Depot: Langwith Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | M1 | 0-6-4T | m/e | 12/1906 | A2 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 1135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 1137 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 1138 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 1139 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 1141 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 1142 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1907 | 1143 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1910 | 1176 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1910 | 957 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1910 | 1179 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/06/1912 | 1140 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/06/1913 | 959 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/06/1914 | 1077 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/11/1914 | 1133 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 12/1915 | 340 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 02/1917 | 366 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/04/1920 | 1132 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/09/1922 | 1136 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1923 | 366 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 340 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/02/1924 | 1134 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/03/1924 | 1179 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 6298 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 6305 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1924 | 6326 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/01/1926 | 6261 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1926 | 6203 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1926 | 6373 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1926 | 6526 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/01/1926 | 6329 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1926 | 6203 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1926 | 6523 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1926 | 6329 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1926 | 6257 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1927 | 6355 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/01/1927 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1927 | 6278 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1927 | 6312 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/03/1927 | 6312 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1927 | 6312 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1927 | 6278 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1927 | 6312 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1927 | 6638 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/07/1927 | 6588 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1927 | 6597 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1927 | 6296 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1927 | 6539 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1927 | 6595 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | M1 | 0-6-4T | w/e | 24/09/1927 | 6149 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1927 | 6585 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1927 | 6246 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/10/1927 | 6598 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1927 | 6249 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6527 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | M1 | 0-6-4T | w/e | 01/01/1928 | 6146 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | M1 | 0-6-4T | w/e | 01/01/1928 | 6149 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1928 | 1927 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1928 | 6143 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 5152 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 6180 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 6355 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 6527 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1929 | 6638 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1930 | 6595 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | M1 | 0-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1930 | 6147 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/05/1930 | 5958 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1930 | 6526 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/05/1930 | 6261 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1930 | 6344 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1930 | 6525 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1930 | 6537 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1930 | 6538 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/01/1931 | 6054 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 6052 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/04/1931 | 5384 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/05/1931 | 6135 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1931 | 6634 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/05/1931 | 5959 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1932 | 6525 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1934 | 6524 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/02/1934 | 6206 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1934 | 5407 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/02/1934 | 6138 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1934 | 5398 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1934 | 5400 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/02/1934 | 6132 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/02/1934 | 6137 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/02/1934 | 5152 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1935 | 6522 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1935 | 6246 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 2360 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 5939 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/04/1936 | 5067 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/04/1936 | 6179 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/04/1936 | 5957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1936 | 5044 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/11/1936 | 5049 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1936 | 6522 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1936 | 6053 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1936 | 6588 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1936 | 5400 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/12/1936 | 6181 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/12/1936 | 6523 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6207 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6505 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6249 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6257 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/03/1937 | 5958 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/03/1937 | 6181 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1937 | 6225 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/05/1937 | 6277 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/05/1937 | 5049 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/05/1937 | 6180 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1937 | 6636 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/05/1937 | 6142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1937 | 6271 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/06/1937 | 6077 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1937 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1937 | 5022 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1937 | 5335 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/10/1937 | 6053 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1938 | 6266 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1938 | 6356 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1939 | 5022 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1939 | 6373 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1939 | 6141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1939 | 6538 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1939 | 6636 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | M1 | 0-6-4T | w/e | 25/03/1939 | 6147 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1939 | 5011 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/07/1939 | 6634 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1939 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1939 | 6275 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1940 | 6524 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1940 | 6524 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1940 | 6277 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1940 | 6277 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1940 | 6309 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1940 | 6619 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1941 | 6225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 758 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 764 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 777 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1941 | 6140 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1941 | 6240 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/10/1941 | 6374 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/10/1941 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 12/12/1941 | 6420 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 12/12/1941 | 6421 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 12/12/1941 | 6422 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 15/04/1942 | 6421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/05/1942 | 5425 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1942 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1942 | 5425 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1942 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 18/07/1942 | 6422 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1942 | 6096 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 14/08/1942 | 6420 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1942 | 6095 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1942 | 6096 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 09/11/1942 | 5058 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 6095 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1942 | 6095 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1943 | 6524 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1943 | 6277 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1943 | 6095 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1943 | 6295 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/03/1943 | 6139 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/04/1943 | 6277 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/04/1943 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 21/04/1943 | 6139 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1943 | 6511 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1943 | 6512 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1943 | 6519 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1943 | 6591 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1943 | 6371 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1943 | 6328 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/07/1943 | 6544 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/07/1943 | 6290 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 5406 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6205 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6553 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6573 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 5044 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 5067 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6052 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6054 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6133 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6134 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6136 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6176 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/08/1943 | 6179 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 26/08/1943 | 5058 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 26/08/1943 | 6139 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 6307 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 6320 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/09/1943 | 6550 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 19/12/1943 | 5070 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1944 | 6220 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1944 | 6278 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/02/1944 | 5044 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/02/1944 | 6077 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1944 | 6218 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1944 | 6249 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1944 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 06/05/1944 | 5044 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 09/05/1944 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 09/05/1944 | 6077 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/07/1944 | 3296 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/08/1944 | 3286 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 28/08/1944 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6305 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6320 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6326 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/09/1944 | 6550 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 6344 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 6591 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1944 | 6512 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 5142 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/09/1944 | 5092 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/09/1944 | 5137 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/09/1944 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 01/10/1944 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 15/10/1944 | 3289 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/10/1944 | 5070 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/02/1945 | 3296 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1945 | 6337 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1945 | 6519 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/04/1945 | 6293 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/04/1945 | 6328 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1945 | 6303 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1945 | 6505 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/05/1945 | 3286 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/06/1945 | 6376 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/06/1945 | 6220 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/07/1945 | 3289 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1945 | 6528 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1945 | 6374 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 5163 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/11/1945 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1946 | 6371 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 6199 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6191 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6496 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6641 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3214 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3216 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3235 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5092 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6356 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/04/1946 | 6136 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1946 | 5403 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3841 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3842 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3848 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3850 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3967 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3969 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3970 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3973 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3974 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3981 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3983 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3203 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3204 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3216 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3220 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3233 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3235 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3856 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3921 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3923 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3924 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3925 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3926 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3927 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3942 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3943 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3946 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3964 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3976 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3985 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3987 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3508 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3524 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3527 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3538 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3546 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3609 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3695 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3697 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3699 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3713 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3729 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3749 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3750 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3765 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3794 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3798 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3800 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3801 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3832 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3858 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3876 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3891 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3893 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3895 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3900 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 5398 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6205 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6206 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6207 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6218 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6249 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6290 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6358 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6376 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6544 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/10/1946 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1946 | 3928 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1946 | 3731 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/12/1946 | 3883 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/12/1946 | 3945 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1947 | 3587 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1947 | 3597 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1947 | 3644 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/09/1947 | 3216 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3615 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3837 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3965 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3968 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3979 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3982 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3203 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3204 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3220 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3227 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3233 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3235 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3238 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5882 | Snapshot | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67351 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 67355 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7357 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9284 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9323 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9363 | Snapshot | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3589 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3706 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3970 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1948 | 3987 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3589 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3706 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3589 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3706 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 03/1948 | 67355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3970 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3987 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1948 | 3706 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3970 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3987 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3589 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3970 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3987 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1948 | 63921 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 12/1948 | 67351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/01/1949 | 69815 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/01/1949 | 69818 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 69815 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 69818 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 69815 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 69818 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/01/1949 | 9812 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 9812 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 9812 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1949 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1949 | 63759 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 63759 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 63759 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 7357 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 67384 | Transfer out to: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 3679 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63651 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 3679 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 3679 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1950 | 63987 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/02/1950 | 63658 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/02/1950 | 63724 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 63658 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 63724 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 63658 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 63724 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 63941 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 63975 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 63941 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 63975 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 64310 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 63941 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 63975 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 63923 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 63924 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 63965 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 63966 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 63974 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63741 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63750 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63757 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63758 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63765 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63800 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63884 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63900 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63902 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63925 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63926 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63928 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63941 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63942 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63943 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63945 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63946 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63964 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63967 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63968 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63741 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63750 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63757 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63758 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63765 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63800 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63884 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63902 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63741 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63750 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63757 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63758 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63765 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63800 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63884 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63902 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3540 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3585 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3632 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3648 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3683 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3703 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3709 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3776 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3807 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3840 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3842 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 3870 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63577 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63625 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63656 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63666 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63715 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63717 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63833 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63927 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63969 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63970 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63971 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63972 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63973 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63975 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63978 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63979 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63980 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63981 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63982 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63983 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63984 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63985 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63986 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1950 | 63976 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63627 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63643 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63682 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63877 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63908 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63625 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63656 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63666 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63741 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63757 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 64286 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1950 | 63677 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/01/1951 | 69818 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/02/1951 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 63682 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 63877 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/03/1951 | 63837 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1951 | 63644 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/05/1951 | 63644 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 63644 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 63644 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63837 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63837 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63837 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63603 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63664 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63667 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63732 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63603 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63664 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63667 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63732 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 64408 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63603 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63664 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63667 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63732 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 64286 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63658 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63807 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63884 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63900 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63908 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 64337 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63648 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/02/1952 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1952 | 040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1952 | 044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69327 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/03/1952 | 63724 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1952 | 63724 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63724 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63724 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/04/1952 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 63636 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 63893 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63636 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63893 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63636 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63893 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/11/1952 | 63724 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 64293 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 64293 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 64293 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90618 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90618 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 63621 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 63624 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 63807 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63621 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63624 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63807 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63915 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/09/1953 | 69828 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63709 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/09/1953 | 63603 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 63634 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 63861 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/10/1953 | 69828 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90043 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90051 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90287 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90449 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90545 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90567 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 69323 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/10/1954 | 69812 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/10/1954 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/11/1954 | 69815 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 67427 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 67437 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 63597 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 63643 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 63683 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 63758 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 63893 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90162 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90259 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90502 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90554 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90577 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90087 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90492 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90508 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/05/1955 | 69804 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/05/1955 | 69828 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 67427 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 67437 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/07/1955 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63615 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63644 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63665 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63750 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63759 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63837 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90055 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90275 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90302 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90431 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90594 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90660 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1955 | 69804 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1955 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/12/1955 | 69828 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 90508 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 90660 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/12/1955 | 63739 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1956 | 63915 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/06/1956 | 69803 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 90567 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 69284 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69322 | Transfer in from: | 40C | Louth | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/10/1956 | 69803 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1956 | 64408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69284 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69319 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 64314 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 69261 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 69322 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90088 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90438 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90657 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/12/1957 | 64293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 08/01/1958 | 69261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64316 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64317 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64324 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64332 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64333 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64388 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64310 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64337 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 64352 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 64333 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 64218 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/06/1958 | 69928 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/06/1958 | 69929 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 64403 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68026 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68080 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 69299 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 64218 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90055 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90087 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90502 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/08/1958 | 69284 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 64362 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 64403 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 63585 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1959 | 63853 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1959 | 63667 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63597 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63607 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63622 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63635 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63643 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63665 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63683 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63691 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63722 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63758 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63893 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1959 | 63912 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 64333 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 64346 | Transfer in from: | 41K | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 64354 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 64364 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 64450 | Transfer in from: | 41K | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 64450 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1959 | 64388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 69286 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 64371 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 64346 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 64362 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90051 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90162 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 64354 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/08/1959 | 63665 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64371 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 68591 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 69268 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 69263 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 68569 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63612 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63697 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63704 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63718 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63731 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63763 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63622 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63632 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63722 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/01/1960 | 68591 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/01/1960 | 69268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/01/1960 | 69299 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 68623 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90055 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90085 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90276 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90418 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1960 | 63722 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1960 | 63718 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 68569 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 68569 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 90085 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 90276 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 68556 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 68621 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90418 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63607 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63612 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63634 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63704 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63758 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90290 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90301 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90055 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90259 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90287 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90438 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90492 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90545 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90554 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90577 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90594 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1960 | 63643 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1960 | 63707 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/06/1960 | 68569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 68621 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 90290 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/10/1960 | 61153 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/11/1960 | 69263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/11/1960 | 69286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 68556 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 64324 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 64332 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/02/1961 | 68623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1961 | 64317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 17/03/1961 | 68026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 68078 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 14/04/1961 | 68080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 68020 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 68069 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 90145 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 90418 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1961 | 63597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61811 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61958 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61976 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/07/1961 | 64364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1961 | 64316 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1961 | 64352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1961 | 63622 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1961 | 63720 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1961 | 63774 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1961 | 63828 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61153 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 61958 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 61976 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1961 | 61377 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1962 | 63833 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1962 | 63870 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1962 | 63635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61811 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1962 | 64333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 90657 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63881 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63882 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61377 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63774 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63881 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63882 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63664 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 64314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 23/09/1962 | 68069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 90483 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1962 | 63912 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D3325 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D3701 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4053 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4057 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4060 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4061 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4066 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4067 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | D4069 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 63776 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 90209 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | D4085 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 90003 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 90224 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 90442 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/03/1963 | 68078 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1963 | 63622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1963 | 68020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1963 | 63801 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/09/1963 | 63840 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 63615 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1963 | 63722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1963 | 63731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/11/1963 | 63853 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1963 | 63577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1963 | 63645 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1963 | 63850 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1964 | 63715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1964 | 63763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63843 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63846 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63877 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63882 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63907 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1964 | 90483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1964 | 63720 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1964 | 63829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/03/1964 | 90224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1964 | 63645 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1964 | 63800 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/05/1964 | 63907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 90209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/06/1964 | 63846 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1964 | 90145 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1964 | 90003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 90190 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1964 | 90302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1964 | 90411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1964 | 63615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90121 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90164 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90227 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90258 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90266 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90271 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90292 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90398 | Transfer in from: | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/10/1964 | 63765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/12/1964 | 63636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92038 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92040 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92041 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92044 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92140 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92141 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92144 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92145 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92146 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92148 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92149 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92178 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92179 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92180 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92182 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92195 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92042 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92189 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92191 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90121 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90190 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90227 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90258 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90266 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90301 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1965 | 63703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1965 | 63861 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1965 | 63683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1965 | 63877 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/04/1965 | 63717 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/04/1965 | 63842 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/04/1965 | 90442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1965 | 63902 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1965 | 90164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/04/1965 | 92038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/04/1965 | 92044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/04/1965 | 92140 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/04/1965 | 92180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/05/1965 | 92195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1965 | 63679 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1965 | 63882 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61313 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61315 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61372 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61394 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63589 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63590 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63612 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63630 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63646 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63650 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63701 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63706 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63768 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63868 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 43064 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90069 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90149 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90153 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90301 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90401 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90558 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90658 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90719 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92039 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92173 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92186 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92200 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1965 | 43064 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 61372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 63691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 63850 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 63893 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1965 | 63650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 27/06/1965 | 92149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1965 | 90275 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1965 | 90398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61050 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61051 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61093 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63590 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63868 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1965 | 90271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1965 | 61093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1965 | 90088 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/08/1965 | 63701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 08/08/1965 | 92040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1965 | 63697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1965 | 63828 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/08/1965 | 92041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/08/1965 | 92186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1965 | 63732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 63706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1965 | 90301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 63739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 92178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 92200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41528 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41533 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41708 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41734 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41763 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41804 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41835 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43082 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43089 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43108 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43109 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43149 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 47001 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 47005 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90189 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90220 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90258 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90529 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90572 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90587 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90697 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/10/1965 | 90292 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 17/10/1965 | 92039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92042 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92141 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92144 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92145 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92146 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92148 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92173 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92179 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92182 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92189 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92191 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1965 | 63843 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 43082 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 43089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 43108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 43109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 43149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 63612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90558 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90587 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90658 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 90697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1965 | 90043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1966 | 90418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1966 | 90449 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1966 | 90149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1966 | 90258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1966 | 90069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 32 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 61050 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 61051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 90153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 90572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 90719 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D3325 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4053 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4057 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4060 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4061 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4066 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4067 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4085 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/12/1966 | 41835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | on | 25/12/1966 | 47001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | on | 25/12/1966 | 47005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1972 | D4069 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 08537 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham |