Depot: Exeter
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1907 | 2928 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1913 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1915 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1925 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1926 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1928 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/01/1929 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1929 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1929 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1931 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1932 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1932 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1932 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1934 | 5014 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1934 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1934 | 5011 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1934 | 5014 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1934 | 5030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1934 | 5013 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1934 | 5015 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/07/1934 | 4085 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1934 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1934 | 4098 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/08/1935 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4849 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4851 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1935 | 5015 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1935 | 5013 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 1930 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5543 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1936 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/02/1936 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1936 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 4707 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1936 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1936 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/05/1936 | 5030 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1936 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1936 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/10/1936 | 4099 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1937 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1937 | 4085 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1937 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/05/1937 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1937 | 5059 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1937 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1937 | 5065 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1937 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1937 | 4098 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1937 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1938 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1938 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1938 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1938 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1938 | 5076 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1938 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1938 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1938 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/03/1939 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1939 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1939 | 5065 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1939 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1939 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1939 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1939 | 5050 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1939 | 5011 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1940 | 5071 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1940 | 5071 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1941 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1941 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1941 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/09/1941 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1942 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1942 | 5050 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1943 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1943 | 4099 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 4707 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5525 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4849 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 7316 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 18/05/1946 | 9647 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 9646 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1946 | 5098 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 7422 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1947 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1020 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1405 | Snapshot | exe | Tiverton Junction | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1429 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1435 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1449 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1451 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1451 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1469 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1930 | Snapshot | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2088 | Snapshot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2814 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2834 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2873 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2928 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3335 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3395 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3794 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3815 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3834 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3952 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4054 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4410 | Snapshot | la | Moorswater | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4530 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5012 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5012 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5059 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5059 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5098 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5098 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5525 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5525 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5543 | Snapshot | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5760 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6397 | Snapshot | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7316 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7316 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7422 | Snapshot | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7716 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77288 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7761 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9646 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9646 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9647 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9647 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 3395 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4410 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 5098 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 3335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1020 | Transfer out to: | NEY | Neyland | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 1023 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3400 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4410 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 3341 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 3400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5976 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4706 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 3341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 3677 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 2834 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4054 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 8456 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 1023 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 9646 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 5062 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 5062 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 5062 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 4530 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 77288 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 8421 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 8421 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 8421 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 2873 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 3834 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 5062 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1951 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4932 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9439 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4932 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 9439 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4932 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 9439 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1951 | 3451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 9439 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 9439 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 9647 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6301 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6301 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4401 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2088 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6301 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6301 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 4401 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 4401 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4932 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6397 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 4948 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 4401 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 9765 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 4410 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1953 | 5059 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1409 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6318 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9629 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1409 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5522 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1953 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5522 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 7711 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5321 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5525 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6365 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6938 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6385 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 5992 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6365 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2211 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5992 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5412 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5760 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6318 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/12/1954 | 9497 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 6322 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 7711 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5362 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5796 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5796 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 1439 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4955 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4988 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6407 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9668 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5362 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 9668 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 1439 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4988 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6301 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6407 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 6938 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5344 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6337 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6820 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6870 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2814 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4174 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5422 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5796 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5422 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5796 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6337 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6870 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 5959 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1957 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 9474 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1957 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5959 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 4117 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1957 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4967 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5536 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5959 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6394 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 2230 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4117 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1957 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4117 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4548 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4174 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4955 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4967 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6394 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6820 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1957 | 4548 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3746 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5530 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5339 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6322 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6965 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1958 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4553 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4992 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 7311 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 7326 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5530 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1435 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2211 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4553 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 7326 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1958 | 1405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1958 | 1469 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3512 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3518 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3521 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5536 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1958 | D3598 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1471 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 4589 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5524 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5546 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1449 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3677 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 4117 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3522 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4944 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3598 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3603 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6371 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 8456 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5976 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 6371 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4960 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 3815 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 5524 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 03/1959 | 1429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 1462 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 4117 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5524 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5339 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 8421 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 9439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1959 | 5075 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5546 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1452 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1007 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1023 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4960 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5959 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 3606 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6385 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1959 | 7716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6319 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6319 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 1608 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 9480 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | D3518 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | D2131 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | D2132 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5946 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | D3512 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4105 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4145 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4150 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4176 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4178 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4924 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5174 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6813 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6829 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 9629 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 06/1960 | 1452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1960 | 5524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4129 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1960 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4589 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 9474 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 1650 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6146 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 9487 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D2131 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D2132 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1960 | 4083 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4105 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4117 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4129 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4178 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4924 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4992 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5174 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6813 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6829 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4924 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5175 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5508 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6814 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6868 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4145 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 4176 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 1468 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5175 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 7761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 4165 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 6814 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 6868 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 4967 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1007 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1023 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 1466 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 1470 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 1440 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 4970 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 4984 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 4993 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5913 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 7224 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 4996 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 4150 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1961 | 5075 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 1468 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | 4083 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5555 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5560 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4948 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1961 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 4909 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 6994 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 1650 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1961 | 9765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5508 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 9633 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 1468 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 1608 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6994 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 3659 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 3709 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 9635 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 4909 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1962 | 5412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1962 | 5560 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D2182 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1962 | 5913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 9497 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1962 | D4162 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1962 | D4129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1962 | D4130 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6146 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 4673 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 5917 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 3709 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 4165 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 5946 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1962 | 9487 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1450 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1962 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4924 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4944 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4967 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4970 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4984 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4993 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4996 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5917 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 1462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 5190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 7311 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 7316 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | D2182 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9633 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1962 | 4037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 01/10/1962 | 1470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6346 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6965 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1421 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9480 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 1442 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 3746 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 9635 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3517 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3519 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3522 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 6346 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1963 | 5555 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 1451 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 3659 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 10/1963 | 1471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1421 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1442 | Transfer out to: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1450 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1466 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3517 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3519 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3521 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3794 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D4129 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D4130 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D4162 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4673 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1964 | 6103 | Condemned |