Depot: Feltham
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | q/e | 12/1935 | 166 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | q/e | 12/1935 | 3154 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1939 | 838 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1939 | 839 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1939 | 840 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1939 | 841 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1939 | 842 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1943 | 833 | Transfer in from: | NX | New Cross Gate | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1943 | 834 | Transfer in from: | NX | New Cross Gate | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1943 | 835 | Transfer in from: | NX | New Cross Gate | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1943 | 836 | Transfer in from: | NX | New Cross Gate | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1943 | 837 | Transfer in from: | NX | New Cross Gate | ||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 139 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 140 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 153 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 166 | Snapshot | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 167 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1696 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1698 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 174 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 254 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 31 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3154 | Snapshot | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3154 | Snapshot | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3163 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3167 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3400 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3433 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 394 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 494 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 497 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 498 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 499 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 512 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 688 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 697 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 698 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C31 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C32 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C33 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C34 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C35 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C36 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C37 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C38 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C39 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C40 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | P | 02/01/1948 | 1696 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | P | 02/01/1948 | 1698 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | P | 02/01/1948 | 1696 | Transfer out to: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | P | 02/01/1948 | 1698 | Transfer out to: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 1696 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 1698 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 308 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 309 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 346 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 352 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C10 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C11 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C12 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C13 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C9 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C31 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C32 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C33 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C34 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C35 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C36 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C37 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C38 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C39 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C40 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 841 | Transfer out to: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 842 | Transfer out to: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 396 | Transfer out to: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 496 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 497 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 498 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 07/1948 | 9 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 384 | Transfer in from: | DOR | Dorchester | ||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 43 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | C8 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 308 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 30153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 30394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 30158 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 30144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 30167 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 164 | Transfer in from: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 30955 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | 30955 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/12/1949 | 30696 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 30140 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 30331 | Transfer in from: | SAL | Salisbury | ||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 30334 | Transfer in from: | SAL | Salisbury | ||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 30335 | Transfer in from: | SAL | Salisbury | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 30496 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 30497 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 498 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | C6 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | C7 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 30031 | Transfer out to: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 30334 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 30335 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 30738 | Reinstated | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 30249 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 30331 | Transfer out to: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 30384 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 30249 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 30249 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 30249 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 30249 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 30738 | Transfer out to: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30038 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30455 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30457 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30693 | Transfer in from: | BAS | Basingstoke | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30249 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 30038 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 30038 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30339 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30355 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30568 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30309 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30455 | Transfer out to: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30457 | Transfer out to: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 30579 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 30571 | Transfer in from: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 30744 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Basingstoke | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 30693 | Transfer out to: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 30835 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 30836 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 30837 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1951 | 30174 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1951 | 30164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 30733 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 30733 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 30230 | Transfer in from: | 71C | Dorchester | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 30254 | Transfer out to: | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31852 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31863 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31864 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33007 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33009 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 33011 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 30744 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Basingstoke | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 33007 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 33009 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 33011 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 31852 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 31863 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 31864 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1953 | 30571 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 33026 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 33027 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 30697 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 30698 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 30253 | Transfer in from: | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 30193 | Transfer in from: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/01/1954 | 13040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/01/1954 | 13041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/02/1954 | 13042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 30193 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 30253 | Transfer out to: | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 30041 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 30042 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 33016 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 33018 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1956 | 30569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | on | 20/07/1956 | 30230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 30177 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 30179 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1956 | 30573 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1956 | 30570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1957 | 30572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 08/06/1957 | 30042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 31/08/1957 | 30041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1957 | 30688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 30243 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1958 | 30038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 32437 | Transfer in from: | NHN | Newhaven | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 32438 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/04/1958 | 30568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 30130 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1958 | 30243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | m/e | 02/1959 | 30492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 30032 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 30130 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 30352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 30031 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 30775 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 30777 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 30793 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 30795 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31892 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31893 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 32437 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 31033 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1959 | 30567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 30177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | on | 05/12/1959 | 30493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | on | 19/12/1959 | 30179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 30349 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 30516 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 30517 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 30775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 31033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | D3100 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31061 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31113 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31150 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31481 | Transfer in from: | 73H | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31498 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31573 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31579 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31892 | Transfer out to: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31893 | Transfer out to: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1960 | 30687 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | D3459 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 30777 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Basingstoke | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 30795 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Basingstoke | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 32438 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 31414 | Transfer in from: | 73H | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 31857 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 31923 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32408 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32416 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 30793 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Basingstoke | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 31481 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 31579 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30035 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30927 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30931 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30939 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32408 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32416 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33001 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33002 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33003 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33004 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33014 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33015 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33017 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33024 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33038 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30518 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30519 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 30520 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31414 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31857 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32408 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32416 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 30355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 30519 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 30927 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 30931 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 30939 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1961 | 30043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 30516 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 30517 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 30518 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 30520 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31895 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31896 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31897 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31924 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33040 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 30837 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 31113 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 30349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 31061 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 31498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 30696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 4610 | Transfer in from: | 73H | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 30689 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31895 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31896 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31897 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 31150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 31573 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 30339 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 30346 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 30339 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 30346 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 32416 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 32408 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 30339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33028 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33029 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3045 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3046 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3459 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | D3044 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | D3100 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 33024 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 33026 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 33028 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 33029 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 30520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/11/1962 | 31924 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 30494 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 30495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 30502 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D2179 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D2180 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D2274 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D2294 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3270 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3271 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3272 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3273 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3274 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3459 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3460 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 33014 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 33015 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 33016 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 33017 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 33018 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 30517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 30251 | Transfer in from: | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 31917 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 31923 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 17/02/1963 | 30035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1963 | 30513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 4672 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 4681 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 30032 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 30251 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1963 | 30496 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1963 | 30501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1963 | 30503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1963 | 30510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 30835 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 30836 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 30847 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 80012 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 80148 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 92205 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 92206 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 92211 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 92231 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 92239 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 4610 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1963 | 30500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 4672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 30497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 30509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 30511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 30514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 33002 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 33013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1963 | 30515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 80143 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 80154 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1963 | 30498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1963 | 33008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1963 | 33011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 30841 | Transfer in from: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 30842 | Transfer in from: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 30843 | Transfer in from: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 30844 | Transfer in from: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 92211 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73167 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73168 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73169 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73170 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73171 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92205 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92206 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92231 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92239 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 80095 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 80137 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 33001 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 06/10/1963 | 4681 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | D3093 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | D2274 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 33004 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 33006 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 30508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1963 | 30507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 30499 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 30506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 30841 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 30847 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 31917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 33010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 33038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 30823 | Transfer in from: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 30824 | Transfer in from: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 30830 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31912 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31913 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31914 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31924 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 33026 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 33030 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 73016 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 73043 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 73065 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 73155 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1964 | 33007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/03/1964 | 31913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/03/1964 | 30512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1964 | 30844 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1964 | 33003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1964 | 33030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1964 | 33040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 14/06/1964 | 80148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 33006 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 33020 | Transfer in from: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 80018 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/07/1964 | 30830 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/07/1964 | 31924 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1964 | 30836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 09/08/1964 | 80133 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 09/08/1964 | 80134 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 73167 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/08/1964 | 31912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/08/1964 | 31914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1964 | 30840 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 34019 | Transfer in from: | 70E | Salisbury | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 34077 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 73083 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 73087 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | D2180 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 33009 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 33012 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 73043 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 80134 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1964 | 30843 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 73087 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1964 | 30834 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 33006 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 33020 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 33026 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 33027 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 34019 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 34077 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73016 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73065 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73083 | Transfer out to: | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73155 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73168 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73169 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73170 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 73171 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80012 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80018 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80095 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80133 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80137 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80143 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 80154 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 30835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 30823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 76053 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 76055 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 76066 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | D3040 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30824 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30833 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30837 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30838 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30839 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30842 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30824 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30833 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30837 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30838 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30839 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 30842 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | D2179 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | D2294 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | D3042 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1965 | 30833 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | D3042 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80033 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80034 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80068 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80085 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80089 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80094 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80140 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 80141 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | D3093 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 30824 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 30842 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 76053 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 76055 | Transfer out to: | 70E | Salisbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 76066 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1965 | 30837 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1965 | 30838 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1965 | 30839 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 73016 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 73084 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 73085 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 73016 | Transfer out to: | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 73084 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 73085 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/12/1965 | 80089 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/12/1965 | 80141 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/01/1966 | 80034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 10/01/1966 | D3270 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 31/07/1966 | 80094 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | D3221 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/10/1966 | 80033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 02/10/1966 | 80068 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 80085 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 80140 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | D3221 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D3047 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D3048 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D3221 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D4100 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D4101 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | D4102 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1967 | D3094 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | D3094 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1968 | D2197 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1968 | D4101 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1968 | D3094 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1968 | D2197 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | D3460 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/07/1968 | D4103 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D4104 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D3044 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | D4105 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | D3045 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | D3094 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1968 | D3041 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1968 | D3094 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D3046 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | D3041 | Reinstated | 98Su | |||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1968 | D4114 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1968 | D3221 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | D3042 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | D3047 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | D3094 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D4114 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | D4106 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | D3041 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 05/03/1969 | D4106 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/04/1969 | D4111 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 28/04/1969 | D4111 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | D4108 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | D3048 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | D3271 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | D3272 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | D3273 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | D3274 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D3459 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D4100 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D4102 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D4103 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D4104 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D4105 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | D4108 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Selhurst |