Depot: Heaton Mersey
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1252 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1648 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1649 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1650 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1252 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1648 | Snapshot | 18M | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1649 | Snapshot | 18M | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1650 | Snapshot | 18M | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 4104 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1935 | 5759 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1939 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/07/1940 | 6350 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/08/1940 | 6350 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1940 | 6287 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1940 | 6292 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1940 | 6300 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1940 | 6306 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1940 | 6300 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1940 | 6287 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1940 | 6306 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1940 | 6292 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1941 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1941 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1941 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1943 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1945 | 6105 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1945 | 6105 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1947 | 1680 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1947 | 1680 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1947 | 1471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 113 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3908 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3945 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4010 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4090 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4104 | Snapshot | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4110 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4111 | Snapshot | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4117 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4178 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4237 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4286 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4407 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4421 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8089 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8099 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8154 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8179 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8208 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8220 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8275 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8315 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8316 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8329 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8697 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 90 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9276 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9298 | Snapshot | WAL | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 93 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9317 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9328 | Snapshot | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9331 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9332 | Snapshot | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9359 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 94 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 95 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 93 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8179 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8275 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4111 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8179 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8275 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8155 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8134 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8179 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 3908 | Transfer out to: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 4237 | Transfer out to: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4010 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 4110 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 4117 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 40089 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 90 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 40089 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 40089 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 62322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1949 | 61469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 09/05/1949 | 62314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1949 | 61475 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 43836 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 4459 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/07/1949 | 69251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4459 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Tebay | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 48503 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48505 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48509 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 48505 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48509 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 44271 | Transfer out to: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44080 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48127 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48527 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48682 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48717 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44080 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48127 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48527 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48682 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48717 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44080 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48127 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48527 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48682 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48717 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 48135 | Transfer out to: | 13D | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 48717 | Transfer out to: | 13D | Northwich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/05/1950 | 64733 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 48683 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 40094 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 48667 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 48683 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48683 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62609 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48683 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 65148 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 40118 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4593 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58303 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40118 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44593 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58303 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40118 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44593 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58303 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40124 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40095 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40124 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48557 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40124 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48557 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48557 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44421 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1951 | 64733 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40094 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42775 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42788 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 48751 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40118 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40094 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42775 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42788 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 48751 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40094 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42775 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42788 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 48751 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/02/1951 | 43811 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48751 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48751 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 65135 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Lower Ince | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 40430 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40430 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40430 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/08/1951 | 64723 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 44593 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 48135 | Transfer in from: | 13D | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 48135 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 48135 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 48731 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48429 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48731 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 48148 | Transfer in from: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 48161 | Transfer in from: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 48667 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 48677 | Transfer in from: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/04/1952 | 40430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 65148 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 40405 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 58303 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40405 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40405 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42772 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42925 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43945 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 44090 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 44090 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 44144 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 43945 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44144 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 42772 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 42925 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1952 | 69299 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 64723 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69328 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43854 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 69299 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 69299 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 69262 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40405 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 48134 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 69262 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 69262 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48154 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48521 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48528 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 69332 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 48154 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 48741 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 48154 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 48741 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 44379 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48327 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 43836 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48155 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48521 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48751 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 48327 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 48634 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40433 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 48634 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 48327 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 43864 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 44421 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 48634 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 43864 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 44384 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40067 | Transfer in from: | 11E | Tebay | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 44261 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 44384 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 44059 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 48501 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 42932 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 48667 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 40001 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 48731 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 48275 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 44236 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 48693 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 44387 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 44059 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 44361 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 44080 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/02/1956 | 69317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 48135 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1956 | 69359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 65187 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42932 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 48683 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 48693 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40433 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 73004 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/01/1957 | 69331 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 44250 | Transfer in from: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 48191 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 48198 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 73004 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 44501 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40004 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40056 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40057 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40059 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40061 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 40061 | Transfer in from: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 40061 | Transfer out to: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 43930 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 44378 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 43930 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 48089 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 48127 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/04/1958 | 65135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69262 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69276 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69299 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42111 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44178 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 48528 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 48613 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 48099 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 40061 | Transfer in from: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 40061 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48613 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48220 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48315 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48527 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48613 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 48148 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 48697 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 48543 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 44554 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Coalville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 43854 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Coalville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43212 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43245 | Transfer in from: | 14C | St Albans | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43558 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43572 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 48317 | Transfer in from: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 76085 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 76087 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42111 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42775 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42788 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 43961 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 44015 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 65187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40004 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 40004 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48317 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 48695 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 43073 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 43073 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 76048 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48198 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1959 | 44144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1959 | 43558 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1959 | D3852 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1959 | D3853 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1959 | D3854 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 40056 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43832 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43572 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/11/1959 | 40004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/11/1959 | 40059 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 44361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 05/12/1959 | 40061 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1959 | 43961 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 44015 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 44236 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 26/12/1959 | 40067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 12/03/1960 | 40057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 40097 | Transfer in from: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 40105 | Transfer in from: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 44261 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 44387 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/07/1960 | 43212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 43245 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 43832 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/01/1961 | 40001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 44378 | Transfer out to: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 48613 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 48695 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 40124 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 48302 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 48338 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 48390 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 48403 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 44026 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 48695 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 48302 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 48302 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 48613 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 40089 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 40094 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 44026 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 44421 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 40009 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 05/08/1961 | 40097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 44090 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 42133 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 42134 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 42159 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 48333 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42469 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 40009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 48523 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 40105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 40113 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 48089 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 44407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 43063 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44289 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44394 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 43042 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 43046 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 43048 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 43049 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48333 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 76048 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 76085 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 76087 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 48676 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 44061 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 48397 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 48523 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 43945 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 44061 | Transfer out to: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 44220 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 42469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 48557 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 44345 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44492 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 43048 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 44514 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 44220 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 43048 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 43106 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 44394 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 43010 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 43013 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 43031 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 43047 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 43120 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 43121 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 48702 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 44345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 43012 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 43028 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48702 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 43033 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 44250 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 44286 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 44492 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Coalville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 44514 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 44289 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Coalville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 44379 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 44501 | Transfer out to: | 16J | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 44554 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Coalville | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 48397 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 48543 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 43028 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 48338 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 48338 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 48536 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 48302 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 48338 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 48536 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 48682 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 48634 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 43049 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 48115 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 48546 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42945 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42947 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42948 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42950 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42951 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42955 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42958 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42960 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42961 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42964 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42967 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42968 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42974 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42975 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42977 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42978 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42980 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42981 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/1965 | 42982 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48176 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48322 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48355 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48401 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48490 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48515 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48701 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48748 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 42134 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 43046 | Transfer out to: | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 43120 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 43121 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42133 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42159 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 48403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 21/08/1965 | 42961 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 48355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 48401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 48406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 48429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 48490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48365 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | D3852 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | D3853 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | D3854 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 43010 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48748 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1965 | 42974 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 16/10/1965 | 43013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 23/10/1965 | 42948 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 23/10/1965 | 42950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 42982 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 48190 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 48327 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 42958 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 42964 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 43033 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Tebay | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1965 | 42957 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1965 | 42983 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1965 | 42968 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 42947 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48428 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 48464 | Transfer in from: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1966 | 42980 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 48515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 42957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 42960 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 42983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 48652 | Transfer in from: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 48205 | Transfer in from: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 48324 | Transfer in from: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 48720 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 48322 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 48390 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 48652 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 48168 | Transfer in from: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48005 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48199 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48377 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48684 | Transfer in from: | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48691 | Transfer in from: | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1966 | 43042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48691 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48612 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 12/03/1966 | 42951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 12/03/1966 | 43031 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 48005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1966 | 42945 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1966 | 42975 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 75060 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1966 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 75046 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 48428 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1966 | 42955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 75046 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 75060 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 30/04/1966 | 42967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 30/04/1966 | 42978 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1966 | 43047 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 21/05/1966 | 42981 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 44839 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 44869 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45067 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45190 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 44903 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 18/06/1966 | 42977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44830 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 43012 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 43048 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 43063 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 43106 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1966 | 44869 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48411 | Transfer in from: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48708 | Transfer in from: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 45045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 44663 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 44914 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 45263 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 44839 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 48612 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 48199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 48701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 48723 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1967 | 48551 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 48316 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 48708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 48315 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 48324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1967 | 48411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/07/1967 | 48501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/07/1967 | 48613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/08/1967 | 48176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/08/1967 | 48315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48505 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48669 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48697 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48768 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 45324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 44830 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 44914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 48768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1967 | 45448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/08/1967 | 48464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/08/1967 | 48731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/09/1967 | 48322 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/09/1967 | 48765 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/09/1967 | 48208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 48161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 45067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 45263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 48377 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 48505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1967 | 45288 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/11/1967 | 48201 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/11/1967 | 48224 | Transfer in from: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/11/1967 | 48292 | Transfer in from: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/11/1967 | 48669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 48402 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 48117 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 48193 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 48205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 48402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 48697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 45253 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 45279 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 48107 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 48192 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 48278 | Transfer in from: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 48319 | Transfer in from: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 48507 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 48193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 45114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 48677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48063 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48421 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48683 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/02/1968 | 48421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/02/1968 | 48683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 48503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48317 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48344 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48356 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48471 | Transfer in from: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1968 | 48224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1968 | 48317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1968 | 45279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1968 | 48117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1968 | 48197 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1968 | 48192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/03/1968 | 48344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1968 | 45253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 44903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | 48107 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/04/1968 | 48197 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/04/1968 | 48292 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 48471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/04/1968 | 48684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1968 | 45065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 44663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 45190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 45392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 48322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 48329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 48365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 48551 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48115 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48168 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48191 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48278 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48319 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48356 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48546 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48720 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48723 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 48765 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall |