Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 748 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6148 Week
» 24200 Month
» 257120 Year
» 1922496 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ardrossan


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17274 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17276 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17282 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17348 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17355 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17356 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17357 Snapshot        
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 17627 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2209 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2210 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2211 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2212 Snapshot 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 56259 Snapshot        
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 56279 Snapshot        
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 56282 Snapshot        
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 56311 Snapshot        
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 56364 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 57304 Snapshot        
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 57577 Snapshot        
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 57579 Snapshot        
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 57590 Snapshot        
Steam 300 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 57669 Snapshot        
Steam 300 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 57673 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 578 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 579 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 606 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 607 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 608 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 609 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 624 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 625 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 626 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 667 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 668 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 669 Snapshot        
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 05/06/1948 57304 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 09/09/1951 42212 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42212 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 42911 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 57357 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1952 42742 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 812 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1952 57579 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 29/11/1952 40607 Transfer out to: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 294 0-6-0 8w/e 21/03/1953 57357 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 26/12/1953 40607 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 20/02/1954 40666 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 17/04/1954 40638 Transfer in from: 30D Ayr    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 02/10/1954 42912 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 16/04/1955 42806 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 06/08/1955 57254 Transfer in from: 31A St Rollox (Balornock)    
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 06/08/1955 57276 Transfer out to: 63D Oban    
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 15/11/1955 57282 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 57266 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/05/1956 42697 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 782 0-6-0T 8w/e 27/10/1956 56364 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 294 0-6-0 8w/e 22/12/1956 57309 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1957 44159 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 812 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1957 57577 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 812 0-6-0 8w/e 31/08/1957 57566 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 812 0-6-0 4w/e 28/09/1957 57579 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 26/10/1957 44908 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1958 44908 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/10/1958 42124 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/10/1958 80030 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 25/10/1958 40606 Transfer out to: 64D Carstairs    
Steam 782 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/10/1958 56279 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 22/11/1958 40606 Transfer in from: 64D Carstairs    
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 08/01/1959 56311 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/02/1959 80030 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/03/1959 45456 Transfer in from: 29A Perth South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/03/1959 45457 Transfer in from: 29A Perth South    
Steam 782 0-6-0T 4w/e 14/03/1959 56352 Transfer in from: 29A Perth South    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1959 40608 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1959 40609 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 15/05/1959 56352 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 25/05/1959 40606 Condemned      
Steam 782 0-6-0T 4w/e 06/06/1959 56372 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 06/06/1959 40607 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 06/06/1959 40626 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/07/1959 45456 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/07/1959 45457 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 782 0-6-0T 4w/e 04/07/1959 56372 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 31/07/1959 40666 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 26/09/1959 42800 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 26/09/1959 45456 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 26/09/1959 45457 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/09/1959 42211 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 26/09/1959 42912 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 24/10/1959 45251 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 24/10/1959 45490 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 20/11/1959 40667 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/11/1959 42194 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 19/12/1959 42800 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/12/1959 44159 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42209 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42210 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42212 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42697 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 782 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/02/1960 56372 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/03/1960 42123 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/04/1960 42191 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 782 0-6-0T m/e 07/1960 56259 Condemned      
Steam 29 0-6-0T 4w/e 02/07/1960 56232 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/07/1960 42193 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1960 45053 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1960 45384 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/02/1961 55264 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/02/1961 90463 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/02/1961 90505 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 16/02/1961 D3927 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 22/02/1961 D3928 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/03/1961 D3929 1st Allocation        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/03/1961 90319 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/03/1961 90549 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 11/05/1961 56372 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1961 45167 Transfer in from: 61A Kittybrewster    
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 06/06/1961 57356 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/07/1961 80020 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/07/1961 80021 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/07/1961 80028 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/07/1961 80029 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 01/07/1961 45053 Transfer out to: 64C Dalry Road    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/07/1961 80020 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/07/1961 80021 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 29/07/1961 40579 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 11/08/1961 40624 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 26/08/1961 D3926 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 26/08/1961 45463 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 26/08/1961 57249 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 26/08/1961 40638 Transfer out to: 68C Stranraer    
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 26/08/1961 57249 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 13/09/1961 40669 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 25/09/1961 43996 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 0-4-4T m/e 10/1961 55264 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 02/10/1961 40625 Condemned      
Steam V3 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/10/1961 67613 Transfer in from: 65C Parkhead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/10/1961 67648 Transfer in from: 65E Kipps    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 31/10/1961 40668 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/11/1961 42203 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 20/11/1961 40578 Condemned      
Steam 300 0-6-0 on 20/11/1961 57669 Condemned      
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 27/11/1961 57579 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 6w/e 30/12/1961 45497 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 6w/e 30/12/1961 67613 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 6w/e 30/12/1961 67648 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 12/03/1962 43996 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1962 42740 Transfer in from: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam J36 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1962 65214 Transfer in from: 65F Grangemouth    
Steam J36 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1962 65273 Transfer in from: 65C Parkhead    
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 26/03/1962 57357 Condemned      
Steam 300 0-6-0 on 26/03/1962 57673 Condemned      
Steam 782 0-6-0T on 02/04/1962 56282 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 44977 Transfer in from: 63D Fort William    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 90198 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 90549 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 45470 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 45479 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1962 90198 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 29 0-6-0T w/e 30/04/1962 56232 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1962 57274 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/06/1962 90505 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/07/1962 80028 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/07/1962 80029 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 30/07/1962 42742 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 w/e 30/07/1962 57254 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1962 44977 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1962 45384 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1962 45490 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1962 45497 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1962 90319 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 13/12/1962 57266 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/12/1962 42203 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 22/12/1962 57336 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 294 0-6-0 4w/e 22/12/1962 57355 Transfer out to: 67F Stranraer    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 29/12/1962 42191 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 29/12/1962 42193 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/01/1963 42194 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 28/02/1963 42806 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 w/e 01/03/1963 57348 Condemned      
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 08/08/1963 57566 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 07/09/1963 44974 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 294 0-6-0 5w/e 07/09/1963 57270 Transfer in from: 28A Motherwell    
Steam 652 0-6-0 5w/e 07/09/1963 57630 Transfer in from: 66E Carstairs    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 16/09/1963 45457 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 16/09/1963 57336 Condemned      
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 16/09/1963 57590 Condemned      
Steam 812 0-6-0 4w/e 05/10/1963 57581 Transfer in from: 27A Polmadie    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42123 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 46482 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 46498 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/11/1963 80077 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 07/11/1963 57270 Condemned      
Steam 294 0-6-0 on 07/11/1963 57309 Condemned      
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 07/11/1963 57581 Condemned      
Steam 812 0-6-0 on 07/11/1963 57627 Condemned      
Steam J36 0-6-0 on 07/11/1963 65273 Condemned      
Steam 652 0-6-0 on 14/11/1963 57630 Condemned      
Steam J36 0-6-0 on 14/11/1963 65214 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 14/11/1963 90463 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 42863 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 30/11/1963 42911 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 28/12/1963 45251 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1964 45158 Transfer in from: 31A St Rollox (Balornock)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/01/1964 80115 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 27/01/1964 42124 Condemned      
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 28/03/1964 D2574 Transfer in from: 68C Stranraer    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/03/1964 44723 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/03/1964 45365 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/03/1964 D3926 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 28/03/1964 42740 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 28/03/1964 42863 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 05/1964 45479 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 76001 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 76098 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 76099 Transfer in from: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 44723 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 45158 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 45456 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 30/05/1964 45463 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/07/1964 D3927 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/07/1964 80077 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/07/1964 80115 Transfer out to: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1964 45470 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 5w/e 31/10/1964 46413 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 76099 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 D2574 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 D3928 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 D3929 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 44974 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 45167 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 45365 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 46413 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 46482 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 46498 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 76001 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 76098 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr