46236 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
49352 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/03/1961 |
46203 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/03/1961 |
46211 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1961 |
49243 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
51441 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
25/03/1961 |
47594 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
47166 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
D328 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
46229 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
46241 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
46243 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
49352 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
49142 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
45410 |
Transfer out to: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
10/05/1961 |
D343 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/05/1961 |
D344 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1961 |
49130 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45524 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45547 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45551 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
D303 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
42081 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45552 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45554 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45560 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45567 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45578 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45678 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45680 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45681 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
49142 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/06/1961 |
D2198 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/07/1961 |
D2393 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
47597 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
46154 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
29/07/1961 |
47594 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/08/1961 |
D2373 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/08/1961 |
D344 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
47597 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
D331 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
D332 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
45513 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
45518 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
49002 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
42599 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45533 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45069 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45281 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45392 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
45521 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1961 |
45655 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1961 |
45671 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
07/10/1961 |
46204 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49136 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49412 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
49444 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
49392 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
49399 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
49405 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1961 |
45094 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1961 |
45327 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1961 |
45340 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45041 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45131 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45284 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45390 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
46110 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
46116 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
46134 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45655 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
45671 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
45401 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
48927 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
45015 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
49114 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/12/1961 |
D219 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
45069 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
46110 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
46110 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
D331 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
D332 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
45254 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
45518 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
47353 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/02/1962 |
47404 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
45148 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
47594 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D9 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
45295 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
45316 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
D236 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
49404 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
48188 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
48746 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
49293 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
49377 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
45543 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
48509 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
48512 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
44682 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
45520 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
46134 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
49155 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
45551 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
48425 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
D219 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
D223 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
D293 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
D300 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
44758 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45069 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45131 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45181 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45188 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45295 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45316 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45340 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45390 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45398 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45399 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45412 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45413 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45421 |
Transfer out to: |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1962 |
45139 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1962 |
45596 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
D173 |
Transfer in from: |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
45139 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
D223 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
45139 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
48078 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
48469 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
48532 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
48652 |
Transfer in from: |
20B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
48702 |
Transfer in from: |
55B |
Stourton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
49416 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
49437 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D173 |
Transfer out to: |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45513 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45524 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45533 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45547 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
49352 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
48509 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
48512 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
42599 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
42815 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
42848 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
42886 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
46208 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
49434 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1962 |
49377 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/10/1962 |
49394 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
45148 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
45254 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
42920 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
42924 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
42925 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
42851 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
42121 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
47488 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49144 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49224 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49293 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49415 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
49432 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
49375 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/12/1962 |
D4154 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/12/1962 |
D4155 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
42833 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
49448 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
49142 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
42833 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
46124 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
49037 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
42155 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
45139 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
45091 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
45327 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
45196 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
D3019 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
D2393 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/04/1963 |
D3370 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
44964 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
44855 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
47336 |
Transfer out to: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
47166 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45156 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
46110 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
48318 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45069 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
45312 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
44864 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
45244 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
48029 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
48029 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
45244 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
45188 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
17/08/1963 |
46116 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
47349 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
47656 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48425 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48469 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48509 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48532 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
48702 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
10/1963 |
47412 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
47230 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
45041 |
Transfer out to: |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
45188 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
45531 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
48652 |
Transfer out to: |
9M |
Bury |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/10/1963 |
45535 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
47485 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/11/1963 |
46119 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
45103 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
48425 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
45261 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
45338 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
45414 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
46233 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
46229 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D231 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D290 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D305 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D306 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D309 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D312 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D343 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
47230 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
48026 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
48151 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
48176 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
48189 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
48199 |
Transfer in from: |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
48200 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/05/1964 |
42851 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
44827 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45466 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
47289 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
47566 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
47594 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
D228 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
D290 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
49173 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
48176 |
Transfer out to: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
08/1964 |
47349 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
47415 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
45617 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
45672 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
45676 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
45733 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
46239 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
29/08/1964 |
46240 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1964 |
45103 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
46241 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48026 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
19/09/1964 |
45733 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
26/09/1964 |
42815 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/09/1964 |
45676 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
10/1964 |
46239 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
10/1964 |
46240 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coronation (Semi) |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
10/1964 |
46243 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
D223 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
D228 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
48199 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1964 |
45617 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1964 |
45672 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
D2391 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
D2392 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
28/11/1964 |
42925 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
45402 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
42848 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
42886 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
42924 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
26/12/1964 |
42920 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D215 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D234 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D235 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
D290 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
47485 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
47406 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1965 |
45414 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
45338 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
45466 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
48323 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48029 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48129 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48296 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48303 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48189 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48425 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
48457 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
48303 |
Transfer out to: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
48163 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48029 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48163 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
48296 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
75060 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
45402 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1965 |
44769 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
44827 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/07/1965 |
44837 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/07/1965 |
44863 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
44688 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
48293 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/07/1965 |
44717 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
47285 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
47487 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1965 |
48078 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
09/1965 |
47519 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
D3858 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
47493 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1965 |
45261 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
08/01/1966 |
42663 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1966 |
D3836 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1966 |
D3578 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
42663 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1966 |
45312 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
48151 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
48129 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1966 |
75060 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
47415 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
44926 |
Transfer in from: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
44933 |
Transfer in from: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1966 |
48280 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1966 |
48188 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D3578 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1966 |
48467 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1966 |
48528 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
07/1966 |
47416 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
48178 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
48371 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
48536 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
48742 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1966 |
48200 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
44666 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
44774 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
45426 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
44688 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
48056 |
Transfer in from: |
16F |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
48258 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1966 |
48512 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2198 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2373 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2391 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2392 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
48743 |
Transfer in from: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48045 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48119 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48124 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48178 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48604 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45249 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48249 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/12/1966 |
47357 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/12/1966 |
47406 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
47493 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1967 |
48536 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1967 |
48687 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48696 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/02/1967 |
48395 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/02/1967 |
44666 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1967 |
45094 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
48529 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
48665 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
44777 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
45287 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
48513 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/03/1967 |
44834 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/03/1967 |
48743 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
48604 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
44863 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1967 |
44768 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1967 |
48012 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1967 |
45242 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
D4147 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
48017 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
48268 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
45069 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1967 |
48528 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
48450 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
44717 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
44774 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
45039 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
48258 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
44837 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
48395 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
45015 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
45440 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1967 |
48374 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/09/1967 |
48692 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1967 |
48450 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1967 |
44772 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1967 |
44907 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D3950 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
45055 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
45133 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
45375 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
48294 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
45307 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
44933 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
44964 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
48371 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
48268 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/11/1967 |
48017 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
48119 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44711 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45282 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45296 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
45395 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48362 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48614 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48715 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
48752 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
44834 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
44773 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/12/1967 |
48362 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
48696 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/01/1968 |
45005 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/01/1968 |
45375 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
45133 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/02/1968 |
45296 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1968 |
44906 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
48722 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
44838 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1968 |
45395 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1968 |
45426 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1968 |
48012 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1968 |
45376 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
48433 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
44926 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/04/1968 |
48614 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
44711 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
44864 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
45282 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
45284 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
48045 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
48056 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
48124 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3019 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3370 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3578 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3579 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3836 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3858 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D3950 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4147 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4154 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D4155 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
44777 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45055 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45156 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45187 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
45287 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48293 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48294 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48374 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48467 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48529 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48665 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48687 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48692 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48715 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48746 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48752 |
Transfer out to: |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
48722 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|