Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 835 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6235 Week
» 24287 Month
» 257207 Year
» 1922583 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Guildford


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 03/1889 68 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 03/1889 69 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 04/1889 70 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 06/1889 71 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 06/1889 72 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 10/1931 68 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 10/1931 69 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 06/1933 72 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 08/1934 70 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 01/1936 71 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 23/01/1939 541 1st Allocation        
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 03/1939 542 1st Allocation        
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 29/03/1939 543 1st Allocation        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 108 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 110 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 141 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1614 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1621 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1623 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1798 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1799 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1800 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1801 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1802 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1803 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1804 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1805 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1806 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1809 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 22 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 246 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2487 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2500 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2504 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 26 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 262 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 268 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 269 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 270 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 308 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3083 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 309 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 311 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3155 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 324 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 325 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 326 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 327 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 328 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 343 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3436 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3439 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3442 Snapshot        
Steam Dock Engines 0-4-0ST on 01/01/1948 3458 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 346 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 349 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3506 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 352 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 390 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 416 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 419 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 43 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 433 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 434 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 438 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 481 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 541 Snapshot 3B Three Bridges    
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 542 Snapshot 3B Three Bridges    
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 543 Snapshot HOR Horsham    
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 56 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 60 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 704 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 726 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C1 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C10 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C11 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C12 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C13 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C2 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C3 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C4 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C5 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C6 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C7 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C8 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 C9 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 02/1948 343 Condemned      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 10/1949 30141 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 10/1949 30269 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 11/1949 30262 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/09/1950 30021 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 33014 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 33015 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 33016 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 1623 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31803 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30384 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30424 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 311 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30565 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30726 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 311 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 11/1950 30390 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/11/1950 238 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 12/1950 30268 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 2487 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30432 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30433 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30434 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30442 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31624 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31803 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32160 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 3441 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 2487 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/12/1950 30270 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30416 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30433 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30434 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 30258 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30355 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam S11 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30400 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam S11 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30401 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30430 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30431 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 30349 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30424 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30580 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30704 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32160 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 03/1951 30430 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30109 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam S11 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30399 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30021 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30442 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30481 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30027 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30349 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31797 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31799 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32160 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30258 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30384 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31799 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31803 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31804 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30579 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31623 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31625 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31626 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31795 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31796 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30309 Transfer out to:        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30355 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S11 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30399 Transfer out to:        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30568 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31621 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31800 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31801 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31802 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30028 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30056 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30060 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32160 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 33016 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 30438 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 33014 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 33015 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam S11 4-4-0 m/e 09/1951 30401 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 05/09/1951 30693 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30431 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30432 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30109 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30310 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30109 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30419 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30433 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31805 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 30277 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30577 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30577 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 08/1952 30311 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30120 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30575 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/01/1953 30675 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/01/1953 30732 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/01/1953 30120 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31856 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31862 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30108 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 30732 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33002 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33004 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33005 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33007 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33009 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33011 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 33002 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 31623 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 33005 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 33018 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31856 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31862 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam S11 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30400 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 33004 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam S11 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30400 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 33018 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 33018 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 33019 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 31624 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 31625 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 31626 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31624 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31625 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 33022 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 33018 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 29/10/1953 30350 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 29/10/1953 30310 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30277 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30022 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30277 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 30/12/1953 31620 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30022 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31496 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31586 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31616 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31617 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31631 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31746 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31614 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31620 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Dock Engines 0-4-0ST on 12/06/1954 30458 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31632 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 31075 Transfer in from: STL St Leonards    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 33025 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 31617 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam S11 4-4-0 m/e 11/1954 30400 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 31622 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 31806 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30575 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30580 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31253 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31593 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30327 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31075 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 11/12/1954 31746 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30324 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30328 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 03/1955 30434 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 31591 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 31632 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 30697 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 30700 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 31253 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 31593 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 06/1955 31591 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30022 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30028 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 5w/e 12/08/1955 30086 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 12/08/1955 31075 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 09/1955 31496 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 09/1955 31586 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 16/09/1955 31549 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 16/09/1955 31574 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 16/09/1955 31577 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 16/09/1955 32506 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30698 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31488 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32505 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 7w/e 19/12/1955 31737 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1956 30579 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 w/e 04/02/1956 30577 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 04/02/1956 31488 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 31636 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 31624 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 10/1956 31737 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 06/10/1956 31574 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 20/10/1956 31549 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30124 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30337 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30705 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 08/12/1956 31577 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 15/12/1956 31075 Condemned      
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31145 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31247 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31612 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31722 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31723 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1957 30574 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 31635 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 6w/e 01/04/1957 30277 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 m/e 06/1957 30580 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1957 30578 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 15216 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 15217 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 14/01/1958 30705 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 D3092 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15216 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15217 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 31145 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 31247 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/02/1958 32487 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 22/03/1958 30675 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 30109 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 30110 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31795 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31796 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 11/1958 30337 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1958 30575 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 02/1959 30086 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T w/e 11/03/1959 30089 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 11/03/1959 30132 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30700 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30724 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31637 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31807 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 11/03/1959 30027 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30700 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 04/1959 30026 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T 3w/e 01/05/1959 30277 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 09/05/1959 30724 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 m/e 06/1959 30352 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30378 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31615 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31811 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31812 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31815 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31816 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33001 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33002 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33003 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33004 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 31037 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 31054 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 31858 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 31816 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31614 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31638 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31805 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31809 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 6w/e 09/02/1960 30349 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31616 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31799 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31807 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 30903 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 30906 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 30909 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31610 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31623 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31633 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31790 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31614 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31637 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31798 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31805 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31037 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31054 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31037 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31054 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 06/05/1960 D2290 1st Allocation        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/05/1960 32505 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/05/1960 32506 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 10/06/1960 D3092 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 24/06/1960 D2295 1st Allocation        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31400 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31401 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 20/08/1960 31054 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 11/1960 30238 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 30690 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31414 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 25/02/1961 31037 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 05/1961 30043 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 20/05/1961 30124 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31402 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31403 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 33034 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 33035 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 33036 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 06/07/1961 30049 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 08/07/1961 30693 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 30308 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 30697 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 30700 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 28/10/1961 30246 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31612 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31636 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam G6 0-6-0T w/e 11/11/1961 30277 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 32504 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31819 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31820 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31821 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31859 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31400 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31401 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31402 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 31403 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 04/01/1962 30339 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 04/01/1962 30346 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 04/01/1962 30325 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 04/01/1962 30326 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 04/01/1962 30346 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 27/01/1962 31723 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 27/01/1962 32500 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 02/1962 D2285 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/1962 30112 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/1962 30378 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 30325 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 30326 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 30339 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 30346 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 31722 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 30326 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 w/e 17/02/1962 30909 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3047 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3048 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 30350 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2284 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2286 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3049 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2290 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2295 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 19/05/1962 30698 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 28/05/1962 33032 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 28/05/1962 33033 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 02/06/1962 30049 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/07/1962 30055 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/07/1962 D3093 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1962 31857 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 27/10/1962 30132 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 31414 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30542 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/12/1962 82015 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/12/1962 82016 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 23/12/1962 30325 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 23/12/1962 30690 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 23/12/1962 30906 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 30/12/1962 30903 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 30/12/1962 31610 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30055 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/02/1963 30112 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T 5w/e 04/03/1963 30072 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam B4 0-4-0T w/e 10/03/1963 30089 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 30541 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 31611 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 31618 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 31806 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 80087 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 80095 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 80137 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/04/1963 82015 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/04/1963 82016 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 26/05/1963 31815 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 16/06/1963 33005 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 07/07/1963 33013 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 07/07/1963 33025 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1963 33008 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 31859 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1963 31820 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 08/09/1963 31812 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 08/09/1963 31821 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 14/09/1963 82026 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 14/09/1963 82027 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 14/09/1963 82028 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 14/09/1963 82029 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31404 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31408 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31413 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31810 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31813 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31814 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 33001 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 76030 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 76031 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 76032 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 76033 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 76034 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31797 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80087 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80095 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80137 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 29/09/1963 31631 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 06/10/1963 31615 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 14/10/1963 D3093 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 14/10/1963 33006 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 20/10/1963 31611 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 20/10/1963 31813 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 01/12/1963 31404 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 01/12/1963 31623 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 01/12/1963 31635 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1963 33019 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1963 31633 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 31622 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 31806 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 31819 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 31857 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33010 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33022 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33032 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33034 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31401 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31410 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31412 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31619 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31620 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31639 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31791 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31793 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31799 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31800 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31801 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31833 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31869 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33004 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33006 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33014 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33015 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33018 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T m/e 06/01/1964 82026 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T m/e 06/01/1964 82027 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T m/e 06/01/1964 82028 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T m/e 06/01/1964 82029 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 12/01/1964 31618 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 12/01/1964 31625 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 12/01/1964 31638 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 23/02/1964 31833 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 29/03/1964 31810 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 27/04/1964 D2254 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 27/04/1964 D2285 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 10/05/1964 31793 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 17/05/1964 33001 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41287 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41294 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41299 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41301 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 14/06/1964 31842 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 14/06/1964 31413 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 14/06/1964 31801 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 14/06/1964 33033 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 14/06/1964 33035 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 31803 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 31809 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 76053 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 76054 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 76055 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 33006 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 28/06/1964 33036 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 26/07/1964 31814 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 02/08/1964 31869 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 02/08/1964 76032 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 09/08/1964 31412 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 13/09/1964 76034 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 33009 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 33012 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 76066 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 33012 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 18/10/1964 76054 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 01/11/1964 31410 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 15/11/1964 33015 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 33006 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 33020 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 33026 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 33027 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 22/11/1964 33012 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 29/11/1964 30541 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 20/12/1964 30542 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 on 03/01/1965 33004 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30535 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31405 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31411 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31816 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31831 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31862 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31866 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 31873 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76030 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76031 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76033 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76053 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76055 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76066 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 07/02/1965 31799 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 04/04/1965 31620 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1965 31862 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1965 30535 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 25/04/1965 31831 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 09/05/1965 31790 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73022 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73029 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73037 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73041 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73043 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73065 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73081 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73082 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73087 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 33006 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 33009 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 33018 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 33020 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 33026 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 33027 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41287 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41294 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41299 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41301 Transfer out to: 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 20/06/1965 D3049 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 on 20/06/1965 73041 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 04/07/1965 31811 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 18/07/1965 31401 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 05/09/1965 31842 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 03/10/1965 31800 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73088 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73089 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73092 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73093 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73110 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 22/11/1965 33006 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 22/11/1965 33020 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 22/11/1965 33027 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 19/12/1965 31619 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 26/12/1965 31858 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 02/01/1966 31809 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 09/01/1966 31816 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 09/01/1966 31866 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1966 33006 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1966 33020 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1966 33027 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 10/01/1966 80011 Transfer in from: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1966 31873 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/02/1966 80011 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 13/03/1966 31803 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 02/04/1966 77014 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 24/04/1966 31411 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 D2031 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 D2284 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 05/06/1966 31405 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 05/06/1966 31408 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 05/06/1966 31639 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 05/06/1966 31791 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 on 19/06/1966 73082 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76012 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76016 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76018 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76031 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76033 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76053 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76058 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76059 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73022 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73029 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73037 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73043 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73065 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/07/1966 D2031 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/07/1966 D2031 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 31/07/1966 73081 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 22/08/1966 D2274 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 04/09/1966 76012 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/09/1966 D2041 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/09/1966 D2031 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 25/09/1966 73089 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1966 76059 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1966 73087 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1966 73088 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1966 76016 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1966 76018 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 17/10/1966 73115 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 17/10/1966 73117 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 17/10/1966 73118 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 17/10/1966 76069 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 14/11/1966 D3221 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 01/1967 76033 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 29/01/1967 73110 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 29/01/1967 76053 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 04/02/1967 D2274 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/03/1967 73115 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/03/1967 73117 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 26/03/1967 76058 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 73018 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 73020 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 73155 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 11/06/1967 D2254 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 18/06/1967 76069 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D2041 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D2286 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3047 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3048 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3221 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 09/07/1967 30072 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 73018 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 73020 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 73092 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 73093 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 73118 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 73155 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 76031 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 09/07/1967 77014 Condemned