Depot: Grangemouth
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1934 | 13271 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1934 | 13272 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 1935 | 13271 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1935 | 13272 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1935 | 13272 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1935 | 13272 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 17581 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15119 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15142 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16152 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16164 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16300 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17265 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17285 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17287 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17294 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17338 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2736 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2737 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3883 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4320 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 29 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56232 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56243 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56267 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56275 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56336 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57442 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57581 | Snapshot | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8147 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8148 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8149 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8151 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8152 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 14483 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8147 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 5468 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1948 | 57442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8148 | Transfer out to: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8149 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8150 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8151 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8152 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 45468 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 29 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 56232 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 57658 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 57294 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 57373 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 09/07/1950 | 55142 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 43883 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 11/09/1950 | 55142 | Transfer in from: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 55142 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 55142 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/03/1951 | 57334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 45396 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45396 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45396 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45119 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45011 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45013 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45011 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45013 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45011 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45013 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 55142 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 55142 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90763 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90773 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45013 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90757 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 57603 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90763 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/12/1952 | 55142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 67456 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | on | 14/07/1953 | 55119 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 55214 | Transfer in from: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 42780 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 42802 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 42803 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45011 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45119 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45396 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 30/09/1954 | 67456 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1954 | 13132 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1954 | 13133 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1954 | 13134 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1954 | 13135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/12/1954 | 13136 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 56300 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 90769 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 90774 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 56243 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 68326 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 56152 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 90199 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/01/1956 | 56275 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 57667 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Oban | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1956 | 13281 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 56267 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 56375 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/01/1957 | 56230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 90039 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 55204 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 13276 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 90039 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 57689 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Oban | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 56336 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 90199 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 56164 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 64588 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 64589 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 64592 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 64593 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 65241 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 65246 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | D2724 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 44234 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 57612 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 64588 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 65246 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/10/1959 | 68326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 68349 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 90539 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 65217 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 55238 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 65241 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D2724 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/08/1960 | 68349 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/08/1960 | D2756 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 57429 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 57691 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/10/1960 | D2773 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/10/1960 | D2774 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45177 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45178 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 68344 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 55204 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 25/10/1960 | D2775 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3902 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D2773 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1961 | 61401 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1961 | 61403 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 42736 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 42737 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/01/1961 | 68344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1961 | 61340 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42780 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42802 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42803 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 27/02/1961 | D2756 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/03/1961 | 56376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 43137 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65222 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65306 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 45125 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 45482 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/06/1961 | 54483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 13/09/1961 | 55214 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | 57429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1961 | 61340 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1961 | 61401 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45319 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45487 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45496 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76074 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76103 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 65214 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 64593 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 57285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 57287 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 90128 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 65257 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 64592 | Transfer out to: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 65214 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1962 | 57338 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D2741 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1962 | 57612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 76113 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 57311 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 57265 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 65306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 90234 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 90640 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 65275 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 65335 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1962 | 57311 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90640 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 44234 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 44320 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 65217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 65257 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1962 | 90128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | 44788 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | 57269 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | on | 13/12/1962 | 90774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 65275 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90757 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90769 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 57652 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64593 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64610 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64611 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64621 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90553 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90560 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90600 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90614 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45178 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45496 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 16/03/1963 | 44057 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 64601 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 57652 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | 65287 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1963 | 64589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1963 | 45443 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1963 | 65287 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 44057 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1963 | 57269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 65311 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 77009 | Transfer in from: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3215 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3216 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D3533 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45192 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45362 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45488 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76045 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 43137 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 64593 | Transfer out to: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 65311 | Transfer out to: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76103 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1963 | 61403 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 65222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 65335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 90234 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 90539 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 90614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 46460 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 46468 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90114 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90199 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90489 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 76074 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/12/1963 | 77006 | Transfer in from: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D2776 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D2778 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3409 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3556 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3557 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3559 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3533 | Transfer out to: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1964 | 45487 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | D2703 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | D3533 | Transfer in from: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 64537 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 64570 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 64571 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 64592 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 64623 | Transfer in from: | 65K | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 64636 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 65909 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 65917 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 64537 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 44719 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 64580 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 45482 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/07/1964 | 90114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 73007 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | D2741 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65909 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65917 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 44970 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 76100 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 64636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1964 | 44719 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76046 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76101 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76102 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76103 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 64570 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 64571 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 64611 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 64623 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1964 | 73105 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | D2774 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 64621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/06/1965 | 44970 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/1965 | 64592 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 45192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 45443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1965 | 64580 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/10/1965 | 76100 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 18/10/1965 | 46468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1965 | 90553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/10/1965 | 77006 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/10/1965 | 77009 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/10/1965 | 45362 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 44788 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45177 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45319 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45488 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 46460 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 73007 | Transfer out to: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 73105 | Transfer out to: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76045 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76046 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76101 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76102 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76103 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 76113 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3215 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 64610 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 90489 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 90560 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 90600 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | D3216 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 90199 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | D3409 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3276 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3281 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3537 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3538 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3539 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D3533 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D2776 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/03/1967 | D2778 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2424 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D2444 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D2435 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 03/02/1968 | D2703 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 03/02/1968 | D2775 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D2435 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3528 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3529 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3132 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3134 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3213 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3213 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3213 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3182 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3279 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3528 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3537 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3559 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1969 | D3538 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1969 | D3902 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D3211 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D3214 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D3135 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/05/1970 | D3211 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D3213 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D3930 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3133 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3136 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3182 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3539 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3214 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D2413 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D2413 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D2424 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D2444 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D3243 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D3279 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1973 | D3930 | Transfer out to: | DE | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1973 | D3738 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1974 | D3879 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1974 | D3738 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1975 | 08414 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 08505 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 08145 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 08145 | Transfer out to: | DT | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 08712 | Transfer out to: | DE | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08722 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1977 | 08246 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1977 | 08441 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1978 | 08442 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1978 | 08175 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/02/1981 | 08505 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08347 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1982 | 08246 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1983 | 08347 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1987 | 08722 | Condemned |