Depot: Faversham
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | q/e | 12/1935 | 1674 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1229 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1231 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1242 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1260 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1279 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1310 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1481 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1487 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1674 | Snapshot | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1674 | Snapshot | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1692 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1699 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1715 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1739 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1741 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1808 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31046 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31106 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1850 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1854 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1727 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1440 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1739 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 31046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1948 | 31438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1661 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1231 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1496 | Transfer out to: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 31667 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 31106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 1903 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 1904 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 1808 | Transfer out to: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 31639 | Transfer out to: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1696 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1698 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1808 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 31639 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 31673 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 31705 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1309 | Transfer out to: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1310 | Transfer out to: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1903 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 1904 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 31279 | Transfer out to: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 31448 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31487 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31509 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31487 | Transfer out to: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31509 | Transfer out to: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 1273 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/1949 | 31709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | 31638 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | 31806 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1950 | 31699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31268 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31830 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 1260 | Transfer out to: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31493 | Transfer out to: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 31509 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31157 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31808 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31868 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31639 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31673 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31808 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 31501 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 31501 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 31830 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 31259 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 31532 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31259 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31532 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31259 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31501 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31532 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31741 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31487 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31492 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31494 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31586 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31737 | Transfer in from: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31741 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31748 | Transfer in from: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31487 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 31157 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 31502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 31748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 31532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 31696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31509 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31545 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31727 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31737 | Transfer out to: | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31868 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31509 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31545 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31509 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31545 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1951 | 31379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31267 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31317 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31591 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31693 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31708 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31803 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31804 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 1229 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31242 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31259 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31481 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31495 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31631 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31638 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31715 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31741 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 31705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31162 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31253 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31255 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31256 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31305 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31481 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31317 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31505 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31586 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31295 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31326 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31327 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31461 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31714 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31715 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31369 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31591 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31691 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31692 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31693 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31260 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31260 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31260 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1951 | 31273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 31324 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 31500 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 31503 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 31509 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 31545 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 31327 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1952 | 41304 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 31166 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 31315 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 31808 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1952 | 41305 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1952 | 41306 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1952 | 41308 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1952 | 41309 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1952 | 41310 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1952 | 41311 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1952 | 41312 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 07/06/1952 | 31674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31505 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31295 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31305 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31324 | Transfer out to: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31326 | Transfer out to: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 41304 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 31637 | Transfer in from: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 31637 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 31637 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 41305 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 11/10/1952 | 31708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 31247 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31660 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31663 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31671 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31704 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33002 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33004 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33005 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33016 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31162 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31500 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31698 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 30052 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 30053 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 30129 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 31519 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 31704 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 33002 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1953 | 31260 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 33005 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | m/e | 07/1953 | 31663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31305 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31505 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31852 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 30052 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 30053 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 30129 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31505 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31519 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31660 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31661 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31671 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 33004 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 33016 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 31470 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 31461 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 31637 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 31166 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 31508 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 31720 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 31267 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1954 | 31508 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/03/1954 | 31315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 31802 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 31505 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 31806 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 31854 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 31253 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31242 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31505 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31509 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31892 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31893 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31903 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 41313 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31802 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31803 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31804 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 41306 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 31305 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 31505 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 31505 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31765 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31766 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31767 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31768 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31470 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31487 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31489 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31492 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 31720 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 31247 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 31720 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 31298 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 31767 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | D3670 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | D3671 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | D3719 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | D3720 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | D3721 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31242 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31255 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31256 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31268 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31298 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31481 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31494 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31503 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31505 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31509 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31714 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31715 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31720 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31765 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31766 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31768 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31850 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31852 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31892 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31893 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31903 | Transfer out to: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 41308 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 41309 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 41310 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 41311 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 41312 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 41313 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1959 | D2277 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | D3670 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | D3670 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | D3720 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | D3670 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | D3670 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D2274 | Transfer in from: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D2277 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 11227 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | D2274 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | D2256 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | D3465 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | D3471 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 15221 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 15223 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 15226 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | D3465 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | D3719 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/12/1963 | D3721 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 15221 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 15223 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 15226 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | D2256 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | D2257 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | D3471 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | D3670 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 27/01/1964 | D3671 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford |