Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hither Green


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 29/11/1935 5007 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 29/11/1935 5452 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 06/05/1937 5452 Transfer out to: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 07/05/1937 5007 Transfer out to: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/11/1946 1096 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/11/1946 1097 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 19/11/1946 1098 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 21/11/1946 1099 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 09/12/1946 1105 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/12/1946 1106 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 13/12/1946 1107 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1018 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1028 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1031 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1054 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1059 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1061 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1068 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1071 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1113 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1191 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1243 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1244 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1245 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1251 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1253 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1257 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1270 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1298 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1455 Snapshot        
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1457 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1480 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1486 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1572 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1581 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1689 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1695 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1720 Snapshot        
Steam N1 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1878 Snapshot        
Steam N1 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1879 Snapshot        
Steam N1 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1880 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1911 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1913 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1921 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1922 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1923 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1924 Snapshot        
Steam W 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 1925 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31044 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31109 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31248 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31374 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31377 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31385 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31386 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 800 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T on 01/01/1948 950 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T on 01/01/1948 951 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T on 01/01/1948 953 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T on 01/01/1948 955 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T on 01/01/1948 956 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 m/e 05/1948 1028 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 m/e 05/1948 1031 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/06/1948 1096 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/06/1948 1098 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 10/1948 31386 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/11/1948 61107 Transfer out to: LEI Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 01/1949 31109 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 23/01/1949 61106 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 m/e 02/1949 31457 Condemned      
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 m/e 06/1949 31455 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 08/1949 31257 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 09/1949 31374 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 09/1949 31385 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1949 15223 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 22/10/1949 15224 1st Allocation        
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 01/1950 31377 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30800 Reinstated HIT Hither Green    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 90267 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30800 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30797 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30800 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 30/12/1950 15226 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 03/02/1951 15227 1st Allocation        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30806 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 90247 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30797 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31803 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31804 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 28/04/1951 15228 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31481 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31582 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31631 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31638 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31800 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31801 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31802 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31253 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31270 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31720 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31803 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31804 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 31044 Condemned      
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 31248 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31063 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31687 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31688 Transfer in from: GIL Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31874 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31875 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31481 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 90247 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31691 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31692 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31693 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31857 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31858 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31859 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31860 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31861 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31862 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 33014 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 33015 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam O1 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31258 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31581 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31582 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31631 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31638 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31874 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 31875 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 28/07/1951 15229 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 22/09/1951 15230 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31225 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31856 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31899 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31900 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1951 15234 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 19/01/1952 15236 1st Allocation        
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 21/01/1952 30955 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90267 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31619 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31620 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31621 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31686 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31690 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31899 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31900 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 33037 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/12/1952 13010 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1952 13011 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/12/1952 13012 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/12/1952 13013 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 24/12/1952 13014 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/01/1953 61099 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/01/1953 61105 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 15235 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31406 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31408 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam W 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31916 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33007 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33009 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33011 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 15230 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30950 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30951 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31054 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31244 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31856 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31862 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 31054 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 05/1953 31486 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 33007 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 33009 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 33011 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 15220 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31638 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31856 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 33016 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31406 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam W 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/08/1953 31912 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31892 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31893 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 33018 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31408 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31619 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31620 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31621 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31638 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31801 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31498 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31225 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 20/02/1954 13043 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 03/1954 31572 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 26/03/1954 13045 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 14/04/1954 13047 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 13013 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 13014 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 33016 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 33018 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 33037 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 30795 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31855 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31802 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 33015 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 30772 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 30795 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 20/08/1954 30956 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam W 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/08/1954 31921 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13044 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13046 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13049 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 31854 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 33037 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13010 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13011 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13012 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 11/12/1954 30953 Transfer out to: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 15218 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 15219 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 13047 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 13049 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 13095 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 15234 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 02/04/1955 31687 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 13096 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 13097 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 15236 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 13217 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 15216 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 15217 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 09/05/1955 13043 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 13098 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 13217 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 15235 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31892 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31893 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 07/07/1955 13099 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 07/07/1955 13044 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 13100 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 13101 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 13045 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 13046 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 04/1956 31063 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 31724 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 31725 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1956 13270 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1956 13271 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/10/1956 13272 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 11/10/1956 13273 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/10/1956 13274 1st Allocation        
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 15202 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 31724 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 31725 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31721 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 31498 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 31287 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 31480 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 10/04/1957 11220 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 10/04/1957 11223 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 17/04/1957 11221 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 26/04/1957 11224 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 26/04/1957 11225 1st Allocation        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30796 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31724 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31725 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30772 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31298 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/06/1957 D3459 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 21/06/1957 D3460 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 24/06/1957 D3461 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 27/06/1957 D3462 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/07/1957 D3463 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 05/07/1957 D3464 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 09/07/1957 D3465 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 10/07/1957 D3466 1st Allocation        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 19/07/1957 33039 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 19/07/1957 33040 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 19/07/1957 31854 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 07/08/1957 D3467 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 12/08/1957 D3468 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/08/1957 D3471 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 30/08/1957 D3472 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 20/09/1957 11226 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 11223 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31253 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31573 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 11220 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 11223 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 11225 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 15216 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 15217 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31724 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 31725 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 D3461 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 D3464 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 D3465 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 22/02/1958 31059 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15216 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15217 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 D3470 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15220 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15224 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15226 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15227 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15228 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1958 15229 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31498 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam C 0-6-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31724 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31725 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31245 Transfer out to: 73G Ramsgate    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 31018 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 06/03/1959 D2083 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 11224 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 26/03/1959 D3671 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 28/03/1959 D5009 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/04/1959 D5010 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/04/1959 D5011 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 13/04/1959 D3719 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 13/04/1959 D3721 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 15/04/1959 D3720 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/04/1959 D5012 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 01/05/1959 31725 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 01/05/1959 31724 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 01/05/1959 31725 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30796 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30806 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31054 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31061 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31860 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31861 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam N1 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31878 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam N1 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31879 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam N1 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31880 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33014 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33037 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33039 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 33040 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 D3671 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 D3719 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 D3720 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 D3721 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 04/07/1959 D5017 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 09/1959 31071 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 09/1959 31191 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 10/10/1959 31243 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 31253 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 31816 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 D3670 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 31858 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 11/11/1959 D2278 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31725 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 D3670 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 31/12/1959 D2278 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 30/01/1960 D6500 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31268 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31298 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 31682 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 31688 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 27/02/1960 D6501 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31579 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 12/03/1960 D6502 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 19/03/1960 D6503 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 25/03/1960 D2284 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 26/03/1960 D6504 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 15217 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 15217 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 D3100 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 09/04/1960 D6505 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/04/1960 D6506 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 31692 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/05/1960 D6507 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 D2283 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 19/05/1960 D2292 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 21/05/1960 D6508 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 21/05/1960 D6509 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/06/1960 D6510 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/06/1960 D6511 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 18/06/1960 D6512 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 25/06/1960 D6513 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 02/07/1960 D6514 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 08/07/1960 D6515 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31113 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31498 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31573 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31579 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 08/07/1960 31693 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 15/07/1960 D6516 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 22/07/1960 D6517 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 07/08/1960 61097 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 19/08/1960 D6518 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 27/08/1960 D6519 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/09/1960 D6520 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 11/09/1960 D6521 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 17/09/1960 D6522 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 24/09/1960 D6523 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/10/1960 D6524 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 05/10/1960 D3096 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 05/10/1960 D3459 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 08/10/1960 D6525 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 08/10/1960 31287 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 15/10/1960 D6526 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 22/10/1960 D6527 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 29/10/1960 D6528 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 11/1960 31298 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 05/11/1960 D6529 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 12/11/1960 D6530 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 19/11/1960 D6532 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 22/11/1960 D6531 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/11/1960 D3270 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/12/1960 D6533 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/12/1960 D6534 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 10/12/1960 D6535 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 17/12/1960 D6536 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 31/12/1960 D6537 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 07/01/1961 D6538 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 14/01/1961 D6539 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 31481 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 31857 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam W 2-6-4T 8w/e 17/01/1961 31923 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 21/01/1961 D6540 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 28/01/1961 D6541 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/02/1961 D6542 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 10/02/1961 D6543 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 D2283 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31855 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31856 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 18/02/1961 D6504 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 25/02/1961 D6544 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 25/02/1961 D6504 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 08/03/1961 D6545 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 18/03/1961 D6546 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 D2283 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 D2083 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 25/03/1961 D6547 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/04/1961 D6548 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/04/1961 D6549 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/04/1961 D6550 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 20/04/1961 D6551 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 24/04/1961 D6552 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 03/05/1961 D2291 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 7w/e 03/05/1961 D2292 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 06/05/1961 D6553 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/05/1961 D6554 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 20/05/1961 D6555 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31268 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31481 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31721 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31816 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31859 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31911 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31912 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31913 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31916 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31922 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31924 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31925 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/06/1961 D6556 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/06/1961 D6557 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 10/06/1961 D6558 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 24/06/1961 D6559 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 24/06/1961 31695 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 08/07/1961 D6561 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 15/07/1961 D6560 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 15/07/1961 D6562 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 22/07/1961 D6563 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 29/07/1961 D6564 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 19/08/1961 D6565 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 D3460 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 D3460 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 26/08/1961 D6566 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 09/09/1961 D6567 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 09/09/1961 D6568 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 16/09/1961 D6569 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 19/09/1961 D4099 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 30/09/1961 D2398 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 30/09/1961 D6570 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 10/1961 31068 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 14/10/1961 D6571 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 14/10/1961 D6572 1st Allocation        
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 21/10/1961 31682 Condemned      
Steam C 0-6-0 w/e 21/10/1961 31691 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 28/10/1961 D6574 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/11/1961 D6573 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/11/1961 D6575 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 D2291 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31686 Transfer out to: 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon    
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31689 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam C 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31690 Transfer out to: 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 11/11/1961 D6576 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 12/11/1961 D6556 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 12/11/1961 D6556 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 18/11/1961 D6577 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 25/11/1961 D6578 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 02/12/1961 D6579 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 02/12/1961 D6559 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 02/12/1961 D6559 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/12/1961 D6556 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/12/1961 D6556 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 D2253 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 D2253 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 09/12/1961 D6580 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 09/12/1961 D6559 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 09/12/1961 D6559 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 16/12/1961 D6581 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 16/12/1961 D6517 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/12/1961 D6582 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 23/12/1961 D6559 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 23/12/1961 D6559 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 06/01/1962 D6583 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/01/1962 D6584 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/01/1962 D6585 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 20/01/1962 D2179 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 28/01/1962 11228 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 28/01/1962 11229 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 01/02/1962 D2180 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 11227 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 15201 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 15213 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 D2398 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 02/02/1962 D6586 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 09/02/1962 D6587 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 16/02/1962 D6588 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/02/1962 D6589 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/02/1962 D6590 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 15214 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 15215 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D2083 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D2084 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3466 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 11221 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 11226 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D2253 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3271 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3274 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3460 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3466 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D4099 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 09/03/1962 D6591 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 16/03/1962 D6592 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/03/1962 D6593 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 30/03/1962 D6594 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/04/1962 D6595 1st Allocation        
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 27/04/1962 D6596 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 15212 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2082 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2085 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3465 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3467 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2283 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2284 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3095 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3272 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3462 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D3467 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 05/05/1962 D5011 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 05/05/1962 D5017 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 11/05/1962 D6597 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 12/05/1962 D5009 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 12/05/1962 D5012 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 28/05/1962 11227 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 28/05/1962 15219 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 02/06/1962 D5010 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 02/07/1962 11228 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 5w/e 02/07/1962 11229 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/07/1962 D3273 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/07/1962 D3463 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6504 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6505 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6506 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6508 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6530 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6533 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6536 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6546 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6549 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6556 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6583 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6585 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 D3665 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 D2179 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 D2180 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1963 11221 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1963 D2082 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 D3465 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 D3471 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6512 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6520 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6521 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6523 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6524 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6525 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6526 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6527 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6534 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6537 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6578 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6586 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6587 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6588 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6589 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6590 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6591 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6592 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6593 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6594 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6595 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6596 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6597 Transfer out to: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 27/07/1963 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 27/07/1963 D6553 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 19/08/1963 15229 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 4w/e 19/08/1963 15201 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 09/1963 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 09/1963 D6553 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31800 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D2253 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D3092 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D3465 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D3719 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D3721 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D4099 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 15202 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 15223 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 09/12/1963 D2084 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 25/01/1964 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 25/01/1964 D6553 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 31/01/1964 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 31/01/1964 D6553 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 03/1964 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 03/1964 D6553 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 04/1964 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 04/1964 D6553 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/04/1964 D6504 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/04/1964 D6508 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 17/05/1964 D6502 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 17/08/1964 D6540 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 17/08/1964 D6541 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 15220 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 15222 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D2084 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D2250 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D3043 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D4103 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 15216 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D2085 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D2251 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D3101 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/11/1964 D6504 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 21/12/1964 D6528 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 21/12/1964 D6535 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 21/12/1964 D6545 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 D2252 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 D2250 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 18/01/1965 D6532 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 18/01/1965 D6544 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 18/01/1965 D6548 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 10/05/1965 D6541 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 10/05/1965 D6508 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6556 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6501 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6503 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6507 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6509 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6515 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6541 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6550 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6580 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/11/1965 D6580 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 10/01/1966 D3471 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 10/01/1966 D3099 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 3w/e 10/01/1966 D3665 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 10/01/1966 D6529 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 10/01/1966 D6573 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2255 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/02/1966 D6529 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2084 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/02/1966 D6500 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/02/1966 D6511 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/03/1966 D6510 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/03/1966 D6522 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 04/04/1966 D6516 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/05/1966 D6514 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/05/1966 D6518 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/05/1966 D6519 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6531 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6538 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6539 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6542 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 19/09/1966 D6543 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6552 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6565 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6577 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6565 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 D3098 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 D3467 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 12/12/1966 D6577 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 12/12/1966 D6551 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1967 D2269 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1967 D2255 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 18/01/1967 D6553 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 18/01/1967 D6554 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 04/02/1967 D2253 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 03/1967 DS1173 Transfer in from: 39A      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 17/04/1967 D6539 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 17/04/1967 D6529 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 15/05/1967 D6573 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 15/05/1967 D6513 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D2286 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3665 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3670 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3465 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3466 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3468 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3472 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 10/10/1967 D6583 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 10/10/1967 D6585 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 10/10/1967 D6539 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 10/10/1967 D6580 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6586 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6587 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6588 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6589 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6590 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6591 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6592 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6593 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6594 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6595 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6596 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6597 Transfer in from: 73D St Leonards    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1967 D2042 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1967 D2083 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 m/e 03/1968 15215 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 18/03/1968 D6522 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 18/03/1968 D6579 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 3w/e 08/04/1968 D3668 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 3w/e 08/04/1968 D2341 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 3w/e 08/04/1968 D4103 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 12/05/1968 D2286 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 21/05/1968 D6552 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 25/08/1968 D2269 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 23/09/1968 D6578 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 23/09/1968 D6579 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 23/09/1968 D6522 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 23/09/1968 D6547 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D2003 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3224 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3225 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3671 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D4107 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3471 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D4099 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 27/10/1968 D2252 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 03/11/1968 15213 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 03/11/1968 D6576 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1969 D3042 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1969 D6552 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1969 D6555 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 07/05/1969 D2003 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D3224 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D4107 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 09/06/1969 15235 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 07/1969 D2042 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/01/1970 15218 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 30/04/1970 15221 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 m/e 08/1970 15217 Condemned      
Diesel 09 0-6-0 5w/e 15/09/1970 D3666 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 30/10/1970 D6554 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 30/10/1970 D6555 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 6w/e 22/12/1970 D6553 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 13/01/1971 D3815 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 13/01/1971 D3820 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 2w/e 25/02/1971 15214 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 29/04/1971 D6549 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 29/04/1971 D6550 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 29/04/1971 D6551 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 29/04/1971 D6552 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/05/1971 15235 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 30/09/1971 D3472 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 30/09/1971 D3924 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6549 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6550 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6551 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6552 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6553 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/10/1971 D3928 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/10/1971 D3472 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/10/1971 15220 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/10/1971 15221 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/10/1971 15222 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/10/1971 15229 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 9w/e 29/12/1971 D6554 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 on 31/12/1971 15212 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 31/01/1972 D6554 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 30/04/1972 D3719 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/05/1972 D3097 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/10/1972 D3092 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 04/10/1972 D3042 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 04/10/1972 D3043 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 04/10/1972 D3225 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford Chart Leacon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1973 D3220 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1973 D3222 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1973 D3226 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 02/05/1973 D6553 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 18/05/1973 D6552 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 9w/e 19/07/1973 D6551 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1974 08375 Transfer in from: 75C Selhurst    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1974 08378 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1974 D3459 Transfer in from: 75C Selhurst    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1974 08648 Transfer out to: SU Selhurst    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1974 09001 Transfer out to: SU Selhurst    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1974 09002 Transfer out to: SU Selhurst    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 18/04/1975 33033 Transfer out to: EH Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 30/11/1975 33041 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 31/01/1976 08756 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 31/10/1976 33033 Transfer in from: EH Eastleigh    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/01/1979 08158 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 13/10/1979 08154 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/07/1980 08152 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 11/07/1981 08378 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 06/12/1982 08374 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 17/12/1986 33054 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 25/06/1987 33061 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 05/08/1987 33210 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 11/09/1987 33044 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 11/09/1987 33212 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/09/1987 33037 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/09/1987 33043 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 23/09/1987 33062 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 30/10/1987 33045 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 25/01/1988 33034 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 28/03/1988 33049 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 12/06/1988 08760 To Store      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 12/09/1988 08385 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 27/09/1988 33059 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 05/10/1988 33038 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 02/12/1988 33209 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 18/05/1989 33039 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 24/12/1989 33055 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 29/10/1990 33060 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 04/02/1991 33056 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 19/04/1991 33203 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 21/06/1991 33058 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 08/11/1991 08375 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 27/07/1992 33205 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 12/02/1993 33047 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 14/05/1993 33040 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 14/05/1993 33050 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 17/05/1993 33033 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/10/1993 33201 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/10/1993 33211 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 15/10/1994 33064 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/01/1995 33053 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/10/1996 33035 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 08/10/1996 33042 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 08/10/1996 33206 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/02/1997 33208 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/02/1997 33048 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/02/1997 33052 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/02/1997 33063 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/02/1997 33065 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 13/02/1997 33204 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 31/08/2003 33051 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 31/08/2005 33057 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 28/02/2007 33036 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 31/03/2007 33046 Condemned      
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 31/07/2007 09004 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo on 01/09/2007 33202 Condemned