Depot: Keith
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/04/1947 | 1064 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2234 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2240 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2243 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2246 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2247 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2248 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2255 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2256 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2264 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2267 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62235 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7292 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1948 | 1500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/08/1948 | 62238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 62227 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 62231 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 62271 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1949 | 61064 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | KEI | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 61277 | Transfer out to: | KEI | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/10/1949 | 62240 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 10/11/1949 | 62234 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1949 | 61277 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62242 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62269 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1949 | 61353 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 61353 | Transfer in from: | KEI | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 61353 | Transfer out to: | KEI | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 61308 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1950 | 61346 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1950 | 61347 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 61308 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 61346 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 61347 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 62235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1950 | 61353 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 10/10/1950 | 62249 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 62247 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 62225 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 62230 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 62232 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62225 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62230 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62232 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62225 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62230 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62232 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 16/01/1951 | 62243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62229 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 62229 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 62229 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/03/1951 | 62227 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 61503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/06/1951 | 62251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 62277 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 22/08/1951 | 62246 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1951 | 61353 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/08/1951 | 61353 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/08/1951 | 61353 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61353 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 61507 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 62228 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 62268 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 61507 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 62228 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 62268 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 61507 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 62228 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 62268 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62265 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 16/10/1951 | 62232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 62270 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 09/11/1951 | 62252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 62272 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 17/12/1951 | 62229 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 62274 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/02/1952 | 62228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62273 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/03/1952 | 62230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62275 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/05/1952 | 62255 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 61508 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62261 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 12/08/1952 | 67292 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 67327 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67327 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67327 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 13/10/1952 | 62248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 55185 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 21/11/1952 | 62231 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 02/12/1952 | 62256 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/02/1953 | 62225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D41 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/02/1953 | 62242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/02/1953 | 61507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1953 | 62261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 61532 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 61539 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 62270 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1953 | 61508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1953 | 61501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1953 | 61532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 61524 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 55221 | Transfer in from: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1953 | 61524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1954 | 61502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61734 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61779 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61782 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61792 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61793 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 57591 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 57634 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 67478 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 62274 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 67327 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1954 | 61539 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 14/01/1955 | 62273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1955 | 62272 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 09/09/1955 | 62269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/10/1955 | 62262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 80121 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 80122 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/12/1955 | 62275 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 62469 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68700 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/02/1956 | 67478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 65267 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/07/1956 | 62268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1956 | 61734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 10/08/1956 | 62267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/09/1956 | 61783 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 40600 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 40622 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 67496 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1956 | 62271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 78053 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 78054 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1957 | 62265 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1957 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1957 | 61307 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/03/1957 | 61755 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/03/1957 | 62264 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 40617 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 40618 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 65304 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 67501 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 65247 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 69201 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 67496 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 67501 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/01/1958 | 69201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 56348 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 40011 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 69224 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D40 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/06/1958 | 62277 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 24/10/1958 | D2414 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 06/11/1958 | D2415 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/12/1958 | 68700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 57591 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/02/1959 | 61793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 65310 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 65338 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 69224 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 27/04/1959 | 40600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/06/1959 | 61783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1959 | 62469 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1959 | 65247 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40011 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 65227 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 65277 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 65227 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 256 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 05/11/1959 | 40617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 61755 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40603 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40604 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 46461 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 65305 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/05/1960 | 56348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 46460 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 46461 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/05/1960 | 61779 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 76106 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 76107 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/06/1960 | 61782 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 78045 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 80113 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/09/1960 | 61792 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 80114 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 80115 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 65251 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65277 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65305 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 11/05/1961 | 40622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 30/06/1961 | 40604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 07/1961 | 55185 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D2414 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D2415 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 40603 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 40618 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 46460 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 55221 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 57634 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65251 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65267 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65304 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65310 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65338 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76106 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76107 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 78045 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 78053 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 78054 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80113 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80114 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80115 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80121 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80122 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 256 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm |