Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 53 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5584 Week
» 7322 Month
» 134765 Year
» 1800141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kentish Town


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 137 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 140 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 141 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 142 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 143 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 144 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 147 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 15 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 18 Snapshot        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1880 6 Snapshot        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 02/1882 1547 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 02/1882 1548 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1882 1549 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1882 1550 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1882 1551 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1885 1718 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1885 1719 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 06/1885 1720 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 06/1885 1721 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 06/1885 1722 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1886 1728 1st Allocation        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 137 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 137 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 140 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 140 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 141 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 141 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 142 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 142 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 143 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 143 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 144 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 144 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 147 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 147 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 15 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 15 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1547 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1547 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1548 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1548 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1549 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1549 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1550 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1550 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1551 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1551 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1718 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1718 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1719 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1719 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1720 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1720 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1721 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1721 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1722 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1722 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1723 Snapshot 21 Belle Vue    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1724 Snapshot 21 Belle Vue    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1725 Snapshot 21 Belle Vue    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1726 Snapshot 21 Belle Vue    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1727 Snapshot 21 Belle Vue    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1892 1728 Snapshot 10 Leicester Midland    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 18 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 18 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   04/1892 6 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1895 2228 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1895 2229 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1895 2230 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1895 2231 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1895 2232 1st Allocation        
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 137 Snapshot 11 Wigston    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 140 Snapshot 7 Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 141 Snapshot 7T Tewkesbury    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 142 Snapshot 7 Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 143 Snapshot 12 Kettering    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 147 Snapshot 3 Saltley    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 15 Snapshot 18S Southwell    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1547 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1547 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1548 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1548 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1549 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1549 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1550 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1550 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1551 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1551 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1718 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1718 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1719 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1719 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1720 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1720 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1721 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1721 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1722 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1722 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1723 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1723 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1724 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1724 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1725 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1725 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1726 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1726 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1727 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1727 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1728 Snapshot 10 Leicester Midland    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   01/1899 18 Snapshot 14H Hitchin (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 2228 Snapshot 15S St Albans    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 2229 Snapshot 15S St Albans    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 2230 Snapshot 15S St Albans    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 2231 Snapshot 15S St Albans    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 2232 Snapshot 15S St Albans    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1547 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1547 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1548 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1548 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1549 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1549 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1550 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1550 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1551 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1551 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1718 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1718 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1719 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1719 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1720 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1720 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1721 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1721 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1722 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1722 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1723 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1723 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1724 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1724 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1725 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1725 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1726 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1726 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1727 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1727 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1728 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1728 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   05/1908 1234 Snapshot M&GN M&GN Joint Railway    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1281 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1281 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1282 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1282 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1283 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1283 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1284 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1284 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1311 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1311 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1314 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1314 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1316 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1316 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1318 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1318 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1319 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1319 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1375 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1376 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1377 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1379 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1281 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1281 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1282 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1282 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1283 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1283 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1284 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1284 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1311 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1311 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1314 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1314 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1316 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1316 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1318 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1318 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1319 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1319 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1371 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1372 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1373 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1374 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1375 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1375 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1376 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1376 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1377 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1377 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1378 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1379 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1379 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1380 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1381 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1382 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1383 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1384 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1385 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1425 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1426 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 08/1919 1281 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1920 1282 Condemned      
Steam 6 0-4-4T   12/1921 1234 Snapshot 11 Wigston    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1283 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1283 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1284 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1284 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1294 Snapshot 29 Manningham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1311 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1311 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1314 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1314 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1316 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1316 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1318 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1318 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1319 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1319 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1371 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1371 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1372 Snapshot 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1373 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1374 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1375 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1376 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1377 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1377 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1378 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1378 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1379 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1380 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1381 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1382 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1383 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1384 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1385 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1425 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1425 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1426 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1426 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1427 Snapshot 18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1924 1319 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/11/1924 1311 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 14/06/1925 1314 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/08/1925 1316 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/06/1926 1283 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/04/1927 1284 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/02/1930 1318 Condemned      
Steam 6 0-4-4T   03/1930 1234 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   03/1930 1234 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1285 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1285 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1294 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1294 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1312 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1312 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1313 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1313 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1315 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1315 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1317 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1317 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1320 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1320 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1321 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1321 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1371 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1371 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1373 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1374 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1377 Snapshot M15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1378 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1378 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1379 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1381 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1385 Snapshot 15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1425 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1426 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1426 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1427 Snapshot 16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1427 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 6 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/09/1930 1234 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 28/11/1931 1285 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/12/1931 1320 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/08/1933 1317 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1294 Snapshot M15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1312 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1313 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1315 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1315 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1321 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1321 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1371 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1371 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1373 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1374 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1374 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1376 Snapshot M15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1378 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1378 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1379 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1380 Snapshot M15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1381 Snapshot M10 Leicester Midland    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1385 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1385 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1426 Snapshot 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1427 Snapshot 7 Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/12/1934 1321 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/09/1936 1376 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1936 5278 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1936 5279 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1936 5280 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1936 5281 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1315 Snapshot 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1371 Snapshot 22E Highbridge    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1374 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1374 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1377 Snapshot M15 Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1379 Snapshot M18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1380 Snapshot M16 Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1380 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1385 Snapshot 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 03/11/1945 1378 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 115 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 23 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 24 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 26 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 27 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 28 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 29 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 75 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/10/1946 1380 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/11/1946 1374 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 28/12/1946 1207 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 28/12/1946 1208 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 100 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1018 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1023 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1050 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1051 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1054 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1077 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 111 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1117 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 112 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 114 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 115 Snapshot 21A Saltley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1207 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1207 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1208 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1208 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 148 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 149 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 155 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 160 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 161 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 164 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 166 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1660 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1661 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1664 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1668 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 167 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1671 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1672 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1674 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 171 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1713 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 172 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 22 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2230 Snapshot 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 23 Snapshot 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2325 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2329 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2331 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2383 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 24 Snapshot 14C St Albans    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 26 Snapshot 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2683 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2687 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 27 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 27 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 28 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 28 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2839 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 29 Snapshot 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 35 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 36 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 37 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3935 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3964 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 40 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4052 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4529 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4531 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4532 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4563 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 477 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4776 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4777 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4816 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4822 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4846 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4917 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4984 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4985 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5267 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5278 Snapshot 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5279 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5279 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5280 Snapshot 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5281 Snapshot 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 547 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5557 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5598 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5609 Snapshot 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5612 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5614 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5615 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5616 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5627 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5641 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5648 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5649 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5650 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5654 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5657 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5665 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7229 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7241 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7242 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7244 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7245 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7246 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7260 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7262 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7263 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7282 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7283 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7427 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7428 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7429 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7432 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 75 Snapshot 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7640 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7644 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7645 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 79 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 92 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 96 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 98 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 99 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 02/1948 1668 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 14/02/1948 1671 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 29/05/1948 1674 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 10/07/1948 1018 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 41199 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42237 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 2683 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 16/07/1949 47640 Transfer out to: 20B Stourton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 30/11/1949 42687 Transfer out to: PLS Plaistow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 4210 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 43909 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44243 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44397 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44440 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 11/01/1950 42133 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 45285 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 14/01/1950 47200 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 58131 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 14/01/1950 7202 Transfer in from: 16B Spital Bridge    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 44917 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 14/01/1950 47263 Transfer out to: 16B Spital Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 14/01/1950 47427 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 14/01/1950 7432 Transfer out to: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42133 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42133 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/09/1950 1379 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/09/1950 42051 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 43909 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 43935 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45609 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45654 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 41083 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45602 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 45221 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 45589 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40091 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40098 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40155 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40172 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42791 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 43909 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 58200 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40098 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40155 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40172 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 45589 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 42791 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 45602 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 58200 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/02/1951 42680 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/02/1951 47204 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/02/1951 47205 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 45221 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 24/02/1951 40477 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42685 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44228 Transfer in from: 13A Plaistow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44530 Transfer in from: 13A Plaistow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44397 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44440 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47262 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47282 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 47429 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 40931 Transfer in from: 23C Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 41023 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 41023 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/05/1951 41672 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42680 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42685 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44228 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44530 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 41023 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/07/1951 41661 Transfer out to: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/07/1951 58071 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 41061 Transfer in from: 21B Bournville    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 41074 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/12/1951 40148 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 41117 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1951 40091 Transfer out to: 86K Abergavenny    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1951 40171 Transfer out to: 86K Abergavenny    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/03/1952 47437 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 40079 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 40096 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 40149 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 40155 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/03/1952 41660 Transfer out to: 19C Canklow    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/03/1952 40098 Transfer out to: 86K Abergavenny    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 40021 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 43909 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 41199 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40079 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40096 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 45260 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 45575 Transfer in from: 30A Corkerhill    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 45579 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 44825 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40931 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41054 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45657 Transfer out to: 63A Perth South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45665 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 13/10/1952 80048 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/11/1952 42230 Transfer out to: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40079 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40099 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 01/1953 40547 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 24/01/1953 40040 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 24/01/1953 80047 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 24/01/1953 40040 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 03/03/1953 80059 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 29/04/1953 80062 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 41061 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 44776 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 8w/e 11/07/1953 47428 Transfer out to: 20F Skipton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 05/09/1953 40021 Transfer out to: 68D Beattock    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 40112 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 44298 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 31/10/1953 47243 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 21/11/1953 41664 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 44777 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 45260 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1954 43975 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 02/01/1954 47212 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 44981 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41083 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 on 07/08/1954 41074 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/08/1954 40021 Transfer in from: 68D Beattock    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/08/1954 40164 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 10/09/1954 80091 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 24/09/1954 80092 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 40114 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/10/1954 42133 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 25/10/1954 80094 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 42682 Transfer in from: 20E Manningham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 43919 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 44270 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 80063 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 42383 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 06/11/1954 41051 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1954 47244 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/12/1954 42685 Transfer in from: 20E Manningham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 41050 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 41077 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/12/1954 42051 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/12/1954 47245 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 44143 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 80045 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 44981 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/05/1955 47642 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 13/08/1955 41713 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 40166 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 31/12/1955 47209 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1956 40096 Transfer out to: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 45447 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45238 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45407 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45444 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 41207 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 41208 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44984 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45267 Transfer out to: 15D Bedford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42156 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42157 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42178 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42453 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42540 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42587 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42595 Transfer in from: 11D Oxenholme    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42610 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42617 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80045 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80047 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80048 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80059 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80062 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80063 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80091 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80092 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80094 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 40037 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 44806 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 44812 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 44855 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40534 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40548 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 45610 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 40413 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 40433 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45585 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45610 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1957 47242 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 44663 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45238 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 43919 Transfer out to: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 43975 Transfer out to: 17C Coalville    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/10/1957 47243 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 11/1957 40433 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 41114 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 41118 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44810 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44821 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46110 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46116 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46127 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46131 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46152 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46157 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44806 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45627 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45641 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45648 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45650 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 40420 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 40421 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 40567 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 40580 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 40582 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 w/e 18/01/1958 41118 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 41114 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 4w/e 14/06/1958 70042 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44821 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 46110 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 46157 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45561 Transfer in from: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45618 Transfer in from: 19G Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45622 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45628 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45652 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 46116 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 46127 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 46131 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 46152 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 4w/e 12/07/1958 70042 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 44381 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 43971 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 44043 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 40421 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 40534 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 44143 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 45622 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 11/10/1958 46103 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 18/10/1958 46133 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 42334 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 42338 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 42342 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 42157 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 42453 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/11/1958 42595 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 01/11/1958 46103 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 01/11/1958 46133 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 22/11/1958 40420 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 29/11/1958 46103 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 29/11/1958 46133 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 06/12/1958 45622 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/12/1958 44821 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/01/1959 40030 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/01/1959 40167 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 42839 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43971 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44043 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44816 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 10/01/1959 40413 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 07/02/1959 46130 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/02/1959 47246 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 44235 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 46148 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 45444 Transfer out to: 27F Brunswick    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 44294 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/03/1959 47449 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/04/1959 42587 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 46148 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1959 46130 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1959 44409 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 25/04/1959 46158 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 09/05/1959 46154 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 45575 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 13/06/1959 46154 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 13/06/1959 46158 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 43923 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44572 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45575 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42540 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 45614 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/07/1959 45561 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 22/08/1959 40567 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/08/1959 42157 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 29/08/1959 40030 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1959 47205 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 12/09/1959 40021 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 19/09/1959 40025 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 45614 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 46130 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 46132 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 46142 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 46160 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 26/09/1959 40203 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 46123 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 46140 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45585 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 45628 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/10/1959 40020 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/10/1959 47203 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 07/11/1959 40012 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45561 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46139 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46162 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46140 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 07/11/1959 40027 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45585 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45628 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45712 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44663 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44810 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44812 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 44825 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45447 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45557 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45598 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45612 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45616 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45618 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45649 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/11/1959 40160 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/11/1959 40172 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 45522 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 28/11/1959 40012 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 28/11/1959 40020 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 05/12/1959 40064 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 43923 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 05/12/1959 40025 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 05/12/1959 40582 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 12/12/1959 40053 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 12/12/1959 40040 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 44298 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 19/12/1959 46140 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 19/12/1959 46130 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 44270 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 44409 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 45585 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 45615 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 45652 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/01/1960 47642 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/01/1960 40092 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45407 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/02/1960 42336 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 40022 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 40024 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 40037 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42300 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42302 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42335 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42349 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42595 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 44984 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 40022 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42157 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42178 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 44855 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/02/1960 42300 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/02/1960 47229 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 05/03/1960 45614 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/03/1960 44563 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 19/03/1960 45614 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 02/04/1960 47442 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40022 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40036 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 45267 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 45342 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 45652 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/05/1960 42588 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/05/1960 42682 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/06/1960 47644 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 43859 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44138 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45342 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45652 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44052 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 25/06/1960 40024 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1960 47260 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 44433 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 44476 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 16/07/1960 40031 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/07/1960 47261 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1960 40161 Transfer out to: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 08/1960 47203 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 13/08/1960 40024 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 08/09/1960 42336 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 08/09/1960 42336 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 44433 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/10/1960 44476 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 02/11/1960 42336 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 02/11/1960 42336 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47241 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 44688 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 44985 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 26/11/1960 40053 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 03/12/1960 40028 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/12/1960 47223 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 45279 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 45285 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/01/1961 47212 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 28/01/1961 40548 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 11/02/1961 40580 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/02/1961 40022 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/02/1961 40029 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/02/1961 40033 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/02/1961 40038 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/02/1961 42617 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 25/02/1961 58131 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/03/1961 47485 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45579 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/03/1961 47204 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/04/1961 47200 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1961 47611 Transfer in from: 27F Brunswick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/04/1961 47209 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46103 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46123 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46160 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 46162 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 26/06/1961 42336 To Store      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45622 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45712 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/07/1961 47642 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 45622 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/07/1961 47554 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 45628 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/07/1961 40029 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/07/1961 40035 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/07/1961 40037 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/07/1961 40038 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/07/1961 40064 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 22/07/1961 42349 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/08/1961 42617 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42588 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45522 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46133 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46139 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46140 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46142 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 20/09/1961 42302 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45628 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45712 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 23/09/1961 40033 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1961 42325 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1961 42329 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 14/10/1961 46132 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 20/10/1961 40111 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/10/1961 44138 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/11/1961 47502 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/11/1961 47611 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 45575 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 45614 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 45561 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 45712 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/01/1962 42333 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 29/01/1962 42336 Reinstated        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/02/1962 42339 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/02/1962 47213 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 03/03/1962 40024 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 43859 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/03/1962 47213 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44821 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44984 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/03/1962 47485 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44822 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 28/04/1962 40026 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/05/1962 42334 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/05/1962 47642 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/05/1962 42333 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/05/1962 42338 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/06/1962 42342 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 30/06/1962 47261 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 02/07/1962 42336 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 07/07/1962 84005 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 07/07/1962 84008 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 07/07/1962 84029 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42237 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42335 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42339 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42595 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42610 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42685 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/07/1962 44717 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/07/1962 40203 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/07/1962 42156 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/07/1962 42617 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/07/1962 47502 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 44381 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 44531 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 44532 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/08/1962 47223 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/08/1962 47283 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/08/1962 47442 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/08/1962 47449 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/08/1962 47645 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/08/1962 40022 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 18/08/1962 40100 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 43964 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 44210 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 44235 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 44243 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 44294 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 44572 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/08/1962 47202 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/08/1962 47437 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1962 47554 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/09/1962 42331 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44717 Transfer out to: 16D Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 45267 Transfer out to: 16D Annesley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 16/09/1962 42336 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44688 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44846 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 18/10/1962 42336 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 01/12/1962 40026 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 01/12/1962 40031 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 45628 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 84008 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 19/01/1963 84005 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 19/01/1963 84029 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/03/1963 45622 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/04/1963 44529 Transfer out to: 18A Toton