Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 747 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6147 Week
» 24199 Month
» 257119 Year
» 1922495 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Gillingham (Kent)


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1002 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1013 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1064 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1092 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1105 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1112 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1215 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1234 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1256 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1267 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1278 Snapshot        
Steam H 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1308 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1317 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1378 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1430 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1449 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1510 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1573 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1579 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1583 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1585 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1588 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1658 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1659 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1660 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1662 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1663 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1665 Snapshot        
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1666 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1682 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1684 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1688 Snapshot        
Steam R1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 1697 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1713 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1746 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1750 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31003 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31007 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31014 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31039 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31051 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31066 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31238 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31384 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31391 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31439 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 m/e 05/1948 1215 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 m/e 06/1948 1002 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1948 31014 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 08/1948 31051 Condemned      
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 m/e 09/1948 1013 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 11/1948 31378 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 01/1949 31003 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 m/e 02/1949 31105 Condemned      
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 m/e 03/1949 31449 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 05/1949 31007 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 05/1949 31439 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 07/1949 31238 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 08/1949 31039 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 12/1949 31384 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31729 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 31750 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31501 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31586 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31741 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 33026 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31746 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31735 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31586 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31729 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31741 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31735 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 1229 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31227 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31234 Transfer in from: GIL Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31242 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31253 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31306 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31307 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31488 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31495 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31508 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31584 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31681 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31683 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31687 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 33027 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 33028 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31112 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31234 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31267 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31278 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31317 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31573 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31579 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31665 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31666 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31713 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 31066 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 31391 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 23/06/1951 31092 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31586 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31253 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31256 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31687 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31688 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31712 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31713 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam O1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 1064 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31583 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31584 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31586 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T m/e 09/1951 31659 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 31593 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 31684 Transfer in from: GIL Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 31686 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 31684 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 33026 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 33027 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 33028 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31112 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31816 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31585 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31588 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31501 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31501 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31295 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31305 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31686 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T m/e 12/1952 31658 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 11/12/1952 31305 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 11/12/1952 31305 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 11/12/1952 31307 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31161 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31518 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31660 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31663 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam R1 0-4-4T m/e 03/1953 31697 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 05/1953 31501 Condemned      
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31758 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31759 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam D1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31509 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam D1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31545 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31660 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31671 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31161 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31295 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31305 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam L1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31758 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam L1 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31759 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 08/08/1953 31234 Condemned      
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T m/e 10/1953 31662 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31816 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T m/e 12/1953 31660 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 31158 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31711 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31242 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31508 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1954 31242 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1954 31508 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31815 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31816 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam D1 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31505 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/08/1954 31161 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T on 06/11/1954 31671 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/12/1954 31306 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31593 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 02/04/1955 31713 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 16/04/1955 31158 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 09/05/1955 31320 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 31322 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31785 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31786 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31787 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31242 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam D1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31505 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam D1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31509 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam D1 4-4-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31545 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31488 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 17/12/1955 31320 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 31512 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1957 31711 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 09/02/1957 31712 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31297 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 28/09/1957 31508 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31037 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31576 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31579 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31548 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 31681 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 w/e 16/05/1959 31430 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 13/06/1959 31683 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31037 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31112 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31161 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31227 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31229 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31297 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31308 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31322 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31495 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31510 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31512 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31518 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31548 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31576 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31579 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31682 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31684 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31785 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31786 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31787 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31815 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31816 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford