Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 916 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1824 Week
» 12969 Month
» 112754 Year
» 1778130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kirkby in Ashfield


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3494 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3773 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3894 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3895 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3907 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4005 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4021 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4082 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4113 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4140 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4202 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4205 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4206 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4268 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4415 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4463 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4472 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4589 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8000 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8006 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8007 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8009 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8027 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8029 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8036 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8074 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8092 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8096 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8097 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8098 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8100 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8101 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8104 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8108 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8109 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8114 Snapshot 2C Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8139 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8166 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8193 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8214 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8215 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8223 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8224 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8225 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8267 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8268 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8270 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8272 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8283 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8378 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8379 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8382 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8383 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8392 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8393 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8409 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8413 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8421 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8442 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8530 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8552 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8608 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8616 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8641 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 8036 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 48027 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 48641 Transfer out to: 20B Stourton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48074 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 43242 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 43287 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 43305 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48003 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 43997 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 43494 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 43379 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 43379 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 43773 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 43773 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 43779 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 43970 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 48272 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 48442 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 48108 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 48409 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 48608 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 44313 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 44415 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 44415 Transfer out to: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 44313 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 44415 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 43874 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 48139 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1954 44230 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1954 43874 Transfer out to: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 48770 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44230 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44463 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 44113 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 06/03/1954 43779 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 44021 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 44205 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 44205 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 48139 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 48395 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 48334 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 48007 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 44023 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 44224 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 43859 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 48139 Transfer out to: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 03/09/1955 43894 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44082 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44140 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44205 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44224 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 48530 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 48008 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 43969 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44082 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44088 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 23/06/1956 43895 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 48102 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 43969 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 44082 Transfer out to: 19C Canklow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 44206 Transfer out to: 19C Canklow    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 44589 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48395 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 43305 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 43970 Transfer out to: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 43997 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44088 Transfer out to: 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 43859 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 43773 Transfer out to: 39A Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48395 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48673 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48000 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48382 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 48376 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 48528 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 48616 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 48166 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43885 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43923 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43933 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44190 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44418 Transfer in from: 17C Coalville    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/01/1959 48177 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 43242 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/02/1959 48177 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/02/1959 48376 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/02/1959 48101 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/03/1959 48270 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/04/1959 48447 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/04/1959 48268 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48063 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48317 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48432 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48008 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48109 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48378 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48770 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 43923 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44190 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44418 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1959 48192 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 43907 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1959 48177 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/07/1959 44023 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/08/1959 43907 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48393 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 44005 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/12/1959 48193 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 19/12/1959 43287 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 19/12/1959 43907 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 44418 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1960 48011 Transfer in from: 19C Canklow    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1960 48029 Transfer out to: 41D Canklow    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1960 48447 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 48447 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 48215 Transfer out to: 18C Hasland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1960 48215 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40050 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40054 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40073 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40079 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40115 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40146 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40156 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40168 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40175 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40185 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1960 41712 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1960 41844 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 43923 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 43972 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 44252 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 44416 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 46501 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48001 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48088 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48119 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48156 Transfer in from: 28A Motherwell    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48219 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48272 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48277 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48282 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48405 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48442 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48541 Transfer in from: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48621 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48643 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 48701 Transfer in from: 16D Mansfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/05/1960 40182 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 78013 Transfer in from: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 46501 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 16/07/1960 40185 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 05/11/1960 40165 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/01/1961 48105 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/01/1961 48342 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/02/1961 48214 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/02/1961 48442 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 18/02/1961 40054 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 25/02/1961 40124 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 04/03/1961 40088 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 04/03/1961 40092 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/03/1961 40092 Transfer out to: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 11/04/1961 40142 Transfer in from: 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 29/04/1961 40089 Transfer in from: 19D Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 29/04/1961 40094 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 03/06/1961 40050 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/06/1961 48214 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/06/1961 48442 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 08/07/1961 40090 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/07/1961 40142 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 02/09/1961 40124 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/09/1961 40191 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/09/1961 40195 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 07/10/1961 40094 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/10/1961 40079 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/10/1961 40115 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 28/10/1961 40156 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 28/10/1961 40165 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 28/10/1961 40168 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 28/10/1961 40175 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 28/10/1961 40182 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 13/11/1961 42618 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42080 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42089 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42222 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42231 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42232 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42629 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 40191 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 40195 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 02/12/1961 40090 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/12/1961 48177 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 44091 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/01/1962 48432 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 48432 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/03/1962 48143 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/03/1962 42486 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/04/1962 42486 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 43972 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/07/1962 40088 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 04/08/1962 40089 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 04/08/1962 40146 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 18/08/1962 40073 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/09/1962 48011 Transfer out to: 16D Annesley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 43933 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 43975 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/12/1962 48009 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/01/1963 48392 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/03/1963 44268 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 43870 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 43888 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/03/1963 78013 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/04/1963 48364 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/04/1963 48088 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/05/1963 44252 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42218 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42221 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1963 48346 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42080 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42222 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 44472 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 43977 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44040 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44578 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1963 48103 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 22/06/1963 42231 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 07/1963 44416 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/07/1963 42587 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 44168 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1963 44203 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/09/1963 44202 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44203 Transfer out to: 15C Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48432 Transfer out to: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44168 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44418 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 44574 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/10/1963 92052 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/10/1963 92077 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/11/1963 92020 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 02/11/1963 43870 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44213 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44441 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44572 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 09/11/1963 43977 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/11/1963 48103 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/11/1963 48214 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 23/11/1963 92026 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 23/11/1963 92110 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 23/11/1963 92111 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/11/1963 48223 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/11/1963 48224 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/11/1963 48413 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90125 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90187 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90205 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90408 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/12/1963 48401 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 43888 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 43975 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/01/1964 90205 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 01/02/1964 90570 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 01/02/1964 90669 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 44250 Transfer in from: 17E Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 44514 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 08/02/1964 43923 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 44091 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/02/1964 44379 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/02/1964 90589 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 15/02/1964 43885 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/02/1964 44578 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/02/1964 48727 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 43888 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 12/03/1964 42618 Transfer out to: 16B Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/03/1964 48727 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 28/03/1964 90408 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/04/1964 48069 Transfer in from: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/04/1964 48082 Transfer in from: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 48627 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 48082 Transfer out to: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90125 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90187 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90570 Transfer out to: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90589 Transfer out to: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90669 Transfer out to: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 05/1964 41844 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92008 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92018 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92050 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92051 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92056 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92076 Transfer in from: 16J Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92114 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92127 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/05/1964 92159 Transfer in from: 16J Rowsley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/05/1964 48401 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/05/1964 48627 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/05/1964 48421 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/05/1964 48143 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 06/1964 44213 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 20/06/1964 92077 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 44248 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/08/1964 44139 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/08/1964 44215 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/08/1964 D94 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/08/1964 42181 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 09/1964 44441 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/09/1964 42053 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/09/1964 42181 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48185 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48186 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48254 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48614 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48675 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 12/09/1964 42221 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 44572 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44023 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44376 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44401 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44591 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92018 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92020 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92110 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92111 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92114 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92159 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 26/09/1964 43888 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44248 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 26/09/1964 44379 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44514 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 10/1964 41712 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/10/1964 92026 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 43918 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 44429 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92050 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92051 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92052 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92076 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92127 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 24/10/1964 92056 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 24/10/1964 42089 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 24/10/1964 42218 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 24/10/1964 42629 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42053 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42232 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1964 48701 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1964 48069 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1964 42587 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/11/1964 48105 Transfer out to: 15E Coalville    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/11/1964 48219 Transfer out to: 15E Coalville    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/11/1964 48552 Transfer out to: 15E Coalville    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/11/1964 D94 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 44040 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 44591 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/12/1964 48114 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/12/1964 48379 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/12/1964 48675 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 05/12/1964 92008 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 44023 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1964 48063 Transfer out to: 15E Coalville    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1964 48254 Transfer out to: 16F Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1964 44334 Transfer in from: 15E Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1964 44414 Transfer in from: 15E Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1964 44376 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/12/1964 48201 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/12/1964 48361 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1965 48001 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/01/1965 48006 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/02/1965 44139 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/02/1965 48447 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1965 44215 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 27/02/1965 43918 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/03/1965 44043 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/03/1965 48303 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/03/1965 48678 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/03/1965 48694 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/03/1965 48185 Transfer out to: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/03/1965 48361 Transfer out to: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/03/1965 48528 Transfer out to: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/04/1965 43982 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48063 Transfer in from: 15E Coalville    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48105 Transfer in from: 15E Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1965 44250 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1965 44414 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1965 44429 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44334 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44401 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 26/06/1965 43982 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 07/1965 44043 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48024 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48053 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48166 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48168 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48293 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48304 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48356 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48363 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/07/1965 92032 Transfer in from: 38B Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/07/1965 92072 Transfer in from: 38B Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/07/1965 92075 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/07/1965 92093 Transfer in from: 38B Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/07/1965 92095 Transfer in from: 38B Annesley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/07/1965 92154 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48024 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48053 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48166 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48168 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48293 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48356 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48363 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 24/07/1965 92032 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 24/07/1965 92154 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48097 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48102 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/08/1965 48156 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/10/1965 48270 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/10/1965 48284 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/10/1965 48362 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/10/1965 48627 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/10/1965 48635 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 44665 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 44835 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 44847 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 45190 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 45333 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 45406 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/10/1965 48045 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/10/1965 48124 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 11/1965 48096 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/12/1965 44847 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/12/1965 45406 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/12/1965 48270 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 44848 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 44665 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 44835 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 45190 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 45333 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/12/1965 48192 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/12/1965 48282 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/12/1965 48342 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/12/1965 48614 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/12/1965 48635 Transfer out to: 16F Burton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 44848 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/01/1966 92093 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48383 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 on 30/01/1966 92072 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 12069 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 D3181 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/02/1966 48272 Transfer out to: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/02/1966 48678 Transfer out to: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/03/1966 48003 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/03/1966 48627 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48694 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/03/1966 D3696 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/04/1966 48100 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/04/1966 48215 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/04/1966 48334 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/04/1966 48643 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 02/04/1966 92075 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/04/1966 48277 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/04/1966 48092 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 28/05/1966 92095 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/06/1966 48492 Transfer in from: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1966 48128 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1966 48194 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1966 48541 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/07/1966 48142 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/07/1966 48282 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/07/1966 48346 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/07/1966 48405 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/07/1966 48284 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/07/1966 48303 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/07/1966 48621 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/09/1966 48267 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1966 48186 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1966 48194 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1966 48225 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1966 48364 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/09/1966 48362 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 D3181 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48045 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48119 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48124 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48201 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48282 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48304 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/11/1966 48142 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 12069 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/12/1966 48128 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/12/1966 48279 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/01/1967 48673 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/02/1967 48105 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48063 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48098 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48279 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48317 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48395 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48442 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48492 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 17/07/1967 48104 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 48283 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/10/1967 D3696 Transfer out to: 16F Burton