Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1049 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4752 Week
» 3490 Month
» 417811 Year
» 1639376 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Fratton


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 08/1893 571 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 09/1893 573 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 09/1931 E573 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 02/1943 571 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 113 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 114 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 115 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 118 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 164 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 166 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 170 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 172 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1797 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1831 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 20 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2153 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2269 Snapshot        
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2337 Snapshot        
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2338 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2490 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2509 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2537 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2548 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2554 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2559 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2562 Snapshot        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2640 Snapshot        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2644 Snapshot        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2655 Snapshot        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2659 Snapshot        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2661 Snapshot        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2662 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2690 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2691 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 2694 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 27 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 280 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 287 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 303 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 304 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 305 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 314 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 338 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 377 Snapshot        
Steam S11 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 395 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 405 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 409 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 410 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 411 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 412 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 413 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 414 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 417 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 424 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 425 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 441 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 45 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 480 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 54 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 731 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 732 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 733 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T m/e 07/1948 2269 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 05/1949 32153 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/06/1949 32646 Transfer in from:        
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/06/1949 32677 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 12/1949 30410 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 01/1950 32690 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30426 Reinstated BAS Basingstoke    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30427 Reinstated 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/06/1950 32644 To Store      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 15/07/1950 30166 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31831 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30414 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30424 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 32337 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31612 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30413 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 12/1950 30412 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 30053 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30416 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30711 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32139 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Marsh Goods 0-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 32302 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32399 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30733 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 32537 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 02/1951 30405 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30418 Transfer in from: BAS Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31807 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31870 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31871 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32568 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 304 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30425 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30426 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30427 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30711 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31612 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 32338 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32399 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30733 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 32548 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30480 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 32548 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32640 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30441 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32647 Transfer in from: NHN Newhaven    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30027 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30338 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31797 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 05/1951 30020 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30113 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30114 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30118 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30280 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30303 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30305 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30314 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 05/1951 30731 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30307 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30733 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32548 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30733 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32548 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32677 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 12/05/1951 30115 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 06/1951 30409 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30051 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30415 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32160 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 32549 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 32550 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 33016 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 8w/e 27/06/1951 30416 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 8w/e 27/06/1951 30418 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 30732 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 32349 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 30732 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 05/09/1951 32646 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30164 Condemned      
Steam S11 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30395 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 10/1951 32647 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31851 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31852 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30045 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30054 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31870 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31871 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30417 Condemned      
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T m/e 12/1951 32160 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T m/e 12/1951 32691 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Goods 0-6-0 on 12/01/1952 32302 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 30733 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/01/1952 32479 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/01/1952 32495 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 30733 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 33016 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 06/1952 30170 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 06/1952 30172 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 06/1952 30411 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 06/1952 30733 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30725 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30726 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam P 0-6-0T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31027 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 9w/e 30/06/1952 32640 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 13/08/1952 31844 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 13/08/1952 32640 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 31808 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32138 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30307 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30377 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 06/12/1952 30725 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/01/1953 30732 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 02/1953 30415 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 30732 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 32677 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31852 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 27/03/1953 30023 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 6w/e 27/03/1953 30207 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 27/03/1953 30053 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/05/1953 30023 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/05/1953 30023 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 26/05/1953 32655 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30055 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30183 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30356 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30357 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31805 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32505 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30023 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30051 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam P 0-6-0T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31027 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31844 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31851 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 08/1953 32659 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1953 32646 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1953 32650 Transfer in from:        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31637 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31638 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/10/1953 32568 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 01/10/1953 32662 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 29/10/1953 30183 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam D15 4-4-0 4w/e 10/12/1953 30465 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam D15 4-4-0 4w/e 30/12/1953 30471 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 03/1954 30471 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 8w/e 13/05/1954 32640 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 8w/e 13/05/1954 32646 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 30729 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam D15 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 30465 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 32343 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 32337 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 32343 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 30337 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30356 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30022 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30039 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31611 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30055 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32495 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32505 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32640 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 17/12/1955 32490 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 19/12/1955 32495 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 15/06/1956 32640 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 15/06/1956 32646 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 32562 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 15/06/1956 32694 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/07/1956 32694 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/08/1956 32694 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T w/e 03/11/1956 32138 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32694 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30337 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 31804 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam O2 0-4-4T w/e 29/06/1957 30207 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 17/05/1958 30022 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 30356 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T q/e 06/06/1958 32678 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30726 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30729 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31611 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 06/12/1958 30356 Condemned      
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T w/e 10/01/1959 32139 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31637 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31807 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31808 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30377 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31614 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30732 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T w/e 12/09/1959 32677 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 22/10/1959 32636 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30039 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30357 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30377 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31614 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31638 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31804 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31805 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32337 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32349 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32479 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32495 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32509 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32548 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32549 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32550 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32636 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32640 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32646 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32650 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32661 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32678 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32694 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 32554 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T m/e 06/1960 32559 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 16/09/1961 30287 Condemned