Depot: Aston
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 11/01/1934 | 13270 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1934 | 13270 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 2969 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5517 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1935 | 13272 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1935 | 13273 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2968 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2969 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5596 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2969 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2968 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2968 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2815 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2961 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 2981 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1936 | 2969 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1936 | 2981 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1936 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2961 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2968 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2972 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1937 | 2610 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1937 | 2611 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 2973 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1937 | 2981 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2961 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2981 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1938 | 2961 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1938 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1939 | 2973 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1939 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1943 | 2963 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1943 | 2966 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2441 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2449 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2538 | Snapshot | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2552 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2578 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2610 | Snapshot | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2611 | Snapshot | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2782 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2815 | Snapshot | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2891 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2892 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2894 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2921 | Snapshot | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2929 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4058 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4077 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4350 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4872 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5051 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5058 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5132 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5349 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5397 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5517 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5596 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7363 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7364 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9011 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9017 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 22904 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4120 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 25344 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5387 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 2957 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 51 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 4061 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 25344 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5132 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5387 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 45052 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/07/1948 | 9309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2960 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2974 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 42958 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 9362 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9211 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9248 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 9211 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 58295 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 49261 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 2951 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42947 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42948 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42891 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42894 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42929 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42947 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 8911 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42947 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 8911 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 8911 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42946 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42973 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42811 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42892 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 42954 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 44120 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44058 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1949 | 48911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1949 | 49011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 43308 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 49370 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 42449 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43308 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43308 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 42440 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45390 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 44077 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42658 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42973 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 44061 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42658 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42658 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1951 | 42960 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42489 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42489 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 42489 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 49261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 46427 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46427 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 49346 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 46427 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1951 | 12088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1951 | 12089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 49370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42773 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 49083 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 42773 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 49089 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 42773 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 42978 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 47366 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 40001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44876 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 47363 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 47363 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 47365 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 40001 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44876 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44876 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 42773 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 42538 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 42978 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 44360 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 44490 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1951 | 46492 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45322 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1951 | 12095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 44844 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 45070 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 45370 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 12090 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 47364 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 44897 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45418 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 44942 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/05/1952 | 49346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45070 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 58117 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1952 | 49017 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 49092 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 58117 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 48902 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42578 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/09/1952 | 49092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 58429 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 49278 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 49278 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 49278 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44120 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44354 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44120 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44354 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44120 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44354 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44525 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 58429 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42810 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45446 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 58117 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48902 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 49189 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1953 | 13020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1953 | 42951 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 47363 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/06/1953 | 42951 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1953 | 42979 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40206 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40051 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 42810 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 43389 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 44350 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1953 | 42948 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1953 | 42979 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1953 | 42948 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1953 | 42979 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 42948 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 42966 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 49186 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1954 | 42963 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 44354 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45132 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45231 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44219 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44525 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 42441 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 40129 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45034 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45038 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44492 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44942 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42489 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42552 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42658 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45416 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45403 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 40129 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45034 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45403 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 58288 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 43308 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 44492 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44492 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1957 | 49189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42853 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42929 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45385 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49275 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42782 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42921 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 49045 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 49063 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44360 | Transfer out to: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 45385 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1957 | 42979 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1957 | 42951 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1957 | 42951 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1957 | 42951 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1957 | 42951 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42118 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42885 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45073 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45130 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45249 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45424 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 42118 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 42885 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 44517 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45073 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45130 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45249 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45424 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1957 | 49186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42552 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42601 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48718 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48719 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48726 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45397 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 49278 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/10/1957 | 58288 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42560 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 58124 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42853 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 43187 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45416 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42854 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 45416 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42560 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42601 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 43187 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 43389 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 45416 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42658 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44807 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48297 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1958 | 42975 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 48297 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 42946 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 42954 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 42958 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42920 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42940 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42944 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 44067 | Transfer in from: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 44807 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45038 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45052 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 48752 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 42616 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42616 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 45353 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 45430 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 42944 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44067 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 49045 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 49063 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 49275 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 58124 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 58295 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 46423 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 42854 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 42779 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 42921 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 45327 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45395 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48504 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 42779 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 48504 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 45132 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42940 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 44844 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45370 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42817 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44439 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 44120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42616 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42616 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42782 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42951 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45696 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 44710 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 44910 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45395 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44910 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 42921 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45696 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 45647 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 45709 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 45737 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 42782 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 42920 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 42929 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42982 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45518 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45550 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45395 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45052 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/07/1960 | D233 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 42658 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44742 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45704 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 42817 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 42975 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 44842 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45292 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 44742 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44865 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 45038 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3774 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3838 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D233 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 44439 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 44842 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 44302 | Transfer out to: | 12F | Workington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D3775 | Transfer in from: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42956 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42964 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42979 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45704 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 40206 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 45292 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 40206 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45709 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42982 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 42470 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 40206 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 42616 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 45301 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 45302 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 45302 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 44110 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45593 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 44897 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 42964 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 48726 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 44301 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 45231 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 45550 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 45231 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 70031 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 70043 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45518 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70025 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70026 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70027 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70029 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42966 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45638 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45740 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/10/1961 | 42552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45094 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45327 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45638 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 45332 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 12095 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45567 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 45578 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 45332 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 40180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42267 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42488 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 44444 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 44514 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 46470 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 47341 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 47474 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 47494 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 70004 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 47474 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 70047 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 45578 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 70043 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45737 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 70046 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 42186 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1962 | D5010 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 70043 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42186 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42267 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42488 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5010 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42947 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42956 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42957 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42966 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42974 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42979 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45567 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45647 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46470 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 70045 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 76022 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 76051 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44110 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44301 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44444 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44492 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44514 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 45374 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 76020 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 76023 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46423 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 49089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 47341 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 45439 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 47494 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 70045 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 70046 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 45439 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75034 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75037 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75053 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 45395 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 76020 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 76022 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 76023 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 76051 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 75031 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45353 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45231 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45418 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 70048 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 70026 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 70031 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 70043 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70016 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70025 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70027 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44865 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45349 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70019 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 75031 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 75034 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 75037 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 75053 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1963 | 45740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 45593 | Transfer out to: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 42226 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 42665 | Transfer in from: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 70001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 70005 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 70047 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 42226 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 42665 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44859 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44945 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44966 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45027 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44945 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44966 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70001 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70005 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70016 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70029 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70048 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 12089 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 12090 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48718 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48719 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48752 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 12088 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42075 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42209 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42478 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 76095 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44859 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 45027 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 45052 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 45058 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 76040 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 42209 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 42478 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 42066 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 42069 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 44859 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 45052 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 45058 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 42062 | Transfer in from: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 42604 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 45310 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 45405 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 45439 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D3107 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/05/1965 | 42604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 42075 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 22/05/1965 | 42062 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 42069 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 45310 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 45405 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 42066 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 76095 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44710 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44942 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45038 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45052 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D3020 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D3107 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D3774 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D3775 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D3838 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 44859 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 44872 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 44876 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 45058 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 45322 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 45430 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 46427 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 46492 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 76040 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1965 | 45439 | Condemned |