Depot: Kidderminster
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4629 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 6306 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 5303 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 6306 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1206 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2093 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 28 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 29 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4584 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4586 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4594 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4629 | Snapshot | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4641 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5110 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5112 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5303 | Snapshot | KDR | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5303 | Snapshot | KDR | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 8101 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8718 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8727 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 4641 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4100 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 2051 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 4613 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 4641 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 5544 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 6306 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2093 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5573 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 8726 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4613 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4641 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6306 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 8726 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2281 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4614 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 6382 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4596 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6324 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2281 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6324 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6382 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2281 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4596 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 6382 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5303 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 4614 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3601 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4599 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2281 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4100 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4100 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5544 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 4518 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5112 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5518 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 4578 | Transfer in from: | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 28 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 4518 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1951 | 1206 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4596 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5518 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4586 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4584 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4599 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1951 | 2051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2101 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2101 | Transfer in from: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2101 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4594 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 4625 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 4641 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2144 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2207 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 7301 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8731 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2101 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4578 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6382 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 4614 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 7301 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1954 | 29 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2144 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4114 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5518 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5394 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6679 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4114 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/03/1955 | 1661 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 82008 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6334 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6382 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8731 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4614 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 4614 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 4114 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 6326 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 2207 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 6690 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4114 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6334 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6690 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4114 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4614 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5518 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4139 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6314 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4596 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6326 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 8727 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6340 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 6340 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4100 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4139 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 82008 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5355 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 1661 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82008 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82008 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4175 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4625 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 7777 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6669 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4625 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6367 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6382 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6832 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 7777 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 1417 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 1457 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4109 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5396 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5396 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1959 | 5394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 02/1959 | 1417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 02/1959 | 1457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 5333 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 8701 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 5396 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 4109 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1959 | 5355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 8701 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 4629 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5396 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 82030 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6388 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82030 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 5791 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 5110 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6832 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1960 | 5333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6368 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6128 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6144 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6368 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4129 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4641 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 4641 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5151 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5518 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 40085 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | D3997 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1961 | 8101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1961 | 5791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 4147 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1961 | 7700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 3607 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 6128 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 4641 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3619 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6144 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1962 | 5151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 4129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 6388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5153 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6669 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4173 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 4629 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1963 | 6314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 6317 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1963 | 4114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1963 | 6317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 01/12/1963 | 6395 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 6394 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 6679 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 3601 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 3607 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 3619 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 4147 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 4173 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 4175 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 5153 | Transfer out to: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 6395 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 8718 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3997 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot |